United States of America v. Friends Construction Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Friends Construction Inc., andJose E. Hernandez,Individually, Jose E. Hernandez and Friends Construction Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00121
Filed: July 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rolando Olvera
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 12:1819
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United States of America, filed.(Cersonsky, M)
August 8, 2019 Summons Issued as to Jose E. Hernandez. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(jdav, 4)
August 8, 2019 Summons Issued as to Friends Construction Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(jdav, 4)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/12/2019 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Rolando Olvera(Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
July 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Friends Construction Inc., andJose E. Hernandez,Individually filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cersonsky, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Friends Construction Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Friends Construction Inc., andJose E. Hernandez,Individually
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose E. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Friends Construction Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: M H Cersonsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?