Rosas v. Verma et al
Plaintiff: Dr. Carlos Rosas and Carlos Rosas, M.D.
Defendant: Alex Azar, Steven Terner-Mnuchin, Seema Verma and Steven Terner Mnuchin
Case Number: 1:2018cv00171
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fernando Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time. Ordered that defendants respond to plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction by 1/18/2019. Ordered, that the motion for preliminary injunction is set for 2/5/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6 before Judge Fernando Rodriguez Jr.(Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
December 13, 2018 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Defendant's Response to Preliminary Injunction and Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Carlos Rosas, MD, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Martinez, Benigno)
December 12, 2018 Summons Issued as to United States Attorney. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
December 11, 2018 Filing 20 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, Assistant US Attorney, filed.(Martinez, Benigno)
November 30, 2018 Filing 19 BRIEF in Support of Granting Preliminary Injunction re: #17 Renewed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Carlos Rosas, MD, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Martinez, Benigno)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER entered. Plaintiff shall file a Brief in support of plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction no later than 11/30/2018. Defendants shall file any response to plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction no later than 12/14/2018. Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 before Judge Fernando Rodriguez Jr (Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
November 20, 2018 Filing 17 Renewed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Carlos Rosas, MD, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/11/2018. (Garza, Myles)
November 12, 2018 Filing 16 First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Carlos Rosas, MD, filed.(Garza, Myles)
November 1, 2018 Filing 15 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Seema Verma served on 10/31/2018, answer due 12/31/2018, filed.(Martinez, Benigno)
November 1, 2018 Filing 14 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Steven Terner Mnuchin served on 10/31/2018, answer due 12/31/2018, filed.(Martinez, Benigno)
November 1, 2018 Filing 13 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Alex Azar served on 10/31/2018, answer due 12/31/2018, filed.(Martinez, Benigno)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; denying #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying as moot #5 Motion; denying as moot #6 Motion for Hearing. (Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(rnieto, 1)
October 30, 2018 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Benigno Trey Martinez re: #1 Complaint,,, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Martinez, Benigno)
October 29, 2018 Summons Issued as to 1.) Alex Azar, 2.) Steven Terner Mnuchin, 3.) Seema Verma. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
October 29, 2018 Filing 10 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation Summons, #2 Continuation Summons)(Martinez, Benigno)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/8/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 before Judge Fernando Rodriguez Jr(Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Rolando Olvera recused. Case reassigned to Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr for all further proceedings(Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/8/2019 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Rolando Olvera(Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for TRO Hearing re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Carlos Rosas, MD, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/15/2018. (JenniferLongoria, 1)
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Shorten Defendant's Time in Which to Respond to Plaintiff's Application for a Temporary Restraining Order by Carlos Rosas, MD, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(JenniferLongoria, 1)
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Carlos Rosas, MD, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(JenniferLongoria, 1)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Benigno (Trey) Martinez re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Carlos Rosas, MD, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(JenniferLongoria, 1)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21159157) filed by Carlos Rosas. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Dr. Rosas, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Benigno Martinez, #3 Continuation App for TRO, #4 Continuation Request for Hearing, #5 Continuation Motion to Shorten Time, #6 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Shorten Time, #7 Proposed Order TRO, #8 Continuation Preliminary Injunction, #9 Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Injunction)(Martinez, Benigno)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosas v. Verma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Terner-Mnuchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seema Verma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Terner Mnuchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Carlos Rosas
Represented By: Benigno Trey Martinez, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Rosas, M.D.
Represented By: Myles Ryan Garza
Represented By: Benigno Trey Martinez, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?