United States of America v. Longoria Garcia et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Berta Longoria Garcia, Cameron County, Tony Yzaguirre,Jr. and 0.04 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situated in Cameron County, Texas
Case Number: 1:2019cv00004
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fernando Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE in Condemnation by United States of America, filed. (Attachments: #1 Schedules)(Kincheloe, Richard)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Loren Flossman (Amended), filed. (Attachments: #1 Schedules)(Kincheloe, Richard)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Schedules)(Kincheloe, Richard)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United States of America, filed.(Kincheloe, Richard)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/2/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Fernando Rodriguez Jr(Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(dbenavides, 1)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Duplicate Entry for #3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/2/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Fernando Rodriguez Jr(Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(dbenavides, 1) Modified on 1/7/2019 (dbenavides, 1).
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Order to Sever Tracts RGV-HRL-4016 from 1:10CV186 and Orders that RGV-HRL-4016, identified and described in the Amended Declaration of Taking attached to this Order as Exhibit 1 be severed into 1:19-CV-4.(Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(dbenavides, 1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Longoria Garcia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berta Longoria Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Yzaguirre,Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.04 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situated in Cameron County, Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Richard A. Kincheloe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?