Guerrero Et al. v. Brownsville Independent School District

Plaintiff: Alec Austin Gonzalez and Monica Guerrero
Defendant: Brownsville Independent School District
Case Number: 1:2018cv00182
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: Texas Southern District Court
0 Judge: Rolando Olvera
1 Judge: Ignacio Torteya
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
January 2, 2019 7 First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Alec Austin Gonzalez, filed.(Jones, Star)
January 2, 2019 6 Agreed JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Alec Austin Gonzalez, filed.(Jones, Star)
December 20, 2018 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Brownsville Independent School District, filed.(Salinas, Miguel)
December 17, 2018 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Brownsville Independent School District, filed.(Salinas, Miguel)
November 28, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER Initial Conference set for 1/15/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya III(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified.(jtabares, 1)
November 20, 2018 2 Featured Case ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/10/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya III(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified.(dbenavides, 1)
November 19, 2018 Summons Issued as to Brownsville Independent School District. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
November 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21254170) filed by Brownsville Independent School District.(Jones, Star)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guerrero Et al. v. Brownsville Independent School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alec Austin Gonzalez
Represented By: Angela P Nix
Represented By: Star Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Guerrero
Represented By: Angela P Nix
Represented By: Star Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brownsville Independent School District
Represented By: Baltazar Salazar
Represented By: Miguel Salinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?