State of Texas et al v. United States of America et al Featured Case

Attorneys general of Texas and six other states have sued the Trump administration, asking it to end the Obama-era Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals (DACA) program, which protected about 700,000 young immigrants from deportation. The lawsuit alleges that President Obama, in enacting DACA, exceeded his constitutional authority.

Plaintiff: State of Texas, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of West Virginia, State of Kansas, Phil Bryant and Paul R. LePage
Defendant: United States of America, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Kevin K. McAleenan, Thomas D. Homan, L. Francis Cissna and Carla L. Provost
Intervenor_defendant: Karla Perez, Maria Rocha, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Elly Marisol Estrada, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Karla Lopez, Luis A Rafael, Darwin Velasquez, Jin Park, Oscar Alvarez, Nancy Adossi, Denise Romero, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Angel Silva, Moses Kamau Chege, Hyo-Won Jeon, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz and Blanca Gonzalez
Movant: State of New Jersey
Amicus: U.S. Rep. Steve King, et al.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00068
Filed: May 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Brownsville Office
County: Cameron
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Assignment of USCA No. 21-40680 re: 582 Notice of Appeal,, 581 Notice of Appeal, 583 Notice of Appeal, filed.(jtabares, 1)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 586 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: 583 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Paid. Reporter(s): S. Perales, F. Warner, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Appeal) (JenniferLongoria, 1)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 585 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: 582 Notice of Appeal,,. Fee status: Paid. Reporter(s): S. Perales, F. Warner, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Appeal) (JenniferLongoria, 1)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 584 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: 581 Notice of Appeal,. Fee status: GOV. Reporter(s): S. Perales, F. Warner, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Appeal) (JenniferLongoria, 1)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Appeal Review Notes re: 582 Notice of Appeal,,. Fee status: Paid. The appeal filing fee has been paid or an ifp motion has been granted.Hearings were held in the case. DKT13 transcript order form(s) due within 14 days of the filing of the notice of appeal.Eight (8) transcripts were produced. Number of DKT-13 Forms expected: 10, filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Appeal Review Notes re: 581 Notice of Appeal,. Fee status: GOV. The appellant is a U.S. government agency, and no fee is required.Hearings were held in the case. DKT13 transcript order form(s) due within 14 days of the filing of the notice of appeal.Eight (8) transcripts were produced. Number of DKT-13 Forms expected: 10, filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Appeal Review Notes re: 583 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Paid. The appeal filing fee has been paid or an ifp motion has been granted.Hearings were held in the case. DKT13 transcript order form(s) due within 14 days of the filing of the notice of appeal.Eight (8) transcripts were produced. Number of DKT-13 Forms expected: 10, filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 583 NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: 575 Memorandum and Order, 576 Permanent Injunction by State of New Jersey (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0541-27031407), filed.(Sheehan, Tim)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 582 NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: 575 Memorandum and Order, 576 Permanent Injunction by Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Jung Woo Kim, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0541-27029574), filed. (Perales, Nina)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 581 NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: 575 Memorandum and Order, 576 Permanent Injunction by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America, filed.(Walker, James)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 580 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Jeremy M Feigenbaum as to State of New Jersey re: 579 Order,,, filed. No updated address found (MarySanchez, 3)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 579 ORDER. In the Order of Permanent Injunction (Doc. No. 576), the Court retained jurisdiction of the matter for purposes of construction, modification, and enforcement of this Permanent Injunction. As there are no further matters pending, the Court will administratively close this case. This case is STAYED and ADMINISTRATIVELY (statistically) CLOSED. The parties may move to reinstate the case on the Court's active docket at such time in the future as deemed appropriate. A copy of this Order shall be attached as an exhibit to any motion to reinstate. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 578 NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURTS ORDER (SECOND) re: 576 Permanent Injunction by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Tracy L. Renaud, # 2 Exhibit B - USCIS FAQs)(Robins, Jeffrey)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 577 NOTICE of Compliance with the Court's Order re: 576 Permanent Injunction by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. DHS.gov DACA Posting, # 2 Exhibit 2. USCIS.gov DACA Posting)(Walker, James)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 576 ORDER OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 575 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding 486 Plaintiff States' Motion for Summary Judgment and regarding 503 Defendant-Intervenors' Motion for Summary Judgment. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 574 ORDER denying 390 Defendant-Intervenors' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Experts (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 573 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 484 Motion to Compel.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 572 ORDER regarding 494 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 571 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel (Margaret L. Carter) by Proposed Amici Local Governments and Local Government Advocacy Organizations, filed. (Suvor, Daniel)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 570 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Daniel Hu for Transcript of Status Conference, 3/30/21 before Judge Andrew Hanen. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sean Gumm, filed. (Hu, Daniel)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 569 Supplemental BRIEF Opposition re: 486 MOTION for Summary Judgment by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America, filed.(Walker, James)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 568 Supplemental BRIEF Regarding Impact of Recent Developments by Karla Perez, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Nina Perales, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Perales, Nina)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 567 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Stephen P Wallace re: 562 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, filed. (mmapps, 4)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 566 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 565 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (dnoriega, 1)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 565 TRANSCRIPT re: before Judge Andrew S Hanen. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2021., filed. (SeanGumm, )
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 564 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Nina Perales for Transcript of Status Conference on 3/30/2021 before Judge Andrew Hanen. Ordinary (30 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sean Gumm, filed. (Perales, Nina)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew S Hanen. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/30/2021. The Court heard the parties on the possible impact of the American Dream and Promise Act on the substantive and procedural aspects of this litigation. The parties have until 4/9/2021 to file any further written responses. Appearances: Patrick Sweeten, Will Thompson, Douglas H Hallward-Driemeier, Nina Perales, Jeffrey S Robins, Daniel David Hu, Mayur P Saxena.(Court Reporter: S. Gumm), filed.(rhawkins)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 563 NOTICE of DHS Pending Action on DACA by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America, filed. (Robins, Jeffrey)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 562 ORDER granting 561 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Todd Lawrence Disher terminated. William T. Thompson is entered as Attorney in Charge for the Plaintiff States..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 561 Unopposed MOTION for Todd Lawrence Disher to Withdraw as Attorney by State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/9/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Disher, Todd)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 560 NOTICE of Appearance by William T. Thompson on behalf of State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. (Thompson, William)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 559 Order. Status Conference set for 3/30/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Andrew S Hanen(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 558 ORDER granting 557 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Cristina Maria Moreno terminated.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 557 Unopposed MOTION for Cristina M. Moreno to Withdraw as Attorney by State of Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/5/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Moreno, Cristina)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 556 ORDER granting 548 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ramon Andres Soto terminated.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 555 ORDER granting 549 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John Coghlan terminated.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 554 RESPONSE to 550 Notice (Other) of Presidential Memorandum, filed by State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia. (Disher, Todd)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 553 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 551 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (rnieto, 1)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 552 RESPONSE to 550 Notice (Other) , filed by L. Francis Cissna, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America. (Walker, James)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 551 TRANSCRIPT re: Motion proceedings held on 12/22/2020 before Judge Andrew S Hanen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lanie Smith. Ordering Party Defendant Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/22/2021., filed. (LanieSmith, )
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 550 NOTICE of Presidential Memorandum by Nancy Adossi, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Perales, Nina)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 549 Unopposed MOTION for John V. Coghlan to Withdraw as Attorney by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/11/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Walker, James)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 548 Unopposed MOTION for Ramon A. Soto to Withdraw as Attorney by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/28/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 547 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Nina Perales for Transcript of Motion Hearing on 12/22/2020 before Judge Andrew Hanen. Ordinary (30 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lanie Smith, filed. (Perales, Nina)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew S Hanen. MOTION HEARING held on 12/22/2020. The Court heard the argument of counsel as to 503 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court will take the matter under advisement and make a ruling in due course. Appearances: Todd Disher, Eric Hudson, Elizabeth Murrill, Nina Perales, Douglas Hallward-Driemer, Jeffrey Feigenbaum, John Coghlan, Daniel Hu(Court Reporter: L. Smith), filed.(rhawkins)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 546 ORDER granting 541 Motion for Jeremy M. Feigenbaum.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 545 ORDER Granting 542 Motion for John Coghlan to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 544 ORDER denying 538 Motion for Continuance.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 543 Unopposed MOTION to Appear on Behalf of Attorney-in-Charge by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/6/2021. (Walker, James)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 542 MOTION for John Coghlan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/6/2021. (Walker, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/17/2020: # 1 Motion for Pro Hac) (rnieto, 1).
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 541 MOTION Appear on Behalf of the Attorney-in-Charge by State of New Jersey, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/5/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order NJ Proposed Order)(Medoway, Melissa)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 540 REPLY in Support of 538 Opposed MOTION for Continuance of Hearing Set for December 22, 2020 or to Hear Argument Remotely, filed by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez. (Perales, Nina)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 539 RESPONSE to 538 Opposed MOTION for Continuance of Hearing Set for December 22, 2020 or to Hear Argument Remotely filed by State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Proposed Order)(Disher, Todd)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 538 Opposed MOTION for Continuance of Hearing Set for December 22, 2020 or to Hear Argument Remotely by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/28/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 537 ORDER granting 535 Motion to Withdraw Adam Arthur Biggs. Attorney Adam Arthur Biggs terminated.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 536 ORDER granting 534 Motion to Withdraw Ryan L. Bangers. Attorney Ryan L Bangert terminated.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 535 Unopposed MOTION for Adam Arthur Biggs to Withdraw as Attorney by State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/24/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Biggs, Adam)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 534 Unopposed MOTION for Ryan L. Bangert to Withdraw as Attorney by State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/24/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Disher, Todd)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 533 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric A. Hudson on behalf of State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. (Hudson, Eric)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 532 REPLY in Support of 503 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez. (Perales, Nina)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 531 ORDER granting 530 Motion for Jeremy M. Feigenbaum to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 530 MOTION for Jeremy M. Feigenbaum to Appear Pro Hac Vice by State of New Jersey, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/14/2020. (Medoway, Melissa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/24/2020: # 1 Attorney Verification) (scastillo, 1).
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 529 REPLY in Support of 486 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Disher, Todd)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 528 RESPONSE to 501 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez. (Perales, Nina)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 527 RESPONSE to 503 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America. (Walker, James)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 526 ORDER granting 522 Motion for Daniel R. Suvor to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 525 ORDER granting 521 Motion for Margaret L. Carter to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 524 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief by Proposed Amici Local Governments and Local Government Advocacy Organizations, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/4/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amici Curiae Brief, # 2 Proposed Order)(Whilt, Nicholas)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 523 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Whilt on behalf of Proposed Amici Local Governments and Local Government Advocacy Organizations, filed. (Whilt, Nicholas)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 522 MOTION for Daniel R. Suvor to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Proposed Amici Local Governments and Local Government Advocacy Organizations, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/4/2020. (Whilt, Nicholas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2020: # 1 Attorney Verification) (dnoriega, 1).
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 521 MOTION for Margaret L. Carter to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Proposed Amici Local Governments and Local Government Advocacy Organizations, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/4/2020. (Whilt, Nicholas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2020: # 1 Attorney Verification) (dnoriega, 1).
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 520 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Dundas on behalf of City of Los Angeles, filed. (Dundas, Michael)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 519 ORDER granting 514 Motion for Michael Dundas to Appear Pro Hac Vice for the City of Los Angeles.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(LaurenWebster, 4)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 518 ORDER granting 517 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(LaurenWebster, 4)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 517 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Federal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff States' Motion for Summary Judgment by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/2/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 516 ORDER granting 505 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(LaurenWebster, 4)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 515 ORDER granting 507 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(LaurenWebster, 4)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 514 MOTION for Michael Joseph Dundas to Appear Pro Hac Vice for City of Los Angeles, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/1/2020. (mmapps, 4)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 508 NOTICE of Errata re: 501 Response to Motion by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Unpublished Authorities)(Walker, James)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 513 ORDER granting 490 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Philip Trent Peroyea terminated.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 512 Memorandum of Law by Congressman Steve King and Congressman Paul A. Gosar, D.D.S, as Amici Curiae in support of Plaintiffs' 486 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed. (jdav, 4)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 511 ORDER granting 492 Motion for Leave to File a memorandum of law as amici curiae in support of plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 510 ORDER granting 478 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ernest I. Herrera terminated.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 509 ORDER granting 489 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 507 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant-Intervenors' Responses by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/30/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Walker, James)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 506 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 12/22/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Andrew S Hanen, filed. (rhawkins)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 505 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/30/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Disher, Todd)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 504 RESPONSE in Opposition to 486 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Nina Perales Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Appendix Vol. 1, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Appendix Vol. 2)(Perales, Nina)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 503 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/27/2020. (Perales, Nina)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 502 RESPONSE in Opposition to 486 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by State of New Jersey. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix NJ Appendix - Vol. I, # 2 Appendix NJ Appendix - Vol. 2, # 3 Appendix NJ Appendix - Vol. 3, # 4 Proposed Order Order Denying Summary Judgment)(Medoway, Melissa)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 501 RESPONSE to 486 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits)(Walker, James)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 499 MOTION Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit by State of New Jersey, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/27/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Medoway, Melissa)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 498 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/27/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 500 AMICUS DECLARATION SUPPLEMENT SUPPORT TO DOCKET ITEMS #491 and #483 OPPOSES ITEMS #209 and #492: RE SCOTUS RULING IN NO. 18- 587 AND DOCKET ITEM #461 STAY ORDER WITH LOCAL RULE 5-2 RELATED CASES OF AMICUS CHRISTOPHER EARL STRUNK, THE NATURAL-BORN-CITIZEN (NBC) BIRTHER TRUSTEE FOR THE AD BOC NEW YORKER REPUBLICAN COMMITTEE, STATUS RECONSIDERATION MOTION FOR FRCvP RULE 6S(b) RELIEF AT DOCKET ITEM #483, AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO THE STATES AMICI CURIAE MOTION FOR RELIEF AT DOCKET ITEM #209 BY: NEW YORK, CALIFORNIA, CONNECTICUT, DELAWARE, HAWAII, ILLINOIS, IOWA, MAINE, MARYLAND, MASSACHUSETTS, MINNESOTA, NEW MEXICO, NORTH CAROLINA, OREGON, PENNSYLVANIA, RHODE ISLAND, VIRGINIA, VERMONT, WASHINGTON, AND THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR INJUNCTION AGAINST THE DEFERRED ACTION FOR CHILDHOOD ARRIVAL (DACA) by Christopher Earl Strunk, Trustee for the Ad Hoc New Yorker Republican Committee, filed.(jdav, 4)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORDER denying 483 Motion for Reconsideration. As previously stated, the Trustees are welcome to participate in this case as amicus curiae..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 496 REPLY in Support of 484 Opposed MOTION to Compel and Extend Discovery Period, or in the Alternative, to Exclude Evidence, filed by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Perales, Nina)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 495 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE by Charles A Breiterman, filed.(Breiterman, Charles)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 494 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Charles A Breiterman, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/19/2020. (Breiterman, Charles)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 493 RESPONSE to 484 Opposed MOTION to Compel and Extend Discovery Period, or in the Alternative, to Exclude Evidence filed by State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Disher, Todd)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 492 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs by U.S. Rep. Steve King, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/13/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Memo of Law, # 2 Proposed Order proposed order)(Joseph, Lawrence)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 491 AFFIDAVIT of Ad Hoc New York Republican Committee Trustee Christopher Ear Strunk Amicus, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(ckrus, 4)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 490 Unopposed MOTION for P. Trent Peroyea to Withdraw as Attorney by State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/6/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Peroyea, Philip)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 489 First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Charles A Breiterman, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/6/2020. (Breiterman, Charles)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 488 ORDER granting 485 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 487 APPENDIX re: 486 MOTION for Summary Judgment by State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35)(Disher, Todd)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 486 MOTION for Summary Judgment by State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/30/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Disher, Todd)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 485 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/30/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Disher, Todd)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 484 Opposed MOTION to Compel and Extend Discovery Period, or in the Alternative, to Exclude Evidence by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/28/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order to Compel, # 2 Proposed Order to Exclude, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G)(Perales, Nina)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 483 Notice of Motion by Ad Hoc New Yorker Republican Committee/ Christopher Earl Strunk, Trustee, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion, # 2 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Reconsider, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service, # 5 Affirmation In Support of Notice of Motion to Reconsider, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit)(jdav, 4)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDER granting 480 Motion for Extension of Time. All deadlines in docket entry no. 473 are extended by 7 days..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 481 PROPOSED ORDER re: 480 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time Schedule by One Week, filed.(Perales, Nina)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 480 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time Schedule by One Week by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/21/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Perales, Nina)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Charles A. Breiterman.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 478 Unopposed MOTION for Ernest I. Herrera to Withdraw as Attorney by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/21/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 477 ORDER, Jeremy E. Hollander, Nicholas Dolinsky and Brian De Vito are withdrawn as counsel of record for the State of New Jersey in this case; Mayur P. Saxena is designated as Attorney in Charge for the State of New Jersey in this case. Nicholas Dolinsky and Brian De Vito are removed from all further electronic notifications regarding this case. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 476 ORDER granting 471 Motion for Mayur P. Saxena, Melissa Medoway, Eric L. Apar, Elspeth L. Faiman Hans and Tim Sheehan to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) (Attachments: # 1 Order Granting Melissa Medoway to Proceed Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Order Granting Eric L. Apar to Proceed Pro Hac Vice, # 3 Order Granting Elspeth L. Faiman Hans to Proceed Pro Hac Vice, # 4 Order Granting Tim Sheehan to Proceed Pro Hac Vice) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 475 ORDER denying 465 Motion to Intervene as to the Trustees of the Ad Hoc New Yorker Republican Committee. The Trustees are welcome to participate as amicus curiae..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 474 ORDER granting 464 Motion to Substitute Party. State of Mississippi added, Tate Reeves, Governor of Mississippi terminated..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ORDER denying without prejudice 356 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Plaintiff States are given leave to re-file the motion for summary judgment, due by October 2, 2020. The Federal Defendants and the Defendant-Intervenors response due by October 30, 2020. The Plaintiff States reply due by November 6, 2020. Defendant or any of the Intervenors response due by November 6, 2020. Discovery deadline: September 30, 2020. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 472 NOTICE Filing of Administrative Record re: 467 Order by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America, filed. (Attachments: # 1 AR part 1, # 2 AR part 2, # 3 AR part 3, # 4 AR part 4, # 5 AR part 5, # 6 AR part 6)(Walker, James)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 471 Unopposed MOTION for Mayur P. Saxena, Melissa L. Medoway, Eric L. Apar, Elspeth L. Faiman Hans, and Tim Sheehan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by State of New Jersey, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/9/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Mayur Saxena (pro hac vice), # 2 Affidavit Melissa Medoway (pro hac vice), # 3 Affidavit Eric Apar (pro hac vice), # 4 Affidavit Elspeth L. Faiman Hans (pro hac vice), # 5 Affidavit Tim Sheehan (pro hac vice), # 6 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Levine, Kenneth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2020: # 7 Verified Status of Bar Membership) (EdnitaPonce, 1).
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 470 RESPONSE in Opposition to 465 MOTION to Intervene, filed by State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Disher, Todd)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 469 NOTICE Perez Defendant-Intervenors' Consent to Plaintiff States' Motion to Substitute State of Mississippi by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. (Perales, Nina)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 468 NOTICE of related litigation by United States of America, filed. (Hu, Daniel)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 467 ORDER. Federal Defendant will file a certified copy of the administrative record concerning DACA memorandum by 8/25/2020 along with a printed courtesy copy to the Court if over 100 pages. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 466 VERIFICATION AFFIDAVIT of INTERVENER Van Allen, filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 465 Affirmation in Support of MOTION to Intervene Under FRcvP Rule 24 by the Trustees of the Ad Hoc New Yorker Republican Committee by Christopher Earl Strunk, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/17/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Cover Letter)(JenniferLongoria, 1) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/27/2020: # 9 Unredacted attachment Exhibit 5) (JenniferLongoria, 1).
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 464 MOTION to Substitute Party State of Mississippi in place of Phil Bryant by State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, State of Mississippi, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/14/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Disher, Todd)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 463 STATUS REPORT by Phil Bryant, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed.(Disher, Todd)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 462 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Lawrence Disher on behalf of State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. (Disher, Todd)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 461 ORDER. Pursuant to this Court's stay order (DE 447 ), parties are to file a joint status report and an agreed schedule by July 24, 2020 given the Supreme Court's ruling today in Dep't of Homeland Sec. v. Regents of Univ. of Cal. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(LaurenWebster, 4)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 460 ORDER granting 457 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael N Fresco terminated.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDER granting 458 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Glenn J Moramarco terminated. Jeremy E. Hollander is designated as Attorney in Charge for New Jersey in this case..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 458 Unopposed MOTION for Glenn J. Moramarco to Withdraw as Attorney by State of New Jersey, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/22/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Levine, Kenneth)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 457 MOTION for Michael N. Fresco to Withdraw as Attorney by Proposed Amici Religious Organizations, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/6/2020. (Mangi, Adeel)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ORDER granting 454 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Karen W Lin terminated.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 455 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL Re: Jennifer B. Sokoler by Brown University, California Institute of Technology, Columbia University, Cornell University, Dartmouth College, Duke University, Emory University, George Washington University, Georgetown University, Harvard University, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Princeton University, Stanford University, University of Chicago, University of Pennsylvania, Vanderbilt University, Washington University in St. Louis, Yale University, filed. (Yagura, Ryan)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 454 MOTION for Karen Lin to Withdraw as Attorney by Proposed Amici Companies and Associations, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/20/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ranlett, Kevin)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ORDER granting 451 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Todd Lawrence Disher terminated, Ryan L. Bangert added as Attorney in Charge for Plaintiff States..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 452 ORDER denying 390 Motion to Strike without prejudice. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 451 Unopposed MOTION for Todd Lawrence Disher to Withdraw as Attorney by Phil Bryant, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/5/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bangert, Ryan)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ORDER granting 449 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Denise Hulett terminated.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 449 Unopposed MOTION for Denise Hulett to Withdraw as Attorney by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/3/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ORDER granting 432 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing, denying as moot motion to continue hearing set for October 28, 2019. Deadline to file supplemental briefing to be set when a new docket control order is entered..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ORDER granting 427 Motion to Stay.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 446 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 445 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (scastillo, 1)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 445 TRANSCRIPT re: Motion Hearing held on October 8, 2019 before Judge Andrew S Hanen. Court Reporter J. Sanchez. Ordering Party Daniel Hu Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/3/2020., filed. (jsanchez, )
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 444 REPLY in Support of 432 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing and to Continue Hearing Set for October 28, 2019, filed by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez. (Perales, Nina)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 443 RESPONSE to 435 Order on Motion for Discovery, , filed by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America. (Robins, Jeffrey)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 442 BRIEF re: 435 Order on Motion for Discovery, by State of New Jersey, filed.(Levine, Kenneth)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 441 BRIEF Regarding the Scope of the Court's Review re: 435 Order on Motion for Discovery, by Phil Bryant, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Disher, Todd)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 440 Supplemental BRIEF Regarding the Administrative Record re: 435 Order on Motion for Discovery, by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Perales, Nina)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 439 RESPONSE to 432 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing and to Continue Hearing Set for October 28, 2019 , filed by Phil Bryant, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Disher, Todd)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 438 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Todd Lawrence Disher for Transcript of Motion to Stay & Motion for Discovery Hearing; October 8, 2019; Judge Andrew Hanen. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Johnny Sanchez, filed. (Disher, Todd)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 437 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Nina Perales for Transcript of Motion to Stay & Motion for Discovery, October 8, 2019, Judge Andrew Hanen. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Johnny Sanchez, filed. (Perales, Nina)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 436 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Daniel D. Hu for Transcript of Motion to Stay Hearing 427 10/8/2019 Judge Hanen. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Johnny Sanchez, filed. (Hu, Daniel)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER denying as moot 429 Motion for Discovery. The parties are instructed to submit briefing to the Court by October 28, 2019 on the issue of whether the Court may consider evidence outside of the administrative record in its ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (DE 356 ). (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(LaurenWebster, 4)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew S Hanen. MOTION HEARING held on 10/8/2019. The Court heard argument on 427 Motion to Stay and 429 Motion for Discovery. The Court denies as moot 429 Motion for Discovery. The Court further cancelled the motion hearing set for 10/28/2019 and will enter an order for further briefing. Appearances: Ramon A Soto, Nina Perales, Todd Lawrence Disher, Adam Arthur Biggs, Philip Trent Peroyea, Daniel David Hu, Glenn J Moramarco.(Court Reporter: J. Sanchez), filed.(rhawkins)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 434 REPLY in Support of 429 Opposed MOTION for Discovery, filed by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Perales, Nina)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 433 RESPONSE to 429 Opposed MOTION for Discovery filed by Phil Bryant, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Proposed Order)(Disher, Todd)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 432 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing and to Continue Hearing Set for October 28, 2019 by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/22/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Nina Perales, # 2 Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 431 NOTICE of Setting as to 429 Opposed MOTION for Discovery, 427 Opposed MOTION to Stay . Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 10/8/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Andrew S Hanen, filed. (rhawkins)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 430 REPLY in Support of 427 Opposed MOTION to Stay , filed by State of New Jersey. (Levine, Kenneth)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 429 Opposed MOTION for Discovery by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/15/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 428 RESPONSE in Opposition to 427 Opposed MOTION to Stay , filed by Phil Bryant, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Disher, Todd)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 427 Opposed MOTION to Stay by State of New Jersey, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/18/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Appendix)(Levine, Kenneth)
August 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER granting 422 Motion for Ramon A. Soto to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
August 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER granting 423 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Katherine Anne Gregory and Paul H. Juzdan terminated..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 424 NOTICE Withdrawing Perez Defendant-Intervenors' Second Motion to Compel Discovery (Doc. 420) re: 420 Second MOTION to Compel Discovery from Federal Defendants by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. (Perales, Nina)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 423 Unopposed MOTION for Katherine Gregory and Paul Juzdan to Withdraw as Attorney by State of New Jersey, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/5/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Levine, Kenneth)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 422 MOTION for Ramon A. Soto to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/5/2019. (Perales, Nina) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/16/2019: # 1 verified status) (dbenavides, 1).
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER granting 416 Joint MOTION to Modify June 24 Order as to Federal Defendants, granting 418 Unopposed MOTION for Alejandra Avila to Withdraw as Attorney,granting 419 Unopposed MOTION for Brantley Starr to Withdraw as Attorney. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 420 Second MOTION to Compel Discovery from Federal Defendants by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/23/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Perales, Nina)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 419 Unopposed MOTION for Brantley Starr to Withdraw as Attorney by Phil Bryant, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/21/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Disher, Todd)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 418 Unopposed MOTION for Alejandra Avila to Withdraw as Attorney by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/16/2019. (Avila, Alejandra)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 417 LETTER OF AGREEMENT re: Modification of Scheduling Deadlines by Phil Bryant, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed.(Disher, Todd)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 416 Joint MOTION to Modify June 24 Order as to Federal Defendants by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/8/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Robins, Jeffrey)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 415 REPLY in Support of 390 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Experts, filed by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez. (Avila, Alejandra)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 414 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Jeffrey Robins for Transcript of Motion Hearing on 6/24/2019 before Judge Andrew S. Hannen. 3-Day turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Fred Warner, filed. (Hu, Daniel)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 413 REPLY in Support of 356 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Phil Bryant, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia. (Disher, Todd)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER, denying without prejudice 393 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order, denying without prejudice 363 Opposed MOTION to Deny or Defer Consideration of Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative to Grant Defendant-Intervenors an Extension of Time to Respond, denying without prejudice 383 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff State of Texas and to Dismiss all Other Plaintiff States, denying without prejudice 386 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Federal Defendants ; The hearing on Plaintiff-States' 356 MOTION for Summary Judgment previously scheduled for July 8, 2019 at 10:00 AM is RE-SET, for 10/28/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Andrew S Hanen) (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 411 RESPONSE to 390 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Experts , filed by Phil Bryant, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Proposed Order)(Disher, Todd)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 410 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Andrew S Hanen, filed. (rhawkins)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER granting 396 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting 398 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew S Hanen. MOTION HEARING held on 6/24/2019. The Court held discussions with counsel off the record after which rulings regarding discovery issues were made as indicated on the record. The Court will cancel the hearing on the motion for summary judgment and reset it to 10/28/2019 at 10:00 a.m. Notice to follow. Appearances: Alejandra Avila, Nina Perales, Ryan L Bangert, Todd Lawrence Disher, Philip Trent Peroyea, Jeffrey S Robins, Daniel David Hu, Glenn J Moramarco.(Court Reporter: F. Warner), filed.(rhawkins)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 408 RESPONSE in Opposition to 393 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order, filed by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez. (Avila, Alejandra)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ADVISORY by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed.(Perales, Nina)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 406 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan L. Bangert on behalf of Phil Bryant, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. (Bangert, Ryan)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 405 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Miscellaneous Hearing set for 6/24/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Andrew S Hanen, filed. (rhawkins)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 404 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Telephone Conference set for 6/20/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Andrew S Hanen, filed. (rhawkins)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 403 Notice of Telephone Hearing set for 6/20/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Andrew S Hanen. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(EdnitaPonce, 1)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 402 NOTICE OF ERRATA re: 399 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 62-J)(Perales, Nina)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 401 REPLY in Support of 386 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Federal Defendants, filed by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez. (Avila, Alejandra)
June 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 400 APPENDIX re: 399 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-6, # 2 Exhibit 7-12, # 3 Exhibit 13-18, # 4 Exhibit 19-29, # 5 Exhibit 30-34, # 6 Exhibit 35, # 7 Exhibit 36-48, # 8 Exhibit 49-61, # 9 Exhibit 62)(Avila, Alejandra)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 399 RESPONSE in Opposition to 356 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez. (Avila, Alejandra)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 398 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. (Avila, Alejandra)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 397 RESPONSE in Opposition to 356 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by State of New Jersey. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Levine, Kenneth)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 396 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by State of New Jersey, filed. (Levine, Kenneth)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 395 NOTICE of Errata re: 393 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Robins, Jeffrey)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 394 NOTICE of Errata re: 392 Response in Opposition to Motion, by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Robins, Jeffrey)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 393 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/28/2019. (Robins, Jeffrey)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 392 RESPONSE in Opposition to 386 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Federal Defendants, filed by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Renaud Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Monica Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Hoefer Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Bellisime Declaration)(Robins, Jeffrey)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 391 REPLY in Support of 383 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff State of Texas and to Dismiss all Other Plaintiff States, filed by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez. (Avila, Alejandra)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 390 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Experts by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/26/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Proposed Order)(Avila, Alejandra)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER granting 382 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Zachary Kolodin and Priscilla Orta terminated; granting 384 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Zachary Kolodin and Priscilla Orta terminated.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER granting 381 Motion for James J. Walker to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 387 RESPONSE to 383 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff State of Texas and to Dismiss all Other Plaintiff States filed by Phil Bryant, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Proposed Order)(Disher, Todd)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 386 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Federal Defendants by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/7/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Proposed Order)(Avila, Alejandra)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER. Plaintiffs are ordered to respond to 383 Motion to Compel by May 29, 2019. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified. (LaurenWebster, 4)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 384 MOTION for Zachary Kolodin to Withdraw as Attorney by Proposed Amici Religious Organizations, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/5/2019. (Mangi, Adeel)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 383 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff State of Texas and to Dismiss all Other Plaintiff States by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/4/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Proposed Order)(Avila, Alejandra)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 382 MOTION for Priscilla Orta to Withdraw as Attorney by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/4/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 381 MOTION for James J. Walker to Appear Pro Hac Vice by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/3/2019. (Walker, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/14/2019: # 1 Verified Motion) (dnoriega, 1).
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 380 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney James Joseph Walker as to Defendants re: 368 Order on Motion for Leave to File, filed. (mmarquez, 5)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 379 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney James Joseph Walker re: 367 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed. (mmarquez, 5)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 356 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 7/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Andrew S Hanen. Those who wish to respond to the Motion for Summary Judgment must do so by June 14, 2019, the Plaintiff-States replies due by June 28, 2019. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER granting 375 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John Paul Salmon and Brett A Shumate terminated; granting 376 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John Paul Salmon and Brett A Shumate terminated.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 376 MOTION for Brett A. Shumate to Withdraw as Attorney by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/3/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Robins, Jeffrey)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 375 MOTION for Jack Salmon to Withdraw as Attorney by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/26/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Salmon, John)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 374 REPLY in Support of 363 Opposed MOTION to Deny or Defer Consideration of Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative to Grant Defendant-Intervenors an Extension of Time to Respond, filed by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Salmon, John)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 373 RESPONSE in Opposition to 363 Opposed MOTION to Deny or Defer Consideration of Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative to Grant Defendant-Intervenors an Extension of Time to Respond, filed by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America. (Robins, Jeffrey)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 372 RESPONSE in Opposition to 363 Opposed MOTION to Deny or Defer Consideration of Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative to Grant Defendant-Intervenors an Extension of Time to Respond, filed by Phil Bryant, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia. (Disher, Todd)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 371 REPLY in Support of 356 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Phil Bryant, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia. (Disher, Todd)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 370 AMENDED ANSWER to 104 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America, filed. (Robins, Jeffrey)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 369 MEMORANDUM Of Law In Support re: 357 Brief in support re: entry # 356 Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. Rep. Steve King, filed.(jdav, 4)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER granting 349 Opposed motion to postpone all deadlines for 19 days..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER granting 364 Motion for Leave to File a memorandum of law as amici curiae in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 366 RESPONSE to 356 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America. (Robins, Jeffrey)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER granting 359 Motion for James J. Walker to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 364 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Support of Pls Mot Summ J by U.S. Rep. Steve King, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/13/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proffered Amicus Brief, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Joseph, Lawrence)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 363 Opposed MOTION to Deny or Defer Consideration of Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative to Grant Defendant-Intervenors an Extension of Time to Respond by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/7/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 362 REPLY in Support of 349 Opposed MOTION to Postpone All Deadlines in Rule 16 Scheduling Order, filed by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Avila, Alejandra)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER granting 355 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER granting 352 Motion to Dismiss Janet Mills, Governor of Main; granting 353 Motion for Extension of Time. Federal Defendants' have until March 6, 2019 to replead their answer..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 359 MOTION for James J Walker to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/26/2019. (ccassady, 4) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/6/2019: # 1 Atty License Verification) (rnieto, 1).
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 358 APPENDIX re: 356 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Phil Bryant, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33)(Disher, Todd)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 357 BRIEF in Support re: 356 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Phil Bryant, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed.(Disher, Todd)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 356 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Phil Bryant, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/25/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Disher, Todd)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 355 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Phil Bryant, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/25/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Disher, Todd)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 354 RESPONSE in Opposition to 349 Opposed MOTION to Postpone All Deadlines in Rule 16 Scheduling Order, filed by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America. (Robins, Jeffrey)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 353 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time Replead Answer by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/19/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Robins, Jeffrey)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 352 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Janet Mills, Governor of Maine by Phil Bryant, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/15/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Disher, Todd)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 351 Joint RESPONSE in Opposition to 349 Opposed MOTION to Postpone All Deadlines in Rule 16 Scheduling Order, filed by Phil Bryant, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Disher, Todd)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 350 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Toth on behalf of Phil Bryant, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. (Toth, Michael)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 349 Opposed MOTION to Postpone All Deadlines in Rule 16 Scheduling Order by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/1/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Proposed Order)(Avila, Alejandra)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 334 Motion to Strike. Federal Defendants are ordered to replead their answer by February 15, 2019..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER granting 345 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Celina Ysela Moreno terminated.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER granting 344 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Adam Nicholas Bitter terminated..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 345 MOTION for Celina Moreno to Withdraw as Attorney by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/26/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Salmon, John)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 344 Unopposed MOTION for Adam N. Bitter to Withdraw as Attorney by Phil Bryant, Paul R. LePage, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/24/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bitter, Adam)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER denying 323 Motion to Intervene; denying 323 Motion to Compel; denying as moot 324 Motion to Lift Stay; denying 325 Motion for Emergency.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER denying as moot 287 Opposed MOTION Motion to Deny or Defer Consideration of Summary Judgment, 281 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, 109 Cross MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Evidence of Non-Disclosed Witnesses, 39 MOTION to Intervene, 87 EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION to Quash Deposition Notices and Subpoenas, 86 Opposed MOTION for Discovery, 292 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw, 65 Opposed MOTION for Discovery, 212 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief, 280 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, 80 Supplemental MOTION for Discovery, 118 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, 36 MOTION for Scheduling Order, 285 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, 105 Opposed MOTION to Exclude Testimony from Untimely Designated Witnesses, 272 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins, 4)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 341 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 340 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (dnoriega, 1)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 340 TRANSCRIPT re: Initial Conference held on November 14, 2018 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. Court Reporter/Transcriber Judicial Transcribers of Texas, LLC. Ordering Party Nina Perales Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/25/2019., filed. (mahenry, )
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 339 REPLY in Support of 334 Opposed MOTION to Strike 332 Answer to Amended Complaint , filed by State of New Jersey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (email chain), # 2 Appendix unpublished cases)(Levine, Kenneth)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 338 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Nina Perales for Transcript of Scheduling Conference, 11/14/18, Magistrate Judge Frances Stacy. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Digital Scroll Transcription Services, filed. (Perales, Nina) Electronically forwarded to JTT (Digital Scroll not accepting orders at this time). Estimated completion date is November 23.Modified on 11/16/2018 (JenniferOlson, 4).
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 337 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 11/14/2018. Scheduling/ Docket Control Order issued. All pending motions will be ripe by Thanksgiving. Appearances:Raishay Lin, John Paul Salmon, Alejandra Avila, Douglas H Hallward-Driemeier, Nina Perales, Todd Lawrence Disher, Adam Arthur Biggs, Adam Nicholas Bitter, Glenn J Moramarco, Kenneth S Levine.(Digital # 10:14-10:28)(ERO:P. Yebernetsky), filed.(gclair, 4)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order ***Set/Reset Scheduling Order and Trial Settings: Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 1/15/2019. Pltf Expert Report due by 2/28/2019. Deft Expert Report due by 4/30/2019. Deft Intervenors Expert Report due by 6/30/2019. Discovery due by 8/21/2019. Dispositive and Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 11/14/2019. Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/5/2020. Docket Call set for 5/15/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Andrew S Hanen. Trial is set for the two weeks starting 5/18/2020. (gclair, 4)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 336 RESPONSE in Opposition to 334 Opposed MOTION to Strike 332 Answer to Amended Complaint , filed by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Robins, Jeffrey)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 335 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Phil Bryant, Paul R. LePage, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed.(Disher, Todd)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 334 Opposed MOTION to Strike 332 Answer to Amended Complaint by State of New Jersey, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/13/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Unreported Cases, # 2 Proposed Order)(Levine, Kenneth)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 333 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Initial Conference set for 11/14/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy, filed. (bwhite, 4)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ANSWER to 104 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America, filed.(Robins, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER granting 330 Motion for Glenn J. Moramarco to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 330 MOTION for Glenn Moramarco to Appear Pro Hac Vice by State of New Jersey, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/19/2018. (Levine, Kenneth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/1/2018: # 1 Attorney Verification) (scastillo, 1).
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 329 RESPONSE in Opposition to 325 EMERGENCY MOTION, 323 MOTION to Intervene MOTION to Compel that Invervenor's "DACA Solution Underwriting" be Submitted to President Trump for Urgent Review/Execution, with Brief in Support, filed by Phil Bryant, Paul R. LePage, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Disher, Todd)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 328 Letter, filed. (mmarquez, 5)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 327 RESPONSE to 324 MOTION to Lift Stay , filed by State of New Jersey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (email))(Levine, Kenneth)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 326 RESPONSE in Opposition to 324 MOTION to Lift Stay, filed by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez. (Perales, Nina)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 325 Second EMERGENCY MOTION to Intervene by Stephen P Wallace, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/5/2018. (SamanthaWarda, 4)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 324 MOTION to Lift Stay by Phil Bryant, Paul R. LePage, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/3/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Disher, Todd)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 323 EMERGENCY MOTION to Intervene to Settle the Courts Underlying Order, MOTION to Compel that Invervenor's "DACA Solution Underwriting" be Submitted to President Trump for Urgent Review/Execution, with Brief in Support( Motion Docket Date 9/26/2018.) by Stephen P Wallace, filed. (dperez, 3)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 322 Letter from Christine Timmon re: immigration, filed. (dwilkerson, 3)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 320 INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL ORDER (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 319 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court DENIES the request for preliminary injunctive relief.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER GRANTING Defendant-Intervenors' Cross Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Evidence of Non-Disclosed Witnesses. Plaintiffs' declarations of undisclosed witnesses, found at Dkt. 6 at 332-36, 335-403, 414-21, 474-91, are EXCLUDED from the evidence in this case.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff States' Motion to Exclude Testimony from Untimely Designated Witnesses. Exhibits 12, 15, 26-51, 59 and 60 on Defendant-Intervenors exhibit list (see ECF No. 90) are EXCLUDED.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER. The Court GRANTS the Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Exhibit 76 and ORDERS the Clerk's Office to withdraw Defendant-Intervenors' Exhibit 76, filed under Dkt. 225-3 at 183-204, from the record.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 321 Letter from Christine Timmon, filed. (SamanthaWarda, 4)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 315 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Mark H Lynch as to Proposed Amicus Kevin Johnson re: 179 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed. (agarcia, 7)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 313 NOTICE of Filing by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Robins, Jeffrey)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 312 RESPONSE to 311 Notice (Other), Plaintiff States' Response to Defendant-Intervenors' Notice of Filing, filed by Phil Bryant, Paul R. LePage, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia. (Disher, Todd)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 314 Amicus BRIEF by Christine Timmons, filed.(jdav, 4)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 311 NOTICE of Filing by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Perales, Nina)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 310 NOTICE of Filing by L. Francis Cissna, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Robins, Jeffrey)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 309 Amicus Curiae Brief by William F. Reade, Jr.(pro se), filed.(dbenavides, 1)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 308 Supplemental RESPONSE in Opposition to 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez. (Perales, Nina)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 307 SUPPLEMENT by State of New Jersey, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Levine, Kenneth)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 306 Supplemental BRIEF by Phil Bryant, Paul R. LePage, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed.(Disher, Todd)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 305 SUPPLEMENT by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America, filed.(Robins, Jeffrey)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 304 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Mark H Lynch re: 180 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed. (bmendoza, 5)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 303 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 302 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (dnoriega, 1)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 302 TRANSCRIPT re: Hearing held on August 8, 2018 before Judge Andrew S Hanen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathleen Miller. Ordering Party Daniel Hu Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/8/2018., filed. (kmiller, )
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 301 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Texas, et al./Todd Lawrence Disher for Transcript of Preliminary Injunction Hearing on 08/08/18 before Judge Hanen. Daily (24 hours) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kathleen Miller, filed. (Disher, Todd)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 300 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by State of New Jersey/Katherine Anne Gregory for Transcript of Preliminary INJUNCTION HEARING held on 8/8/2018 before Judge Andrew S. Hanen. 3-Day turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kathleen Miller, filed. (Gregory, Katherine)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 299 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Daniel Hu for Transcript of Hearing on 8/08/18. 3-Day turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kathleen Miller, filed. (Hu, Daniel)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 298 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Mark H Lynch as to Proposed Amicus Kevin Johnson re: 182 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed. (rguerrero, 4)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew S Hanen. Preliminary INJUNCTION HEARING held on 8/8/2018. The Court made an opening statement. The Court heard the opening statements of the parties, followed by argument of the parties. The Court ordered the parties to file further briefing not to exceed 5 pages by close of business 8/13/2018. Hearing concluded. Appearances: Todd Disher, Brantley Starr, Adam Biggs, Adam Bitter, Kyle Hawkins, Cristina Moreno, Trent Peroyea, Nina Perales, Rachel Apter, Ken Levine, Celina Moreno, Alejandra Avila, Emerson Siegle, Douglas Hallward-Driemeier, Carlos Garcia, Brett Shumate, Jeffrey Robins, Daniel Hu.(Court Reporter: K. Miller), filed.(rhawkins)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 294 RESPONSE in Opposition to 287 Opposed MOTION Motion to Deny or Defer Consideration of Summary Judgment, filed by Phil Bryant, Paul R. LePage, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia. (Disher, Todd)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 297 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Mark H Lynch as to Proposed Amicus Kevin Johnson re: 183 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed. (bmendoza, 5)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 296 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Mark H Lynch re: 181 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed. (jmarks, 2)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 295 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Mark H Lynch as to Proposed Amicus Kevin Johnson re: 178 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed. (dnoriega, 1)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 293 NOTICE of Filing by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America, filed. (Robins, Jeffrey)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 292 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/27/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
August 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 291 Supplemental EXHIBITS by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 151, # 2 Exhibit 306)(Perales, Nina)
August 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 290 Supplemental APPENDIX re: 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Phil Bryant, Paul R. LePage, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 68)(Disher, Todd)
August 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 289 APPENDIX re: 288 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Volume 1, # 2 Volume 2, # 3 Volume 3, # 4 Volume 4, # 5 Volume 5)(Perales, Nina)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 288 Supplemental RESPONSE in Opposition to 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez. (Perales, Nina)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 287 Opposed MOTION Motion to Deny or Defer Consideration of Summary Judgment by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/24/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 286 Opposed REPLY to Response to 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by State of New Jersey. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Juzdan, Paul)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 285 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by State of New Jersey, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/24/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Levine, Kenneth)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 284 APPENDIX re: 282 Brief, by Phil Bryant, Paul R. LePage, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 43, # 2 Exhibit 44, # 3 Exhibit 45, # 4 Exhibit 46, # 5 Exhibit 47, # 6 Exhibit 48, # 7 Exhibit 49, # 8 Exhibit 50, # 9 Exhibit 51, # 10 Exhibit 52, # 11 Exhibit 53, # 12 Exhibit 54, # 13 Exhibit 55, # 14 Exhibit 56, # 15 Exhibit 57, # 16 Exhibit 58, # 17 Exhibit 59, # 18 Exhibit 60, # 19 Exhibit 61, # 20 Exhibit 62, # 21 Exhibit 63, # 22 Exhibit 64, # 23 Exhibit 65, # 24 Exhibit 66, # 25 Exhibit 67)(Disher, Todd)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 283 NOTICE of Filing by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Robins, Jeffrey)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 282 BRIEF Post-Discovery Response Brief re: 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Phil Bryant, Paul R. LePage, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed.(Disher, Todd)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 281 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/24/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 280 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Phil Bryant, Paul R. LePage, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/24/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Disher, Todd)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER GRANTING 276 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO JOIN BRIEF OF AMICI CURIAE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 278 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 277 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (jtabares, 1)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 277 TRANSCRIPT re: Scheduling Conference Hearing held on May 30, 2018 before Judge Andrew S Hanen. Court Reporter/Transcriber sperales. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2018., filed. (sperales, )
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 276 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Join Brief of Amici Curiae by American Business Immigration Coalition, Ascension Texas, Dallas Regional Chamber, Dallas Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Irving-Las Colinas Chamber of Commerce, Health Management Systems, National Association for Latino Community Asset Builders, San Antonio Chamber of Commerce, Texas Opportunity Roundtable, Texas Restaurant Association, VisitDallas, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/22/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Leatherbury, Thomas)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 275 REPLY in Support of 118 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, filed by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez. (Perales, Nina)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER. The date for Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint is hereby extended 30 days after the Court rules on the pending Application for Preliminary Injunction. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
July 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 273 RESPONSE in Opposition to 272 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, filed by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez. (Perales, Nina)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 272 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/17/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Robins, Jeffrey)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER denying 255 Motion for Entry of Protective Order. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(mperez, 1)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER granting 267 Joint Motion for Extending the Post-Discovery Response Brief Filing Deadline Responses due by 8/3/2018. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(mperez, 1)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 269 REPLY in Support of 255 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order, filed by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez. (Perales, Nina)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 268 RESPONSE in Opposition to 267 Renewed MOTION for Extension of Time, filed by Phil Bryant, Paul R. LePage, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia. (Bitter, Adam)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 267 Renewed MOTION for Extension of Time by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/16/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER denying 259 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court hereby denies Defendant-Intervenors motion without prejudice for failing to include a certificate of conference. Defendant-Intervenors shall confer with counsel for each other party in the case before refiling the motion.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER granting 147 Motion for Monique Sherman to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Proposed Amici Legal Services Organization.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER granting 146 Motion for Maureen Alger to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Proposed Amici Legal Services Organization..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER granting 149 Motion for Joan Li to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Proposed Amici Legal Services Organization.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 261 RESPONSE in Opposition to 259 MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend the Post-Discovery Response Brief Filing Deadline, filed by Phil Bryant, Paul R. LePage, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia. (Disher, Todd)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER granting 203 Motion for Karen W. Lin to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Proposed Amici Companies and Associations.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 259 MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend the Post-Discovery Response Brief Filing Deadline by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/16/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 258 RESPONSE in Opposition to 255 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order, filed by Phil Bryant, Paul R. LePage, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Disher, Todd)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER granting 148 Motion for Michael McMahon to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Proposed Amici Legal Services Orgainzation.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER granting 138 Motion for Discovery.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 256 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 255 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/15/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 253 BRIEF in support of defendant-intervenor's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for a preliminary Injuction by United We Dream, filed.(scastillo, 1)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER granting 184 Motion for Leave to File.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(scastillo, 1)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER granting 233 Motion for Sirine Shebaya to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(scastillo, 1)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER granting 232 Motion for Juvaria Khan to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(scastillo, 1)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER granting 231 Motion for Johnathan James Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(scastillo, 1)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER granting 223 Motion for Chirag G. Badlani to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(scastillo, 1)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER granting 202 Motion for Lauren Goldman to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(scastillo, 1)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER granting 164 Motion. Defendant-Intervenor State of New Jersey shall be permitted to file a "Post- Discovery" Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction of up to 49 pages.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(scastillo, 1) Modified on 7/24/2018 (scastillo, 1).
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER granting 190 Motion for Leave to File; 191 Motion for Leave to File; 192 Motion for Leave to File; 195 Motion for Leave to File; 197 Motion for Leave to File; 204 Motion for Leave to File; 206 Motion for Leave to File; 207 Motion for Leave to File; 209 Motion for Leave to File 213 Motion for Leave to File; 214 Motion for Leave to File; 216 Motion for Leave to File 221 Motion for Leave to File; 222 Motion for Leave to File; 236 Motion.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(scastillo, 1)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER granting 201 Motion for Andrew J. Pincus to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(scastillo, 1)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER granting 199 Motion for Anton Metitsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(scastillo, 1)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER granting 198 Motion for Jennifer Sokoler to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(scastillo, 1)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 239 Second REPLY in Support of 91 Opposed MOTION for Discovery, 138 Renewed MOTION for Discovery, filed by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez. (Perales, Nina)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER granting 230 Motion for MARY KELLY PERSYN to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(scastillo, 1) Modified on 7/24/2018 (scastillo, 1).
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 254 MEMORANDUM of law of American Professional Society of the Abuse of Children in support of unopposed motion for leave to file a brief Amicus Curiae in support of defendant -intervenors, filed.(scastillo, 1)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER granting 205 Motion to exceed page limits.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(scastillo, 1)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER denying 168 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(scastillo, 1)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ANSWER to 104 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed.(Perales, Nina)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 236 Unopposed MOTION Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae by National Immigrant Justice Center, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/13/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Appendix Appendix of Authorities)(Roth, Charles)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 235 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE by National Immigrant Justice Center, filed.(Roth, Charles)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ANSWER to 104 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by State of New Jersey, filed.(Juzdan, Paul)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MOTION for Sirine Shebaya to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Proposed Amici Religious Organizations, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/13/2018. (rnieto, 1) (verified) Modified on 7/23/2018 (rnieto, 1).
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 232 MOTION for Juvaria Khan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Proposed Amici Religious Organizations, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/13/2018. (rnieto, 1) (verified) Modified on 7/23/2018 (rnieto, 1).
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 231 MOTION for Johnathan James Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Proposed Amici Religious Organizations, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/13/2018. (rnieto, 1) (verified) Modified on 7/23/2018 (rnieto, 1).
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 230 MOTION for Mary Kelly Persyn to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Karla Perez-Defendant-Intervenors and State of New Jersey-Defendant-Intervenor, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/13/2018. (rnieto, 1) (verified) Modified on 7/23/2018 (rnieto, 1).
July 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER granting 166 Defendant-Intervenors' Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limits.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
July 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER granting 185 Plaintiff States' Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limits.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
July 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 227 Supplemental APPENDIX re: 224 Response in Opposition to Motion,, by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Volume 11, # 2 Volume 12, # 3 Volume 13)(Perales, Nina)
July 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 226 Supplemental APPENDIX re: 224 Response in Opposition to Motion,, by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Volume 8, # 2 Volume 9, # 3 Volume 10)(Perales, Nina)
July 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 225 Supplemental APPENDIX re: 224 Response in Opposition to Motion,, by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Volume 2, # 2 Volume 3, # 3 Volume 4, # 4 Volume 5, # 5 Volume 6, # 6 Volume 7)(Perales, Nina)
July 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 224 RESPONSE in Opposition to 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Table of Contents, # 2 Affidavit Volume 1)(Perales, Nina)
July 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 223 MOTION for Chirag G. Badlani to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Current and Former Prosecutors and Law Enforcement Leaders, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/13/2018. (Badlani, Chirag) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2018: # 1 Atty License Verification) (csustaeta, 1).
July 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae by Current and Former Prosecutors and Law Enforcement Leaders, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/13/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Brief, # 2 Proposed Order)(Badlani, Chirag)
July 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 221 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief by Brazoria County Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, El Paso Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Greater Austin Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Houston Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, International Bancshares Corporation, Marek Brothers Construction, Inc., Midland Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Rio Grande Valley Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, San Antonio Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Southwest Airlines, Texas Association of Business, Texas Border Coalition, United Airlines, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/13/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amici Curiae Brief, # 2 Appendix of Amici Curiae Brief, # 3 Proposed Order re Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief)(Leatherbury, Thomas)
July 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 220 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas S. Leatherbury on behalf of Houston Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Texas Association of Business, Brazoria County Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, El Paso Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Greater Austin Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, International Bancshares Corporation, Marek Brothers Construction, Inc., Midland Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Rio Grande Valley Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, San Antonio Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Southwest Airlines, Texas Border Coalition, United Airlines, Inc., filed. (Leatherbury, Thomas)
July 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 219 Supplemental APPENDIX re: 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Phil Bryant, Paul R. LePage, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 21, # 2 Exhibit 22, # 3 Exhibit 23, # 4 Exhibit 24, # 5 Exhibit 25, # 6 Exhibit 26, # 7 Exhibit 27, # 8 Exhibit 28, # 9 Exhibit 29, # 10 Exhibit 30, # 11 Exhibit 31, # 12 Exhibit 32, # 13 Exhibit 33, # 14 Exhibit 34, # 15 Exhibit 35, # 16 Exhibit 36, # 17 Exhibit 37, # 18 Exhibit 38, # 19 Exhibit 39, # 20 Exhibit 40, # 21 Exhibit 41, # 22 Exhibit 42)(Disher, Todd)
July 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 218 BRIEF Post-Discovery Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction re: 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Phil Bryant, Paul R. LePage, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed.(Disher, Todd)
July 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 217 Supplemental RESPONSE to 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Robins, Jeffrey)
July 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 216 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief by Proposed Amici Health Care Professionals, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/13/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amici Curiae Brief, # 2 Proposed Order)(Lustberg, Lawrence)
July 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 215 Opposed RESPONSE in Opposition to 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by State of New Jersey. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Juzdan, Paul)
July 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 214 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by The Legal Aid Society, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/13/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amicus Brief, # 2 Appendix to Proposed Amicus Brief, # 3 Proposed Order)(Kolodner, Jonathan)
July 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 213 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Proposed Amici Public Interest Groups, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/13/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Amicus Brief, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ertas, Alper)
July 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 212 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief by Proposed Amici Health Care Professionals, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/13/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amici Curiae Brief, # 2 Proposed Order)(Lustberg, Lawrence)
July 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 211 RESPONSE to 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Proposed Amici Public Interest Groups. (Garza, Jose)
July 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 210 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence S. Lustberg on behalf of Proposed Amici Health Care Professionals, filed. (Lustberg, Lawrence)
July 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 209 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum of Law as Amici Curiae, Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages( Motion Docket Date 8/13/2018.) by Proposed Amici States, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Proposed Order)(Amend, Andrew)
July 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 208 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W. Amend on behalf of Proposed Amici States, filed. (Amend, Andrew)
July 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 207 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief by Proposed Amicus Kevin Johnson, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/13/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amici Curiae Brief, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave)(Davidson, Jeffrey)
July 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 206 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File to File Brief as Amici Curiae by Proposed Amici Institutions of Higher Education, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/13/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit BRIEF FOR AMICI CURIAE RICE UNIVERSITY AND OTHER INSTITUTIONS OF HIGHER EDUCATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT-INTERVENORS, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ramon, Sofia) Modified on 7/23/2018 (JenniferLongoria, 1).
July 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Unopposed AMENDED 166 MOTION by Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/13/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
July 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 204 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief by Proposed Amici Companies and Associations, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/13/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amici Curiae Brief, # 2 Appendix of Amici Curiae Brief - Table of Contents, # 3 Appendix of Amici Curiae Brief - Volume 1, # 4 Appendix of Amici Curiae Brief - Volume 2, # 5 Appendix of Amici Curiae Brief - Volume 3, # 6 Proposed Order re Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief)(Ranlett, Kevin)
July 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MOTION for Karen W. Lin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Proposed Amici Companies and Associations, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/13/2018. (Ranlett, Kevin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2018: # 1 Atty License Verification) (csustaeta, 1).
July 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 202 MOTION for Lauren Goldman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Proposed Amici Companies and Associations, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/13/2018. (Ranlett, Kevin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2018: # 1 Atty License Verification) (csustaeta, 1).
July 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 201 MOTION for Andrew J. Pincus to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Proposed Amici Companies and Associations, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/13/2018. (Ranlett, Kevin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2018: # 1 Atty License Verification) (csustaeta, 1).
July 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 200 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE by Proposed Amici Companies and Associations, filed.(Ranlett, Kevin)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MOTION for Anton Metlitsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brown University, California Institute of Technology, Columbia University, Cornell University, Dartmouth College, Duke University, Emory University, George Washington University, Georgetown University, Harvard University, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Northwestern University, Princeton University, Stanford University, University of Chicago, University of Pennsylvania, Vanderbilt University, Washington University in St. Louis, Yale University, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/10/2018. (Yagura, Ryan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2018: # 1 Atty License Verification) (csustaeta, 1).
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 198 MOTION for Jennifer Sokoler to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brown University, California Institute of Technology, Columbia University, Cornell University, Dartmouth College, Duke University, Emory University, George Washington University, Georgetown University, Harvard University, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Northwestern University, Princeton University, Stanford University, University of Chicago, University of Pennsylvania, Vanderbilt University, Washington University in St. Louis, Yale University, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/10/2018. (Yagura, Ryan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2018: # 1 Atty License Verification) (csustaeta, 1).
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae Nineteen Universities in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by Brown University, California Institute of Technology, Columbia University, Cornell University, Dartmouth College, Duke University, Emory University, George Washington University, Georgetown University, Harvard University, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Northwestern University, Princeton University, Stanford University, University of Chicago, University of Pennsylvania, Vanderbilt University, Washington University in St. Louis, Yale University, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/10/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Proposed Order)(Yagura, Ryan)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 196 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan K. Yagura on behalf of Brown University, California Institute of Technology, Columbia University, Cornell University, Dartmouth College, Duke University, Emory University, Georgetown University, George Washington University, Harvard University, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Northwestern University, Princeton University, Stanford University, University of Chicago, University of Pennsylvania, Vanderbilt University, Washington University in St. Louis, Yale University, filed. (Yagura, Ryan)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 195 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief (Legal Services Organizations) by Proposed Amici Legal Services Organization, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/10/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Amici Curiae Brief (Legal Services Organizations), # 2 Appendix Appendix of Amici Curiae Brief, # 3 Proposed Order)(Attanasio, Michael)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 194 RESPONSE to 118 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America. (Robins, Jeffrey)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 193 RESPONSE to 118 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by State of New Jersey. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Juzdan, Paul)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 192 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Brief by Proposed Amici New Jersey Businesses, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/10/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Amicus Brief, # 2 Proposed Order)(Leit, David)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 191 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus brief by Proposed Amici Religious Organizations, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/10/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Adeel A. Mangi, # 2 Exhibit A, (proposed) Amicus brief)(Mangi, Adeel)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by U.S. Rep. Steve King, et al., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/10/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Amicus Brief, # 2 Proposed Order)(Schlafly, Andrew)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 189 RESPONSE to 138 Renewed MOTION for Discovery filed by Phil Bryant, Paul R. LePage, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia. (Disher, Todd)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 188 RESPONSE in Opposition to 118 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, filed by Phil Bryant, Paul R. LePage, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Disher, Todd)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 187 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE by The Legal Aid Society, filed.(DeGroote, Jessa)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE by The Legal Aid Society, filed.(Kolodner, Jonathan)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 185 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Phil Bryant, Paul R. LePage, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/10/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Disher, Todd)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 184 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus brief by United We Dream, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/10/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Amicus brief, # 2 Proposed Order)(Karanjia, Peter)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER granting 175 Motion for Martin L. Saad to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER granting 176 Motion for Sameer P Sheikh to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER granting 172 Motion for Jonathan Samuel Kolodner to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER granting 174 Motion for William D. Coston to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER granting 173 Motion for Mark H. Lynch to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER granting 170 Motion for Jeffrey M. Davidson to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER granting 169 Motion for Andrew W. Amend to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MOTION for Sameer P. Sheikh to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Proposed Amici Public Interest Groups, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/9/2018. (jdav, 4)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MOTION for Martin L. Saad to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Proposed Amici Public Interest Groups, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/9/2018. (jdav, 4)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MOTION for William D. Coston to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Proposed Amici Public Interest Groups, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/9/2018. (jdav, 4)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MOTION for Mark H. Lynch to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Proposed Amicus Kevin Johnson, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/9/2018. (jtabares, 1)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MOTION for Jonathan Samuel Kolodner to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Proposed Amicus Curia The Legal Aid Society, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/9/2018. (jtabares, 1)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 171 RESPONSE in Opposition to 168 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Answer, filed by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez. (Perales, Nina)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MOTION for Jeffrey M. Davidson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Proposed Amicus Kevin Johnson, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/8/2018. (jtabares, 1)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MOTION for Andrew W. Amend to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Proposed Amici States, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/8/2018. (jtabares, 1)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Answer by Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/8/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Goldsmith, Aaron)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER entered. Should any party wish to respond to this motion, any such response shall be filed on or before 7/20/2018 at 5:00 PM, Central Daylight Time.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/8/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 165 REPLY in Support of 138 Renewed MOTION for Discovery, filed by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez. (Perales, Nina)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 164 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by State of New Jersey, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/7/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Levine, Kenneth)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting 150 Motion for Peter Karanjia to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting 151 Motion for Geoffrey S. Brounell to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER entered. The Preliminary Injunction Hearing scheduled to take place on 8/8/2018 at 10:00 AM will now be held in Houston, Texas, in Courtroom 9C before Judge Andrew S Hanen. In light of the Preliminary Injunction hearing, the initial pretrial conference scheduled for 7/31/2018, is hereby canceled. No joint case management plan need be filed.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting 142 Motion for Michael N. Fresco to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting 145 Motion for Jessa DeGroote to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER granting 144 Motion for Hasan Shafiqullah to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting 143 Motion for Lawrence S. Lustberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting 141 Motion for Adeel A. Mangi to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting 140 Motion for Zachary Kolodin to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting 132 Motion for David Leit to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting 131 Motion for Craig Dashiell to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting 130 Motion for Gavin J. Rooney to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MOTION for Geoffrey S. Brounell to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Proposed Amicus United We Dream, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/6/2018. (DesireeSillas, 4)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MOTION for Peter Karanjia to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Proposed Amicus United We Dream, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/6/2018. (dbenavides, 1)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MOTION for Joan R. Li to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Proposed Amici Legal Services Organization, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/6/2018. (Attanasio, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/18/2018: # 1 Verified Status of Bar Membership for Motion Pro Hac Vice) (jtabares, 1).
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MOTION for Michael J. McMahon to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Proposed Amici Legal Services Organization, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/6/2018. (Attanasio, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/18/2018: # 1 Verified Status of Bar Membership for Motion Pro Hac Vice) (jtabares, 1).
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MOTION for Monique R. Sherman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Proposed Amici Legal Services Organization, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/6/2018. (Attanasio, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/18/2018: # 1 Verified Status of Bar Membership for Motion Pro Hac Vice) (jtabares, 1).
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MOTION for Maureen P. Alger to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Proposed Amici Legal Services Organization, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/6/2018. (Attanasio, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/18/2018: # 1 Verified Status of Bar Membership for Motion Pro Hac Vice) (jtabares, 1).
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MOTION for Jessa Irene DeGroote to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Legal Aid Society, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/6/2018. Verified Status of Bar Membership for Motion Pro Hac Vice.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MOTION for Hasan Shafiqullah to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Legal Aid Society, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/6/2018. Verified Status of Bar Membership for Motion Pro Hac Vice.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MOTION for Lawrence S. Lustberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Proposed Amici Health Care Professionals, filed. (Verified) Motion Docket Date 8/3/2018. (dbenavides, 1)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MOTION for Michael N Fresco to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Proposed Amici Religious Organizations, filed. (verified) Motion Docket Date 8/3/2018. (dbenavides, 1)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MOTION for Adeel A. Mangi to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Proposed Amici Religious Organizations, filed. (verified) Motion Docket Date 8/3/2018. (dbenavides, 1)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MOTION for Zachary Kolodin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Proposed Amici Religious Organizations, filed. (verified) Motion Docket Date 8/3/2018. (dbenavides, 1)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 RESPONSE in Opposition to 138 Renewed MOTION for Discovery, filed by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Robins, Jeffrey)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Renewed MOTION for Discovery by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/1/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Perales, Nina)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 RESPONSE in Opposition to 135 MOTION to Enforce July 2, 2018 Order and Quash Subpoena to the President of the National Citizenship and Immigration Council of the AFGE, AFL-CIO as to 116 Order on Motion for Discovery,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time,, filed by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Perales, Nina)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting 135 Motion to Enforce. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(csustaeta, 1)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MOTION to Enforce July 2, 2018 Order and Quash Subpoena to the President of the National Citizenship and Immigration Council of the AFGE, AFL-CIO as to 116 Order on Motion for Discovery,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time, by Phil Bryant, Paul R. LePage, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/1/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Proposed Order)(Disher, Todd)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting 108 Motion for Brian De Vito to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting 106 Motion for Aaron S. Goldsmith to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MOTION for David Leit to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Proposed Amici New Jersey Businesses filed. (verified) Motion Docket Date 8/1/2018. (dbenavides, 1)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MOTION for Craig Dashiell to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Proposed Amici New Jersey Businesses, (verified) filed. Motion Docket Date 8/1/2018. (dbenavides, 1)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MOTION for Gavin J. Rooney to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Proposed Amici New Jersey Businesses, filed. (verified) Motion Docket Date 8/1/2018. (dbenavides, 1)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting 123 Motion for Lindsay C. Harrison to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting 122 Motion for Ishan K. Bhabha to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting 121 Motion for Thomas J. Perrelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting 124 Motion for Jennifer J. Yun to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting 119 Motion for Douglas H. Hallward-Driemeier to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MOTION for Jennifer J. Yun to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Proposed Amici Institutions of Higher Education, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/30/2018. (verified) (dbenavides, 1) Modified on 7/9/2018 (dbenavides, 1).
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MOTION for Lindsay C. Harrison to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Proposed Amici Institutions of Higher Education, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/30/2018. (verified) (dbenavides, 1) Modified on 7/9/2018 (dbenavides, 1).
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MOTION for Ishan K Bhahba to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Proposed Amici Institutions of Higher Education, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/30/2018. (verified) (dbenavides, 1) Modified on 7/9/2018 (dbenavides, 1).
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MOTION for Thomas J. Perrelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Proposed Amici Institutions of Higher Education, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/30/2018. (verified) (dbenavides, 1) Modified on 7/9/2018 (dbenavides, 1).
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER entered ; Motion-related deadline set re: 118 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Responses due by 7/20/2018.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MOTION for Douglas H. Hallward-Driemeier to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/26/2018. (Perales, Nina) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/6/2018: # 1 Attorney Verification) (scastillo, 1).
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/26/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, # 2 Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting 115 Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ordered that the date for defendants to respond to plaintiffs' amended complaint, filed 6/25/2018, is hereby extended to 7/23/2018.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER denying 91 Motion for Discovery; granting 107 Motion for Extension of Time. Discovery from the Federal Defendants must be completed by 7/13/2018. The Preliminary Injunction hearing will be on 8/8/2018 at 10:00 AM. The hearing will be held in Brownsville, Texas unless counsel are notified otherwise..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MOTION for Extension of Time File an Answer by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/23/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Goldsmith, Aaron)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 111 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (JenniferLongoria, 1)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order ***Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Injunction Hearing set for 8/8/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Andrew S Hanen (dnoriega, 1)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by United States of America et al for Transcript of 06/28/2018. 3-Day turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, filed. (Goldsmith, Aaron) Modified on 7/2/2018 (dnoriega, 1). Electronically forwarded to Exceptional on 7/2/2018. Estimated Transcript Completion Date: 7/2/2018.
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Nina Perales for Transcript of Telephone Conference, 06/28/2018, Judge Andrew Hanen. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, filed. (Perales, Nina) Modified on 7/2/2018 (dnoriega, 1). Electronically forwarded to Exceptional on 7/2/2018. Transcript Completion Date: 7/6/2018.
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 TRANSCRIPT re: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 6/28/18 before Judge Andrew S Hanen. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party JUDGE ANDREW S. HANEN Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/27/2018., filed. (thudson, )
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Judge Hanen for Transcript of Telephonic Conference held on 6-28-18 before Judge Andrew S. Hanen. Hourly turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, filed. (rnieto, 1)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Cross MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Evidence of Non-Disclosed Witnesses by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/19/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MOTION for Brian DeVito to Appear Pro Hac Vice by State of New Jersey, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/19/2018. (Levine, Kenneth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/28/2018: # 1 Atty License Verification) (csustaeta, 1).
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew S Hanen. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 6/28/2018. Appearances: T. Disher, Atty f/Plaintiffs; A. Goldsmith, Atty f/Defendants; N. Perales, Atty f/Intervenor Defendants; R. Apter, Atty f/State of New Jersey;(ERO:Juanita Tabares)(02:00-02:23) All Parties participated telephonically. Plaintiffs Attorney T.Disher said no pending motions to be addressed today. 109 Cross Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs Evidence of Non-Disclosed Witnesses addressed. Denied depositions as to certain witnesses depending on answers w/o prejudice. 106 Motion for Aaron S. Goldsmith-GRANTED. 107 Opposed Motion for Extension of Time Post-discovery briefing by State of New Jersey-GRANTED. Court adopts the dates on on motion 107 Discovery Cutoff- due 07/13/18; Post-discovery briefing due 07/21818; Responses to post-discovery briefing due 07/27/18 and Hearing reset to 08/08/18. Court is interested in certain things and those items where discussed. Discussion held as to deposition. Telephone conference ended., filed.(csustaeta, 1)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time Post-discovery briefing by State of New Jersey, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/18/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Order in NAACP v. Trump, # 2 Proposed Order)(Apter, Rachel)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MOTION for Aaron S. Goldsmith to Appear Pro Hac Vice by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/17/2018. (Goldsmith, Aaron) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/28/2018: # 1 Atty License Verification) (csustaeta, 1).
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Opposed MOTION to Exclude Testimony from Untimely Designated Witnesses by State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/16/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Disher, Todd)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by State of Texas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of West Virginia, State of Arkansas, State of South Carolina, State of Alabama. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by State of Alabama, State of Texas, State of Arkansas, State of Nebraska, State of West Virginia, State of South Carolina, State of Louisiana.(dbenavides, 1)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting 84 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and granting the States of New Jersey's Amended Motion for leave to Intervene 42 .(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(dbenavides, 1)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 REPLY in Support of 91 Opposed MOTION for Discovery, filed by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez. (Perales, Nina)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 RESPONSE in Opposition to 91 Opposed MOTION for Discovery, filed by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Robins, Jeffrey)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE of Filing by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Robins, Jeffrey)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 RESPONSE in Opposition to 91 Opposed MOTION for Discovery, filed by State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bitter, Adam)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 RESPONSE in Opposition to 84 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, filed by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez. (Perales, Nina)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER entered. The federal defendants are not required to respond to the defendant-intervenors' first set of discovery requests; the federal defendants are ordered to respond to defendant-intervenors third set of discovery requests by 7/6/2018; the defendant-intervenors may depose Mr. Kenneth Palinkas; the federal defendants have until the end of Friday, 6/22/2018, to respond to defendant-intervenors' motion for leave to submit teestimony.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 RESPONSE in Opposition to 87 EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION to Quash Deposition Notices and Subpoenas, filed by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez. (Perales, Nina)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 RESPONSE to 91 Opposed MOTION for Discovery filed by State of New Jersey. (Apter, Rachel)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 RESPONSE in Opposition to 80 Supplemental MOTION for Discovery, 65 Opposed MOTION for Discovery, filed by State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia. (Disher, Todd)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by P. Trent Peroyea on behalf of State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. (Disher, Todd)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Cristina M. Moreno on behalf of State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. (Disher, Todd)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew S Hanen. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 6/18/2018. Appearances: Plaintiffs Attys: T.Disher, A.Biggs, T. Peroyea; Defendants Attys: J. Robbins; Intervenor Defendants Attys: N. Perales, E. Herrera; Proposed Defendant Intervenor Attys: K.Levine, R. Wainer Apter, J. Hollander;(Court Reporter: S. Perales)(03:30-03:55). Discussion held as to discovery motions. Court order will follow., filed.(csustaeta, 1)
June 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Opposed MOTION for Discovery by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/9/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Proposed Order Granting Leave to Submit Testimony)(Perales, Nina)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Exhibit List by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez(Perales, Nina)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER entered. Motion-related deadline set re: 84 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Defendant-Intervenors Responses due by 6/21/2018.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(bcampos, 1)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Telephone Conference set for 6/18/2018 at 03:30 PM by telephone before Judge Andrew S Hanen, filed. RE: Discovery Motions. Case Manager will send an email as to the telephone number to call in. (csustaeta, 1)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 EMERGENCY MOTION, MOTION to Quash Deposition Notices and Subpoenas( Motion Docket Date 7/6/2018.) by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Robins, Jeffrey)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Opposed MOTION for Discovery by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/6/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Perales, Nina)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 RESPONSE in Opposition to 80 Supplemental MOTION for Discovery, 65 Opposed MOTION for Discovery, filed by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Robins, Jeffrey)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/5/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Bitter, Adam)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting 78 Motion for Katherine Gregory to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(bcampos, 1)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting 74 Motion for Priscilla Orta to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(bcampos, 1)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting 75 Motion for Nicholas Dolinsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(bcampos, 1) (Main Document 81 replaced on 6/14/2018) (bcampos, 1).
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Supplemental MOTION for Discovery by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/5/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Perales, Nina)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER, entered. Defendant-Intervenors are hereby ordered to file with the Court those discovery devices, and any others for which they request court intervention. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(mperez, 1)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MOTION for Katherine Gregory to Appear Pro Hac Vice by State of New Jersey, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/5/2018. (Levine, Kenneth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2018: # 1 Atty License Verification) (rnieto, 1).
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting 62 Motion for Jeremy Hollander to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(bcampos, 1)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Ernest I. Herrera on behalf of Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. (Perales, Nina)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MOTION for Nicholas Dolinsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice by State of New Jersey, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/3/2018. (Levine, Kenneth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2018: # 1 Atty License Verification) (rnieto, 1).
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MOTION for Priscilla Orta to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/3/2018. (Perales, Nina) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2018: # 1 Atty License Verification) (rnieto, 1).
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 REPLY in Support of 39 MOTION to Intervene, filed by State of New Jersey. (Levine, Kenneth)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting 67 Motion for Denise Hulett to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(mperez, 1)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 RESPONSE to 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Unreported Authorities)(Robins, Jeffrey)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM of Law re: 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by U.S. Rep. Steve King, et al., filed.(dnoriega, 1)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 64 Motion for Leave to File.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 RESPONSE in Opposition to 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez. (Perales, Nina)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION for Denise Hulett to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/29/2018. (Perales, Nina) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2018: # 1 Atty License Verifification) (rnieto, 1).
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 RESPONSE to 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by State of New Jersey. (Levine, Kenneth)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Opposed MOTION for Discovery by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/28/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Email Exchange, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Granted Leave to Defendant-Intervenors to Conduct Discovery of Federal Defendants)(Perales, Nina)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by U.S. Rep. Steve King, et al., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/28/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Amicus Brief, # 2 Proposed Order)(Schlafly, Andrew)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew L. Schlafly on behalf of U.S. Rep. Steve King, et al., filed. (Schlafly, Andrew)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION for Jeremy E. Hollander to Appear Pro Hac Vice by State of New Jersey, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/28/2018. (Levine, Kenneth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2018: # 1 Vertified Status of Bar Membership for Motion Pro Hac Vice)) (jtabares, 1).
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 RESPONSE in Opposition to 39 MOTION to Intervene, filed by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America. (Robins, Jeffrey)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 RESPONSE in Opposition to 39 MOTION to Intervene, filed by State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia. (Disher, Todd)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 58 Motion for Lawrence J. Joseph to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MOTION for Lawrence J. Joseph to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of party U.S. Rep. Steve King et al (amicus coalition of Members of Congress), filed. Motion Docket Date 6/26/2018. (dbenavides, 1)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Proposed Defendant Intervenor State of New Jersey/Rachel Wainer Apter for Transcript of Scheduling Conference on 5/30/18 before Judge Hanen. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sheila Perales, filed. (Apter, Rachel)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Daniel Hu for Transcript of Initial Pretrial Conference on 5/30/18 before Judge Hanen. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sheila Perales, filed. (Hu, Daniel)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Nina Perales for Transcript of Initial Pretrial Conference on 05/30/2018 before Hon. Andrew S. Hanen. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sheila Perales, filed. (Perales, Nina)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Todd Lawrence Disher for Transcript of Initial Pretrial Conference on 05/30/18 before Hon. Andrew S. Hanen. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sheila Perales, filed. (Disher, Todd)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying 51 Motion to Dismiss; Response to New Jersey's motion to intervene is due 6/6/2018; response to plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction due 6/8/2018; reply to response to New Jersey's motion to intervene due 6/11/2018; experts must be disclosed by 6/15/2018; discovery must be completed by 6/29/2018; post-discovery briefing is due 7/7/2018; responses to post-discovery briefings are due 7/13/2018; Preliminary Injunction Hearing is set for 11:00 AM in Brownsville unless changed by subsequent order on 7/17/2018.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew S Hanen. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 5/30/2018. Appearances: Attys for Plaintiffs: T. Disher, A. Biggs, B. Starr; Attys for Defendants: J. Robbins, D. Hu, B. Shumate; Attys for Intervenor Defendants: N. Perales, C. Garcia, J. Salmon; Atty for Proposed Defendant-Intervenor: R. Apter. (Court Reporter: S. Perales)(11:05-12:05). Oral argument as to 39 Motion to Intervene by State of New Jersey - objected by Plaintiffs and Defendants; Intervenor Defendants No Objections. 39 under advisement by Court. As to 39 Plaintiffs Response Brief due June 6, 2018 and Proposed Defendant-Intervenor reply due June 11, 2018. Oral argument as to 51 Opposed Motion to Dismiss filed by Intervenors Defendants - DENIED w/o prejudice and leave is given by court allowing Intervenors Defendants to bring up motion at a later time. Oral argument as to 36 Motion for Scheduling Order heard. Hearing set for 7/17/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 6 before Judge Andrew S Hanen. Court order will follow. filed.(csustaeta, 1)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order ***Set/Reset Deadlines as to 39 MOTION to Intervene, 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Responses due by 6/8/2018. Replies due by 6/11/2018 (dnoriega, 1)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order ***Set/Reset Deadlines as to 39 MOTION to Intervene : Deft Expert Report due by 6/15/2018. Deft Expert Witness List due by 6/15/2018. Discovery due by 6/29/2018. Pltf Expert Report due by 6/15/2018. Pltf Expert Witness List due by 6/15/2018. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 7/17/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6 before Judge Andrew S Hanen Responses due by 6/6/2018. (dnoriega, 1)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM re: 51 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice or, in the Alternative, to Transfer or Stay Proceedings by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15)(Perales, Nina)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice or, in the Alternative, to Transfer or Stay Proceedings by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/19/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ADVISORY by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Salmon, John)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STATUS REPORT by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America, filed.(Robins, Jeffrey)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Opposed PROPOSED ORDER by Proposed Defendant-Intervenor State of New Jersey, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Exhibit 1 Proposed Order)(Apter, Rachel)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER re: 39 Motion to Intervene as a Defendant. Lead counsel for the proposed defendant-interveners is hereby ordered to attend the status conference scheduled for 11:00 AM, Wednesday, May 30th, 2018.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 REPLY in Support of 36 MOTION for Scheduling Order, filed by State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia. (Bitter, Adam)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 41 Motion for Paul H. Juzdan to Appear Pro Hac Vice for State of New Jersey. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 33 Motion for Rachel Walner Apter to Appear Pro Hac Vice for State of New Jersey. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 32 Motion for Kenneth S. Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice for State of New Jersey. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 AMENDED MEMORANDUM In Support of Proposed Defendant Intervenor's 39 Motion to Intervene by State of New Jersey, filed.(gkelner, 4)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION for Paul H Juzdan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by State of New Jersey, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/11/2018. (hler, 4)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM re: 39 MOTION to Intervene by State of New Jersey, filed.(hler, 4)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION to Intervene by State of New Jersey, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/11/2018. (hler, 4)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition to 36 MOTION for Scheduling Order, filed by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez. (Perales, Nina)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam N. Bitter on behalf of State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. (Bitter, Adam)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION for Scheduling Order by State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/11/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Disher, Todd)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 34 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (scastillo, 1)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TRANSCRIPT re: Telephonic Conference held on May 15, 2018 before Judge Andrew S Hanen. Court Reporter/Transcriber sperales. Ordering Party Ms. Karen C. Tumlin Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2018., filed. (sperales, )
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION for Rachel Wainer Apter to Appear Pro Hac Vice by State of New Jersey, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/7/2018. (scastillo, 1)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Kenneth S. Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice by State of New Jersey, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/7/2018. (scastillo, 1)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Nina Perales for Transcript of Scheduling Conference by phone on 05/15/18 before Judge Hanen. Daily (24 hours) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sheila Perales, filed. (Perales, Nina)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Carla L. Provost served on 5/16/2018, answer due 7/16/2018, filed.(Disher, Todd)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to L. Francis Cissna served on 5/16/2018, answer due 7/16/2018, filed.(Disher, Todd)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Thomas D. Homan served on 5/16/2018, answer due 7/16/2018, filed.(Disher, Todd)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Kevin K. McAleenan served on 5/16/2018, answer due 7/16/2018, filed.(Disher, Todd)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Kirstjen M. Nielsen served on 5/16/2018, answer due 7/16/2018, filed.(Disher, Todd)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to United States of America served on 5/16/2018, answer due 7/16/2018, filed.(Disher, Todd)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed.(Disher, Todd)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Defendants-Intervenors Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed.(jtabares, 1)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 13 Motion to Intervene. The Court having considered the papers submitted in connection with said motion, and such other relevant information and evidence as was presented to this Court, and good cause appearing, it is hereby ordered that: (1) Motion for Leave to Intervene is granted; (2) Movants be entered as Defendant-Intervenors and their counsel served with all relevant papers in the above-captioned action; and (3) The Clerk of Court shall docket Movants' Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint, attached as Exhibit 1 to Movants' Motion for Leave to Intervene..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jtabares, 1)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 20 Motion for Brett A. Shumate to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(dbenavides, 1)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew S Hanen. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 5/15/2018. Appearances: Attys for Plaintiff: T.Disher, A.Biggs, B.Starr; Attys for Defts: J. Robins, D. Hu, B.Shumate; Attys for Intervenos: N.Perales, C. Moreno, J. Salmon;(Court Reporter: S. Perales)(10:30-10:40). 13 Motion to Intervene not opposed by parties-GRANTED. 20 Motion for Brett A. Shumate to Appear Pro Hac Vice-GRANTED. Parties are to submit an agreed scheduling order as to 5 Preliminary Injuction by 05/25/18. If parties do not agree to a scheduling order each party is to submit their own scheduling order by 05/25/18. Scheduling Conference set for 05/30/18 at 11:00 am in Brownsville., filed.(csustaeta, 1)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order ***Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 5/30/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6 before Judge Andrew S Hanen in Brownsville, Tx. (csustaeta, 1)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Brett A. Shumate to Appear Pro Hac Vice by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/4/2018. (Robins, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2018: # 1 Verified membership status) (bcampos, 1).
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Brantley Starr on behalf of State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. (Starr, Brantley)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Arthur Biggs on behalf of State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. (Biggs, Adam)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel D. Hu on behalf of L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America, filed. (Hu, Daniel)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(dbenavides, 1)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER entered by the Court. The Court will hold a Scheduling Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 10:30 AM before Judge Andrew S Hanen. The District Clerk's Office will provide each counsel with the appropriate call-in-number. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(dbenavides, 1)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order *** Emailed sent to parties with the appropriate call-in number as per 15 Order., filed. (csustaeta, 1)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re: 13 MOTION to Intervene by Nancy Adossi, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Oscar Alvarez, Moses Kamau Chege, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Elly Marisol Estrada, Blanca Gonzalez, Hyo-Won Jeon, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Karla Lopez, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Jin Park, Karla Perez, Luis A Rafael, Maria Rocha, Denise Romero, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Angel Silva, Darwin Velasquez, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B)(Perales, Nina)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Intervene by Karla Perez, Maria Rocha, Jose Magana-Salgado, Nanci J Palacios Godinez, Elly Marisol Estrada, Karina Ruiz De Diaz, Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez, Karla Lopez, Luis A Rafael, Darwin Velasquez, Jin Park, Oscar Alvarez, Nancy Adossi, Denise Romero, Pratishtha Khanna, Jung Woo Kim, Angel Silva, Moses Kamau Chege, Hyo-Won Jeon, Elizabeth Diaz, Maria Diaz, Blanca Gonzalez, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/29/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Answer, # 2 Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to 1.) L. Francis Cissna, 2.) Thomas D. Homan, 3.) Kevin K. McAleenan, 4.) Kirstjen M. Nielsen, 5.) Carla L. Provost, 6.) U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(bcampos, 1)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 10 Motion for Jeffrey S. Robins to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(bcampos, 1)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Kirstjen M. Nielsen, # 2 Kevin K. McLeenan, # 3 Thomas D. Homan, # 4 L. Francis Cissna, # 5 Carla L. Provost)(Disher, Todd)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Jeffrey S. Robins to Appear Pro Hac Vice by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Carla L. Provost, United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/25/2018. (Robins, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/4/2018: # 1 Attorney Verification) (bcampos, 1).
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Fourth APPENDIX re: 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed.(Disher, Todd)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Third APPENDIX re: 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed.(Disher, Todd)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Second APPENDIX re: 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed.(Disher, Todd)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 First APPENDIX re: 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Table of Contents)(Disher, Todd)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/23/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Disher, Todd)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/23/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Disher, Todd)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/31/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 before Judge Andrew S Hanen(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(bcampos, 1)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Andrew S Hanen for all further proceedings. Judge Rolando Olvera no longer assigned to the case(Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(bcampos, 1)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-19989656) filed by State of Nebraska, State Of Texas, State of Arkansas, State of South Carolina, State or Alabama, State of Louisiana, State of West Virginia. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Disher, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Texas et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Represented By: Brett A Shumate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas D. Homan
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla L. Provost
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Texas
Represented By: Adam Arthur Biggs
Represented By: Adam Nicholas Bitter
Represented By: Todd Lawrence Disher
Represented By: Cristina Maria Moreno
Represented By: Philip Trent Peroyea
Represented By: Brantley Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Alabama
Represented By: Adam Arthur Biggs
Represented By: Adam Nicholas Bitter
Represented By: Todd Lawrence Disher
Represented By: Cristina Maria Moreno
Represented By: Philip Trent Peroyea
Represented By: Brantley Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Arkansas
Represented By: Adam Arthur Biggs
Represented By: Adam Nicholas Bitter
Represented By: Todd Lawrence Disher
Represented By: Cristina Maria Moreno
Represented By: Philip Trent Peroyea
Represented By: Brantley Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Louisiana
Represented By: Adam Arthur Biggs
Represented By: Adam Nicholas Bitter
Represented By: Todd Lawrence Disher
Represented By: Cristina Maria Moreno
Represented By: Philip Trent Peroyea
Represented By: Brantley Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Nebraska
Represented By: Adam Arthur Biggs
Represented By: Adam Nicholas Bitter
Represented By: Todd Lawrence Disher
Represented By: Cristina Maria Moreno
Represented By: Philip Trent Peroyea
Represented By: Brantley Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of South Carolina
Represented By: Adam Arthur Biggs
Represented By: Adam Nicholas Bitter
Represented By: Todd Lawrence Disher
Represented By: Cristina Maria Moreno
Represented By: Philip Trent Peroyea
Represented By: Brantley Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of West Virginia
Represented By: Adam Arthur Biggs
Represented By: Adam Nicholas Bitter
Represented By: Todd Lawrence Disher
Represented By: Cristina Maria Moreno
Represented By: Philip Trent Peroyea
Represented By: Brantley Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Kansas
Represented By: Adam Arthur Biggs
Represented By: Adam Nicholas Bitter
Represented By: Todd Lawrence Disher
Represented By: Cristina Maria Moreno
Represented By: Philip Trent Peroyea
Represented By: Brantley Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phil Bryant
Represented By: Adam Arthur Biggs
Represented By: Adam Nicholas Bitter
Represented By: Todd Lawrence Disher
Represented By: Cristina Maria Moreno
Represented By: Philip Trent Peroyea
Represented By: Brantley Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul R. LePage
Represented By: Adam Arthur Biggs
Represented By: Adam Nicholas Bitter
Represented By: Todd Lawrence Disher
Represented By: Cristina Maria Moreno
Represented By: Philip Trent Peroyea
Represented By: Brantley Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Karla Perez
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Carlos Moctezuma Garcia
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Denise Hulett
Represented By: Celina Ysela Moreno
Represented By: Priscilla Orta
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Maria Rocha
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Carlos Moctezuma Garcia
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Denise Hulett
Represented By: Celina Ysela Moreno
Represented By: Priscilla Orta
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Jose Magana-Salgado
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Carlos Moctezuma Garcia
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Denise Hulett
Represented By: Celina Ysela Moreno
Represented By: Priscilla Orta
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Nanci J Palacios Godinez
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Carlos Moctezuma Garcia
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Denise Hulett
Represented By: Celina Ysela Moreno
Represented By: Priscilla Orta
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Elly Marisol Estrada
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Carlos Moctezuma Garcia
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Denise Hulett
Represented By: Celina Ysela Moreno
Represented By: Priscilla Orta
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Karina Ruiz De Diaz
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Carlos Moctezuma Garcia
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Denise Hulett
Represented By: Celina Ysela Moreno
Represented By: Priscilla Orta
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Carlos Aguilar Gonzalez
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Carlos Moctezuma Garcia
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Denise Hulett
Represented By: Celina Ysela Moreno
Represented By: Priscilla Orta
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Karla Lopez
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Carlos Moctezuma Garcia
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Denise Hulett
Represented By: Celina Ysela Moreno
Represented By: Priscilla Orta
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Luis A Rafael
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Carlos Moctezuma Garcia
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Denise Hulett
Represented By: Celina Ysela Moreno
Represented By: Priscilla Orta
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Darwin Velasquez
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Carlos Moctezuma Garcia
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Denise Hulett
Represented By: Celina Ysela Moreno
Represented By: Priscilla Orta
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Jin Park
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Carlos Moctezuma Garcia
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Denise Hulett
Represented By: Celina Ysela Moreno
Represented By: Priscilla Orta
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Oscar Alvarez
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Carlos Moctezuma Garcia
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Denise Hulett
Represented By: Celina Ysela Moreno
Represented By: Priscilla Orta
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Nancy Adossi
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Carlos Moctezuma Garcia
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Denise Hulett
Represented By: Celina Ysela Moreno
Represented By: Priscilla Orta
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Denise Romero
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Carlos Moctezuma Garcia
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Denise Hulett
Represented By: Celina Ysela Moreno
Represented By: Priscilla Orta
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Pratishtha Khanna
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Carlos Moctezuma Garcia
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Denise Hulett
Represented By: Celina Ysela Moreno
Represented By: Priscilla Orta
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Jung Woo Kim
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Carlos Moctezuma Garcia
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Denise Hulett
Represented By: Celina Ysela Moreno
Represented By: Priscilla Orta
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Angel Silva
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Carlos Moctezuma Garcia
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Denise Hulett
Represented By: Celina Ysela Moreno
Represented By: Priscilla Orta
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Moses Kamau Chege
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Carlos Moctezuma Garcia
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Denise Hulett
Represented By: Celina Ysela Moreno
Represented By: Priscilla Orta
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Hyo-Won Jeon
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Carlos Moctezuma Garcia
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Denise Hulett
Represented By: Celina Ysela Moreno
Represented By: Priscilla Orta
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Elizabeth Diaz
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Carlos Moctezuma Garcia
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Denise Hulett
Represented By: Celina Ysela Moreno
Represented By: Priscilla Orta
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Maria Diaz
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Carlos Moctezuma Garcia
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Denise Hulett
Represented By: Celina Ysela Moreno
Represented By: Priscilla Orta
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Blanca Gonzalez
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Represented By: Carlos Moctezuma Garcia
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Denise Hulett
Represented By: Celina Ysela Moreno
Represented By: Priscilla Orta
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: State of New Jersey
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Represented By: Nicholas Dolinsky
Represented By: Katherine Anne Gregory
Represented By: Jeremy Hollander
Represented By: Paul H Juzdan
Represented By: Kenneth S Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: U.S. Rep. Steve King, et al.
Represented By: Lawrence John Joseph
Represented By: Andrew L Schlafly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?