State Farm Lloyds v. Best Buy Stores, LP et al

Plaintiff: State Farm Lloyds a/s/o Maria Hernandez and State Farm Lloyds
Defendant: Best Buy Stores, LP, XPO Logistics, Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc. d/b/a Minnesota Best Buy Co., Inc. and Best Buy Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00027
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ronald G Morgan
Referring Judge: Fernando Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kevin J Schuble terminated.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Larry Steve Hearne to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Cody R. Graham to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
March 21, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Larry Steven Hearne to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to Ronald G Morgan. by State Farm Lloyds, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/11/2019. (dbenavides, 1)
March 21, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Cody R. Graham to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to Ronald G Morgan. by State Farm Lloyds as Subrogee of Maria Hernandez, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/11/2019. (dbenavides, 1)
March 21, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Plaintiff State Farm Lloyds as Subrogee of Maria Hernandez, filed.(dbenavides, 1)
March 21, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Kevin J. Schuble to Withdraw as AttorneyMotions referred to Ronald G Morgan. by State Farm Lloyds, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(dbenavides, 1)
March 20, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, LP, filed.(Valdez, Robert)
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, LP, filed.(Valdez, Robert)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to Removal by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, LP, filed.(Valdez, Robert)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/17/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE to Court that all Removal Documents were Served on all Parties/Counsel by XPO Logistics, Inc., filed. (Cooper, Mark)
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to Plaintiff's Original Petition, filed by XPO Logistics, Inc.. (Cooper, Mark)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by XPO Logistics, Inc., filed.(Cooper, Mark)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by XPO Logistics, Inc., filed.(Cooper, Mark)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 APPENDIX by XPO Logistics, Inc., filed.(Cooper, Mark)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEF In Support of Notice of Removal by XPO Logistics, Inc., filed.(Cooper, Mark)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 APPENDIX by XPO Logistics, Inc., filed.(Cooper, Mark)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cameron County Court at Law No. 5, case number 2019-ccl-00401 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21977100) filed by XPO Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Cooper, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Lloyds v. Best Buy Stores, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Lloyds a/s/o Maria Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Lloyds
Represented By: Kevin J Schuble
Represented By: Cody R. Graham
Represented By: Larry Steven Hearne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Buy Stores, LP
Represented By: Robert Edward Valdez
Represented By: Elena Patricia Serna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Anthony Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Buy Co., Inc. d/b/a Minnesota Best Buy Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Buy Co., Inc.
Represented By: Robert Edward Valdez
Represented By: Elena Patricia Serna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?