Saenz v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Ruby Saenz
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2018cv00156
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rolando Olvera
Referring Judge: Ignacio Torteya
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Summons Issued as to General Counsel of the Social Security Administration. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified.(scastillo, 1)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #4 Motion for Steven Scoggin to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified.(jtabaresadi, 1)
October 2, 2018 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(scastillo, 1)
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Steven Scoggin to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to Ignacio Torteya, III. by Ruby Saenz, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/22/2018. (JenniferLongoria, 1) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2018: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (JenniferLongoria, 1).
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ruby Saenz, filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma PauperisMotions referred to Ignacio Torteya, III. by Ruby Saenz, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/22/2018. (JenniferLongoria, 1)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy Berryhill filed by Ruby Saenz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JenniferLongoria, 1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saenz v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Saenz
Represented By: Steven Scoggin
Represented By: Steven Ross Scoggin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?