Garza v. H.E.B. Grocery Company LP et al

Plaintiff: RODOLFO GARZA
Defendant: H.E.B. Grocery Company LP, Zurich American Insurance Company and Transamerica Premier Life Insurance
Case Number: 1:2018cv00163
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Rolando Olvera
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2018 10 RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Sever Zurich American Insurance Company MOTION to Remand filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Garcia, Rodrigo)
November 21, 2018 9 PROPOSED ORDER Granting re: #7 MOTION to Sever Zurich American Insurance Company MOTION to Remand, filed.(Gonzalez, Ricardo)
November 20, 2018 8 RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Sever Zurich American Insurance Company MOTION to Remand filed by Transamerica Premier Life Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wolf, Jeffrey)
November 13, 2018 7 MOTION to Sever Zurich American Insurance Company, MOTION to Remand( Motion Docket Date 12/4/2018.) by Rodolfo Garza, filed. (Gonzalez, Ricardo)
October 30, 2018 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Rodolfo Garza, filed.(Gonzalez, Ricardo)
October 30, 2018 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Transamerica Premier Life Insurance, filed.(Wolf, Jeffrey)
October 30, 2018 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Transamerica Premier Life Insurance, filed.(Wolf, Jeffrey)
October 30, 2018 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by H.E.B. Grocery Company LP, filed.(Erwin, D)
October 15, 2018 2 Featured Case ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/8/2019 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Rolando Olvera(Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
October 12, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 197th Judicial District, Cameron County, case number 2017-DCL-04520 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21072070) filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Garcia, Rodrigo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garza v. H.E.B. Grocery Company LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.E.B. Grocery Company LP
Represented By: Randall Gomez
Represented By: D Alan Erwin, Jr
Represented By: John Daniel Vela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Rodrigo Garcia, Jr
Represented By: Raymond Matthew Kutch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transamerica Premier Life Insurance
Represented By: Jeffrey Jack Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODOLFO GARZA
Represented By: Ricardo Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?