Gonzalez Recinos et al v. McAleenan et al
Petitioner: Hector Sigifredo Rivera Rosa, Jose Neftali Arias Hernandez, Jose William Recinos Nolasco, Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio, Javier Alexander Reyes Vigil, Kevin Eduardo Rizzo Ruano, Jorge Landaverde, Santos Zuniga, William Abel Santay-Son, Jairo Alexander Gonzalez Recinos, Jonathan Fernando Beltran Rizo, Bryan Lopez-Lopez, Javier Ernesto Giron Monterroza, William Anthony Perez Valle, Gerardo Henrique Herrera Rivera and Hugo Flandez
Respondent: Michael J. Pitts, Carla Provost, Rodolfo Karisch, John P Sanders and Kevin K McAleenan
Amicus Curiae: ACLU Foundation of Texas
Case Number: 1:2019cv00138
Filed: July 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rolando Olvera
Referring Judge: Fernando Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 103 Proffer of Testimony for Quarantined Witnesses by Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio, Jose Neftali Arias Hernandez, Jonathan Fernando Beltran Rizo, Hugo Flandez, Javier Ernesto Giron Monterroza, Jairo Alexander Gonzalez Recinos, Gerardo Henrique Herrera Rivera, Jorge Landaverde, Bryan Lopez-Lopez, William Anthony Perez Valle, Jose William Recinos Nolasco, Javier Alexander Reyes Vigil, Hector Sigifredo Rivera Rosa, Kevin Eduardo Rizzo Ruano, William Abel Santay-Son, Santos Zuniga, filed.(Vargas, Karla)
September 12, 2019 Filing 102 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #93 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (jtabares, 1)
September 11, 2019 Filing 101 Hearing EXHIBITS by Rodolfo Karisch, Kevin K McAleenan, Michael J. Pitts, Carla Provost, John P Sanders (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 22B)(Pineda, Christopher)
September 11, 2019 Filing 100 Hearing EXHIBITS by Rodolfo Karisch, Kevin K McAleenan, Michael J. Pitts, Carla Provost, John P Sanders (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 22A)(Pineda, Christopher)
September 11, 2019 Filing 99 Hearing EXHIBITS by Rodolfo Karisch, Kevin K McAleenan, Michael J. Pitts, Carla Provost, John P Sanders (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 19, #2 Exhibit 20, #3 Exhibit 21)(Pineda, Christopher)
September 11, 2019 Filing 98 Hearing EXHIBITS by Rodolfo Karisch, Kevin K McAleenan, Michael J. Pitts, Carla Provost, John P Sanders (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 18B)(Pineda, Christopher)
September 11, 2019 Filing 97 Hearing EXHIBITS by Rodolfo Karisch, Kevin K McAleenan, Michael J. Pitts, Carla Provost, John P Sanders (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 18A)(Pineda, Christopher)
September 11, 2019 Filing 96 Hearing EXHIBITS by Rodolfo Karisch, Kevin K McAleenan, Michael J. Pitts, Carla Provost, John P Sanders (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16, #2 Exhibit 17)(Pineda, Christopher)
September 11, 2019 Filing 95 Hearing EXHIBITS by Rodolfo Karisch, Kevin K McAleenan, Michael J. Pitts, Carla Provost, John P Sanders (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14, #2 Exhibit 15)(Pineda, Christopher)
September 11, 2019 Filing 94 Hearing EXHIBITS by Rodolfo Karisch, Kevin K McAleenan, Michael J. Pitts, Carla Provost, John P Sanders (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9, #2 Exhibit 10, #3 Exhibit 11A, #4 Exhibit 11B, #5 Exhibit 12)(Pineda, Christopher)
September 11, 2019 Filing 93 TRANSCRIPT re: Injunction Hearing held on September 6, 2019 before Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber sperales. Ordering Party Mr. Christopher Pineda Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/10/2019., filed. (sperales, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 92 Hearing EXHIBITS by Rodolfo Karisch, Kevin K McAleenan, Michael J. Pitts, Carla Provost, John P Sanders (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8B)(Pineda, Christopher)
September 11, 2019 Filing 91 Hearing EXHIBITS by Rodolfo Karisch, Kevin K McAleenan, Michael J. Pitts, Carla Provost, John P Sanders (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8A)(Pineda, Christopher)
September 11, 2019 Filing 90 Hearing EXHIBITS by Rodolfo Karisch, Kevin K McAleenan, Michael J. Pitts, Carla Provost, John P Sanders (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7)(Pineda, Christopher)
September 11, 2019 Filing 89 Hearing EXHIBITS by Rodolfo Karisch, Kevin K McAleenan, Michael J. Pitts, Carla Provost, John P Sanders (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6A, #7 Exhibit 6B)(Pineda, Christopher)
September 11, 2019 Filing 88 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #86 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (JenniferLongoria, 1)
September 10, 2019 Filing 87 Hearing EXHIBITS by Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio, Jose Neftali Arias Hernandez, Jonathan Fernando Beltran Rizo, Hugo Flandez, Javier Ernesto Giron Monterroza, Jairo Alexander Gonzalez Recinos, Gerardo Henrique Herrera Rivera, Jorge Landaverde, Bryan Lopez-Lopez, William Anthony Perez Valle, Jose William Recinos Nolasco, Javier Alexander Reyes Vigil, Hector Sigifredo Rivera Rosa, Kevin Eduardo Rizzo Ruano, William Abel Santay-Son, Santos Zuniga (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit)(Vargas, Karla)
September 10, 2019 Filing 86 TRANSCRIPT re: Injunction Hearing held on September 5, 2019 before Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber sperales. Ordering Party Mr. Christopher Pineda Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/9/2019., filed. (sperales, )
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER entered. Parties' deadline to file not previously e-filed exhibits by 9/13/19.(Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(bespinoza, 1)
September 6, 2019 Filing 84 Respondents' Receipt for Withdrawal of Injunction Hearing Exhibits (bespinoza, 1)
September 6, 2019 Filing 83 Plaintiffs' Receipt for Withdrawal of Injunction Hearing Exhibits (bespinoza, 1)
September 6, 2019 Filing 82 Respondents' Second Amended Exhibit List(bespinoza, 1)
September 6, 2019 Filing 81 Plaintiffs' Amended Exhibit List(bespinoza, 1)
September 6, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr: Appearances: Elisabeth Lisa S Brodyaga, Jaime M Diez, Wesley Darwin Lewis, Thelma Odilia Garcia, Efren Carlos Olivares, Luis Campos, John Brent Beckert, and Karla Marisol Vargas, f/Plaintiffs; Daniel David Hu, Christopher D Pineda, Annalisa L. Cravens, and Eric Joel Drootman f/Respondents; (Court Reporter: Sheila Perales) (Law Clerk: Steven Arango) [Court time: 8:31- 10:05 / 10:18-12:41 / 1:59-3:40 / 3:53-4:07]. PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING DAY TWO held on 9/6/2019 regarding #41 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Case was called; all parties ready to proceed. Respondents oral motion for denial of Motion for Preliminary Injunction was denied. Respondents witness, Rodolfo Karisch, sworn in / testified / Respondents Exhibit #17 admitted / cross examined / Plaintiffs Exhibit #28 admitted / cross examined / re-directed / stepped down. Court break; court resumed. Respondents witness, Carmen Qualia, sworn in / testified / Respondents Exhibit #18-19 admitted / cross examined / Plaintiffs Exhibit #29 admitted / re-directed / Respondents Exhibit #20 admitted / re-crossed / stepped down. Respondents witness, Michael Banks, sworn in / testified / Respondents Exhibit #21 admitted / cross examined / stepped down. Court recessed for lunch. Court resumed; all parties present and ready. Respondents witness, Mark Navarro, sworn in / testified / Respondents Exhibit #22 admitted / cross examined / re-directed / stepped down. Presentation of the evidence concluded. The Court addressed the parties; discussion held. Court break; court resumed. Closing arguments heard. Motion for Preliminary Injunction taken under advisement. Parties ordered they e-file the admitted exhibits. Respondents were granted stay to file a response to the amended petition until after the ruling on the motion for injunction. Court adjourned. (bespinoza, 1)
September 6, 2019 Filing 80 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Christopher C. Pineda for Transcript of Injunction Hearing, September 5 & 6, 2019 with Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr.. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sheila Perales, filed. (Pineda, Christopher)
September 5, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr: Appearances: Elisabeth Lisa S Brodyaga, Jaime M Diez, Wesley Darwin Lewis, Thelma Odilia Garcia, Efren Carlos Olivares, Luis Campos, John Brent Beckert, and Karla Marisol Vargas, f/Plaintiffs; Daniel David Hu, Christopher D Pineda, Annalisa L. Cravens, and Eric Joel Drootman f/Respondents; (Court Reporter: Sheila Perales) (Interpreter: Cecilia Turrent) (Law Clerk: Steven Arango/Victoria Aranda) [Court time: 10:27-12:33 / 1:39-3:28 / 3:42-5:34]. PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING held on 9/5/2019 regarding #41 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Case was called; all parties ready to proceed. The Court addressed the parties. Parties gave their opening statement. Plaintiffs witness, Claudia Galan sworn in / testified / cross examined / stepped down. Interpreter, Cecilia Turrent, sworn in. Plaintiffs witness, Francisco Erwin Garcia sworn in / testified / Plaintiffs exhibits #25-26 admitted / cross examined / Respondents Exhibits #14-16 admitted / re-directed / stepped down. Plaintiff, Kevin Eduardo Rizzo-Ruano sworn in / testified. Court recessed for lunch. Court resumed; all parties present and ready. Continued direct examination of Plaintiff, Kevin Eduardo Rizo-Ruano / cross examined/ re-directed / Plaintiffs exhibit #27 admitted / stepped down. Plaintiff, Jonathan Fernando Beltran-Rizo sworn in / testified / cross examined / re-directed / stepped down. Plaintiff, Bryan Lopez-Lopez sworn in / testified / court break / cross examined / re-directed / stepped down. Plaintiff, Hector Sigifredo Rivera Rosa / sworn in / testified / cross examined / re-directed / stepped down. Plaintiff, Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio / sworn in / testified / bench conferenced held and ordered it be sealed / cross examined / re-directed / stepped down. Parties instructed to report back tomorrow at 8:30 am. Court adjourned. (bespinoza, 1)
September 4, 2019 Filing 79 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Wesley Lewis for Transcript of Hearing held 8/14/2019 befor the Honorable Fernando Rodriguez, Jr.. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sheila Perales, filed. (jdav, 4)
September 4, 2019 Filing 78 Amended Witness List by Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio, Jose Neftali Arias Hernandez, Jonathan Fernando Beltran Rizo, Hugo Flandez, Javier Ernesto Giron Monterroza, Jairo Alexander Gonzalez Recinos, Gerardo Henrique Herrera Rivera, Jorge Landaverde, Bryan Lopez-Lopez, William Anthony Perez Valle, Jose William Recinos Nolasco, Javier Alexander Reyes Vigil, Hector Sigifredo Rivera Rosa, Kevin Eduardo Rizzo Ruano, William Abel Santay-Son, Santos Zuniga(Vargas, Karla)
September 4, 2019 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Jose William Recinos-Nolasco ( Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr), filed.(bespinoza, 1)
September 4, 2019 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Santos Abelio Zunga-Gaitan ( Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr), filed.(bespinoza, 1)
September 4, 2019 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Kevin Jeovani Fuentes-Acosta ( Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr), filed.(bespinoza, 1)
September 4, 2019 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Javier Alexander Reyes-Vigil ( Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr), filed.(bespinoza, 1)
September 4, 2019 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Juan Carlos Asencio Y Asencio ( Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr), filed.(bespinoza, 1)
September 4, 2019 Filing 77 Corrected OBJECTIONS to #57 Exhibit List, , filed by Rodolfo Karisch, Kevin K McAleenan, Michael J. Pitts, Carla Provost, John P Sanders. (Cravens, Annalisa)
September 4, 2019 Filing 76 Unopposed MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum for appearance of Jose William Recinos-Nolasco by Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio, Jose Neftali Arias Hernandez, Jonathan Fernando Beltran Rizo, Hugo Flandez, Javier Ernesto Giron Monterroza, Jairo Alexander Gonzalez Recinos, Gerardo Henrique Herrera Rivera, Jorge Landaverde, Bryan Lopez-Lopez, William Anthony Perez Valle, Jose William Recinos Nolasco, Javier Alexander Reyes Vigil, Hector Sigifredo Rivera Rosa, Kevin Eduardo Rizzo Ruano, William Abel Santay-Son, Santos Zuniga, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brodyaga, Elisabeth)
September 4, 2019 Filing 75 Unopposed MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum for appearance of Kevin Jeovani Fuentes-Acosta by Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio, Jose Neftali Arias Hernandez, Jonathan Fernando Beltran Rizo, Hugo Flandez, Javier Ernesto Giron Monterroza, Jairo Alexander Gonzalez Recinos, Gerardo Henrique Herrera Rivera, Jorge Landaverde, Bryan Lopez-Lopez, William Anthony Perez Valle, Jose William Recinos Nolasco, Javier Alexander Reyes Vigil, Hector Sigifredo Rivera Rosa, Kevin Eduardo Rizzo Ruano, William Abel Santay-Son, Santos Zuniga, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brodyaga, Elisabeth)
September 4, 2019 Filing 74 Unopposed MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum for appearance of Javier Alexander Reyes-Vigil by Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio, Jose Neftali Arias Hernandez, Jonathan Fernando Beltran Rizo, Hugo Flandez, Javier Ernesto Giron Monterroza, Jairo Alexander Gonzalez Recinos, Gerardo Henrique Herrera Rivera, Jorge Landaverde, Bryan Lopez-Lopez, William Anthony Perez Valle, Jose William Recinos Nolasco, Javier Alexander Reyes Vigil, Hector Sigifredo Rivera Rosa, Kevin Eduardo Rizzo Ruano, William Abel Santay-Son, Santos Zuniga, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brodyaga, Elisabeth)
September 4, 2019 Filing 73 Unopposed AMENDED #71 MOTION by Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio, Jose Neftali Arias Hernandez, Jonathan Fernando Beltran Rizo, Hugo Flandez, Javier Ernesto Giron Monterroza, Jairo Alexander Gonzalez Recinos, Gerardo Henrique Herrera Rivera, Jorge Landaverde, Bryan Lopez-Lopez, William Anthony Perez Valle, Jose William Recinos Nolasco, Javier Alexander Reyes Vigil, Hector Sigifredo Rivera Rosa, Kevin Eduardo Rizzo Ruano, William Abel Santay-Son, Santos Zuniga, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brodyaga, Elisabeth)
September 4, 2019 Filing 72 Unopposed MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum for appearance of Santos Abelio Zuniga-Gaitan by Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio, Jose Neftali Arias Hernandez, Jonathan Fernando Beltran Rizo, Hugo Flandez, Javier Ernesto Giron Monterroza, Jairo Alexander Gonzalez Recinos, Gerardo Henrique Herrera Rivera, Jorge Landaverde, Bryan Lopez-Lopez, William Anthony Perez Valle, Jose William Recinos Nolasco, Javier Alexander Reyes Vigil, Hector Sigifredo Rivera Rosa, Kevin Eduardo Rizzo Ruano, William Abel Santay-Son, Santos Zuniga, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brodyaga, Elisabeth)
September 4, 2019 Filing 71 Unopposed MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum for appearance of Juan Carlos Asencio by Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio, Jose Neftali Arias Hernandez, Jonathan Fernando Beltran Rizo, Hugo Flandez, Javier Ernesto Giron Monterroza, Jairo Alexander Gonzalez Recinos, Gerardo Henrique Herrera Rivera, Jorge Landaverde, Bryan Lopez-Lopez, William Anthony Perez Valle, Jose William Recinos Nolasco, Javier Alexander Reyes Vigil, Hector Sigifredo Rivera Rosa, Kevin Eduardo Rizzo Ruano, William Abel Santay-Son, Santos Zuniga, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brodyaga, Elisabeth)
September 3, 2019 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Javier Ernesto Giron-Monterroza for Injunction Hearing on 9/5/2019 ( Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr), filed.(bespinoza, 1)
September 3, 2019 Filing 70 REPLY in Support of #41 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio, Jose Neftali Arias Hernandez, Jonathan Fernando Beltran Rizo, Hugo Flandez, Javier Ernesto Giron Monterroza, Jairo Alexander Gonzalez Recinos, Gerardo Henrique Herrera Rivera, Jorge Landaverde, Bryan Lopez-Lopez, William Anthony Perez Valle, Javier Alexander Reyes Vigil, Hector Sigifredo Rivera Rosa, Kevin Eduardo Rizzo Ruano, William Abel Santay-Son, Santos Zuniga. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Adams Declaration)(Lewis, Wesley)
September 3, 2019 Filing 69 SEALED EXHIBITS Government Exhibit 1 re: #68 Objections by Rodolfo Karisch, Kevin K McAleenan, Michael J. Pitts, Carla Provost, John P Sanders, filed. (Cravens, Annalisa)
September 3, 2019 Filing 68 OBJECTIONS to #58 Witness List, , filed by Rodolfo Karisch, Kevin K McAleenan, Michael J. Pitts, Carla Provost, John P Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit)(Cravens, Annalisa)
September 3, 2019 Filing 67 OBJECTIONS to #57 Exhibit List, , filed by Rodolfo Karisch, Kevin K McAleenan, Michael J. Pitts, Carla Provost, John P Sanders. (Cravens, Annalisa)
September 3, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J. Drootman on behalf of Rodolfo Karisch, Kevin K McAleenan, Michael J. Pitts, Carla Provost, John P Sanders, filed. (Drootman, Eric)
September 3, 2019 Filing 65 Amended PROPOSED ORDER removingErdwin Vichot Garcia re: #62 Unopposed MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum for appearance of Jose William Recinos-Nolasco, Osmel Daniel Gil=Falcon, Kevin Jeovani Fuentes-Acosta, #61 Unopposed MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum for appearance of Juan Carlos Asencio y Asencio; Santos Abelio Zuniga=Gaitan; Javier Alexander Reyes-Vigil, filed.(Brodyaga, Elisabeth)
September 3, 2019 Filing 64 Unopposed AMENDED #63 MOTION by Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio, Jose Neftali Arias Hernandez, Jonathan Fernando Beltran Rizo, Hugo Flandez, Javier Ernesto Giron Monterroza, Jairo Alexander Gonzalez Recinos, Gerardo Henrique Herrera Rivera, Jorge Landaverde, Bryan Lopez-Lopez, William Anthony Perez Valle, Jose William Recinos Nolasco, Javier Alexander Reyes Vigil, Hector Sigifredo Rivera Rosa, Kevin Eduardo Rizzo Ruano, William Abel Santay-Son, Santos Zuniga, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brodyaga, Elisabeth)
September 3, 2019 Filing 63 Unopposed MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum for appearance of Juan Daniel Rodriguez and Erdwin Vichot Garcia by Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio, Jose Neftali Arias Hernandez, Jonathan Fernando Beltran Rizo, Hugo Flandez, Javier Ernesto Giron Monterroza, Jairo Alexander Gonzalez Recinos, Gerardo Henrique Herrera Rivera, Jorge Landaverde, Bryan Lopez-Lopez, William Anthony Perez Valle, Jose William Recinos Nolasco, Javier Alexander Reyes Vigil, Hector Sigifredo Rivera Rosa, Kevin Eduardo Rizzo Ruano, William Abel Santay-Son, Santos Zuniga, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brodyaga, Elisabeth)
September 3, 2019 Filing 62 Unopposed MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum for appearance of Jose William Recinos-Nolasco, Osmel Daniel Gil=Falcon, Kevin Jeovani Fuentes-Acosta by Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio, Jose Neftali Arias Hernandez, Jonathan Fernando Beltran Rizo, Hugo Flandez, Javier Ernesto Giron Monterroza, Jairo Alexander Gonzalez Recinos, Gerardo Henrique Herrera Rivera, Jorge Landaverde, Bryan Lopez-Lopez, William Anthony Perez Valle, Jose William Recinos Nolasco, Javier Alexander Reyes Vigil, Hector Sigifredo Rivera Rosa, Kevin Eduardo Rizzo Ruano, William Abel Santay-Son, Santos Zuniga, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brodyaga, Elisabeth)
September 3, 2019 Filing 61 Unopposed MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum for appearance of Juan Carlos Asencio y Asencio; Santos Abelio Zuniga=Gaitan; Javier Alexander Reyes-Vigil by Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio, Jose Neftali Arias Hernandez, Jonathan Fernando Beltran Rizo, Hugo Flandez, Javier Ernesto Giron Monterroza, Jairo Alexander Gonzalez Recinos, Gerardo Henrique Herrera Rivera, Jorge Landaverde, Bryan Lopez-Lopez, William Anthony Perez Valle, Jose William Recinos Nolasco, Javier Alexander Reyes Vigil, Hector Sigifredo Rivera Rosa, Kevin Eduardo Rizzo Ruano, William Abel Santay-Son, Santos Zuniga, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brodyaga, Elisabeth)
September 3, 2019 Filing 60 Unopposed MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum for appearance of Jaavier Ernesto Giron-Monterroza by Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio, Jose Neftali Arias Hernandez, Jonathan Fernando Beltran Rizo, Hugo Flandez, Javier Ernesto Giron Monterroza, Jairo Alexander Gonzalez Recinos, Gerardo Henrique Herrera Rivera, Jorge Landaverde, Bryan Lopez-Lopez, William Anthony Perez Valle, Jose William Recinos Nolasco, Javier Alexander Reyes Vigil, Hector Sigifredo Rivera Rosa, Kevin Eduardo Rizzo Ruano, William Abel Santay-Son, Santos Zuniga, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brodyaga, Elisabeth)
August 29, 2019 Filing 59 Amended Exhibit List by Rodolfo Karisch, Kevin K McAleenan, Michael J. Pitts, Carla Provost, John P Sanders(Pineda, Christopher)
August 29, 2019 Filing 58 Witness List by Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio, Jose Neftali Arias Hernandez, Jonathan Fernando Beltran Rizo, Hugo Flandez, Javier Ernesto Giron Monterroza, Jairo Alexander Gonzalez Recinos, Gerardo Henrique Herrera Rivera, Jorge Landaverde, Bryan Lopez-Lopez, William Anthony Perez Valle, Jose William Recinos Nolasco, Javier Alexander Reyes Vigil, Hector Sigifredo Rivera Rosa, Kevin Eduardo Rizzo Ruano, William Abel Santay-Son, Santos Zuniga(Olivares, Efren)
August 29, 2019 Filing 57 Exhibit List by Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio, Jose Neftali Arias Hernandez, Jonathan Fernando Beltran Rizo, Hugo Flandez, Javier Ernesto Giron Monterroza, Jairo Alexander Gonzalez Recinos, Gerardo Henrique Herrera Rivera, Jorge Landaverde, Bryan Lopez-Lopez, William Anthony Perez Valle, Jose William Recinos Nolasco, Javier Alexander Reyes Vigil, Hector Sigifredo Rivera Rosa, Kevin Eduardo Rizzo Ruano, William Abel Santay-Son, Santos Zuniga(Olivares, Efren)
August 29, 2019 Filing 56 Exhibit List by Rodolfo Karisch, Kevin K McAleenan, Michael J. Pitts, Carla Provost, John P Sanders(Pineda, Christopher)
August 29, 2019 Filing 55 Witness List by Rodolfo Karisch, Kevin K McAleenan, Michael J. Pitts, Carla Provost, John P Sanders(Pineda, Christopher)
August 28, 2019 Filing 54 Unopposed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Briefing Schedule for Motion for Class Certification by Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio, Jose Neftali Arias Hernandez, Jonathan Fernando Beltran Rizo, Hugo Flandez, Javier Ernesto Giron Monterroza, Jairo Alexander Gonzalez Recinos, Gerardo Henrique Herrera Rivera, Jorge Landaverde, Bryan Lopez-Lopez, William Anthony Perez Valle, Jose William Recinos Nolasco, Javier Alexander Reyes Vigil, Hector Sigifredo Rivera Rosa, Kevin Eduardo Rizzo Ruano, William Abel Santay-Son, Santos Zuniga, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lewis, Wesley)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER regarding #52 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to remove Plaintiff Jose William Recinos-Nolasco as a Plaintiff from this case. (Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(bespinoza, 1)
August 27, 2019 Filing 52 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice as to Plaintiff Jose William Recinos-Nolasco, under FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Rodolfo Karisch, Kevin K McAleenan, Michael J. Pitts, Carla Provost, John P Sanders, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pineda, Christopher)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #47 Motion to Exceed Page Limit.(Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(bespinoza, 1)
August 26, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re: #41 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio, Jose Neftali Arias Hernandez, Jonathan Fernando Beltran Rizo, Hugo Flandez, Javier Ernesto Giron Monterroza, Jairo Alexander Gonzalez Recinos, Gerardo Henrique Herrera Rivera, Jorge Landaverde, Bryan Lopez-Lopez, William Anthony Perez Valle, Jose William Recinos Nolasco, Javier Alexander Reyes Vigil, Hector Sigifredo Rivera Rosa, Kevin Eduardo Rizzo Ruano, William Abel Santay-Son, Santos Zuniga, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lewis, Wesley)
August 26, 2019 Filing 49 SEALED EXHIBITS 1 re: #48 Response to Motion by Rodolfo Karisch, Kevin K McAleenan, Michael J. Pitts, Carla Provost, John P Sanders, filed. (Pineda, Christopher)
August 26, 2019 Filing 48 RESPONSE to #41 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Rodolfo Karisch, Kevin K McAleenan, Michael J. Pitts, Carla Provost, John P Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Pineda, Christopher)
August 26, 2019 Filing 47 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Response in Excess of Page Limit by Rodolfo Karisch, Kevin K McAleenan, Michael J. Pitts, Carla Provost, John P Sanders, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pineda, Christopher)
August 26, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Karla M. Vargas on behalf of Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio, Jose Neftali Arias Hernandez, Jonathan Fernando Beltran Rizo, Hugo Flandez, Javier Ernesto Giron Monterroza, Jairo Alexander Gonzalez Recinos, Gerardo Henrique Herrera Rivera, Jorge Landaverde, Bryan Lopez-Lopez, William Anthony Perez Valle, Jose William Recinos Nolasco, Javier Alexander Reyes Vigil, Hector Sigifredo Rivera Rosa, Kevin Eduardo Rizzo Ruano, William Abel Santay-Son, Santos Zuniga, filed. (Vargas, Karla)
August 26, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of release on parole by William Anthony Perez Valle, filed. (Brodyaga, Elisabeth)
August 23, 2019 Filing 44 TRANSCRIPT re: Telephonic Status Conference held on August 14, 2019 before Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber sperales. Ordering Party Mr. Christopher Pineda Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/21/2019., filed. (sperales, )
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying #39 Motion to Sever Claims of Plaintiff Jose William Recinos-Nolasco.(Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
August 21, 2019 Filing 42 SEALED EXHIBITS C & I re: #41 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio, Jose Neftali Arias Hernandez, Jonathan Fernando Beltran Rizo, Hugo Flandez, Javier Ernesto Giron Monterroza, Jairo Alexander Gonzalez Recinos, Gerardo Henrique Herrera Rivera, Jorge Landaverde, Bryan Lopez-Lopez, William Anthony Perez Valle, Jose William Recinos Nolasco, Javier Alexander Reyes Vigil, Hector Sigifredo Rivera Rosa, Kevin Eduardo Rizzo Ruano, William Abel Santay-Son, Santos Zuniga, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Lewis, Wesley)
August 21, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio, Jose Neftali Arias Hernandez, Jonathan Fernando Beltran Rizo, Hugo Flandez, Javier Ernesto Giron Monterroza, Jairo Alexander Gonzalez Recinos, Gerardo Henrique Herrera Rivera, Jorge Landaverde, Bryan Lopez-Lopez, William Anthony Perez Valle, Jose William Recinos Nolasco, Javier Alexander Reyes Vigil, Hector Sigifredo Rivera Rosa, Kevin Eduardo Rizzo Ruano, William Abel Santay-Son, Santos Zuniga, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A to G, #3 Exhibit G to N)(Lewis, Wesley)
August 21, 2019 Filing 40 SEALED EXHIBITS Exhibit 1 re: #39 Unopposed MOTION to Sever CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFF JOSE WILLIAM RECINOS-NOLASCO by Rodolfo Karisch, Kevin K McAleenan, Michael J. Pitts, Carla Provost, John P Sanders, filed. (Pineda, Christopher)
August 21, 2019 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION to Sever CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFF JOSE WILLIAM RECINOS-NOLASCO by Rodolfo Karisch, Kevin K McAleenan, Michael J. Pitts, Carla Provost, John P Sanders, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pineda, Christopher)
August 21, 2019 Filing 38 SEALED EXHIBITS re: #37 Notice (Other) by Rodolfo Karisch, Kevin K McAleenan, Michael J. Pitts, Carla Provost, John P Sanders, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Pineda, Christopher)
August 21, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE REGARDING PLAINTIFF JOSE WILLIAM RECINOS-NOLASCO by Rodolfo Karisch, Kevin K McAleenan, Michael J. Pitts, Carla Provost, John P Sanders, filed. (Pineda, Christopher)
August 20, 2019 Filing 36 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Christopher Pineda for Transcript of Status Conference, August 14, 2019, Judge Fernando Rodriguez. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sheila Perales, filed. (Pineda, Christopher) (Main Document 36 replaced on 8/21/2019) (scastillo, 1).
August 19, 2019 Filing 35 Amicus Brief of the American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Texas and the American Civil Liberties Union Foundation in Support of Plaintiffs/Petitioners(dbenavides, 1)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief.(Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(dbenavides, 1)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #23 Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limits. (Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(mperez, 1)
August 16, 2019 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by ACLU Foundation of Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(Buser-Clancy, Thomas)
August 16, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Efren C. Olivares on behalf of Hector Sigifredo Rivera Rosa, filed. (Olivares, Efren)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASES: Lead Case No. 1:19-cv-138 and Member Case No. 1:19-cv-95, 1:19-cv-103, 1:19-cv-118, 1:19-cv-126; granting #13 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Petition. The parties shall make all future filings in 1:19-cv-00138. (Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
August 14, 2019 Filing 29 Second AMENDED PETITION against Rodolfo Karisch, Kevin K McAleenan, Michael J. Pitts, Carla Provost, John P Sanders filed by Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio, Hector Sigifredo Rivera Rosa, Jose Neftali Arias Hernandez, Javier Alexander Reyes Vigil, Jose William Recinos Nolasco, Jonathan Fernando Beltran-Rizo, Javier E Giron-Monterroza, William Santay-Son, Kevin E Rizzo, William A Perez-Valle, Bryan Lopez-Lopez, Hugo Flandez, Jairo Alexander Gonzalez-Recinos, Jorge Landaverde, Gerardo Herrera-Rivera, Santos Zuniga.(Brodyaga, Elisabeth)
August 14, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr. Appearances: Elisabeth Brodyaga, Jaime M Diez, Thelma Garcia, Brent Beckert, Luis Campos, Efren Olivares, and Ricardo Garcia f/Petitioners; Christopher Pineda, Daniel Hu, Annalisa Cravens and Michael Celone f/Respondents; (Court Reporter: Sheila Perales) (Law Clerk: Steven Arango) [Time: 3:01-3:32]. TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 8/14/2019 re: consolidation of cases 19CV95, 19CV103, 19CV118, 19CV126, and 19cv138. Petitioners' and Respondents' counsel stated their position; Court ordered cases be consolidated under Rule 42. Petitioners ordered to file a consolidated complaint in the lead case (19CV138) only. Court addressed issues related to the definition of the proposed class. Petitioners instructed to file a proposed scheduling order for Motion for Class Certification and related briefing by 8/28/2019. Petitioners request for an order authorizing Petitioners to travel to and from hearing was taken under consideration. (bespinoza, 1)
August 14, 2019 Filing 28 SEALED EXHIBITS re: #13 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Petition by Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio, Jose Neftali Arias Hernandez, Jose William Recinos Nolasco, Javier Alexander Reyes Vigil, Hector Sigifredo Rivera Rosa, filed. (Brodyaga, Elisabeth)
August 13, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel D. Hu on behalf of Rodolfo Karisch, Kevin K McAleenan, Michael J. Pitts, Carla Provost, John P Sanders, filed. (Hu, Daniel)
August 13, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Telephone Status Conference set for 8/14/2019 at 03:00 PM Chambers before Judge Fernando Rodriguez Jr, filed. (bespinoza, 1)
August 13, 2019 Filing 25 SEALED EXHIBITS C & I re: #23 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio, Jose Neftali Arias Hernandez, Jose William Recinos Nolasco, Javier Alexander Reyes Vigil, Hector Sigifredo Rivera Rosa, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Lewis, Wesley)
August 12, 2019 Filing 24 Other EXHIBITS re: #23 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio, Jose Neftali Arias Hernandez, Jose William Recinos Nolasco, Javier Alexander Reyes Vigil, Hector Sigifredo Rivera Rosa, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lewis, Wesley)
August 12, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio, Jose Neftali Arias Hernandez, Jose William Recinos Nolasco, Javier Alexander Reyes Vigil, Hector Sigifredo Rivera Rosa, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Proposed Order - on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Proposed Order - on Motion to Exceed Page Limits)(Lewis, Wesley)
August 12, 2019 Filing 22 Other EXHIBITS re: #13 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Petition by Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio, Jose Neftali Arias Hernandez, Jose William Recinos Nolasco, Javier Alexander Reyes Vigil, Hector Sigifredo Rivera Rosa, filed.(Brodyaga, Elisabeth)
August 11, 2019 Filing 21 Other EXHIBITS re: #13 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Petition by Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio, Jose Neftali Arias Hernandez, Jose William Recinos Nolasco, Javier Alexander Reyes Vigil, Hector Sigifredo Rivera Rosa, filed.(Brodyaga, Elisabeth)
August 11, 2019 Filing 20 SEALED EXHIBITS re: #13 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Petition by Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio, Jose Neftali Arias Hernandez, Jose William Recinos Nolasco, Javier Alexander Reyes Vigil, Hector Sigifredo Rivera Rosa, filed. (Brodyaga, Elisabeth)
August 7, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY in Support of #13 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Petition, filed by Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio, Jose Neftali Arias Hernandez, Jose William Recinos Nolasco, Javier Alexander Reyes Vigil, Hector Sigifredo Rivera Rosa. (Brodyaga, Elisabeth)
August 6, 2019 Filing 18 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #15 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (JenniferLongoria, 1)
August 5, 2019 Filing 17 SEALED EXHIBITS Gov't Exh. 1 re: #16 Response in Opposition to Motion by Rodolfo Karisch, Kevin K McAleenan, Michael J. Pitts, Carla Provost, John P Sanders, filed. (Pineda, Christopher)
August 5, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition to #13 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Petition, filed by Rodolfo Karisch, Kevin K McAleenan, Michael J. Pitts, Carla Provost, John P Sanders. (Pineda, Christopher)
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 TRANSCRIPT re: Conference Hearing held on July 26, 2019 before Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber sperales. Ordering Party Mr. Christopher Pineda Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/4/2019., filed. (sperales, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 ***THIS ENTRY WAS INCORRECTLY RECORDED AND HAS BEEN RE-DOCKETD AS DOCUMENT #15*** TRANSCRIPT re: Conference Hearing held on July 26, 2019 before Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber sperales. Ordering Party Mr. Christopher Pineda Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/4/2019., filed. (sperales, ) Modified on 8/5/2019 (mperez, 1).
August 2, 2019 Filing 13 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Petition by Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio, Jose Neftali Arias Hernandez, Jose William Recinos Nolasco, Javier Alexander Reyes Vigil, Hector Sigifredo Rivera Rosa, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Consolidated Petition, #2 Proposed Order)(Brodyaga, Elisabeth)
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Christopher Pineda for Transcript of Telephonic Conference on 7/26/19 before Judge Rodriguez. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sheila Perales, filed. (Pineda, Christopher)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER entered. Motion to Consolidate due by 8/2/2019; Brief due by 8/12/2019; Responses due by 8/26/2019; Exhibit and Witness Lists due by 8/29/2019; Objections to Exhibit and Witness List due by 9/3/2019; Injunction Hearing set for 9/5/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 before Judge Fernando Rodriguez Jr.(Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(bespinoza, 1)
July 26, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr. Appearances: Elisabeth Brodyaga f/Petitioners; Christopher Pineda, Annalisa Cravens and Michael Celone f/Respondents; (Court Reporter: Sheila Perales) (Law Clerk: Thomas Sekula) [Time: 1:59-3:18]. TELEPHONIC HEARING RE: REQUEST FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER held on 7/26/2019. The Court addressed the parties. Respondents' counsel stated their position; Petitioners' counsel responded. Request for TRO denied. The Court set a Preliminary Injunction Hearing to be held on September 5, 2019 at 10:00 am. Parties' deadline to file Exhibit List and Witness list is 8/29/19; Objections to Exhibit and Witness Lists is 9/3/19. Parties discussed possible Motion to Consolidate related cases. Petitioners deadline to send a proposed petition to Respondents is 7/31/19; Motion to Consolidate deadline is 8/2/19. Respondents agreed to maintain Named Petitioners within Southern District of Texas, and to not move forward with any removal proceeding as to Named Petitioners, through the Preliminary Injunction hearing. (bespinoza, 1) Modified on 7/29/2019 (bespinoza, 1).
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Michael Anthony Celone to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(bespinoza, 1)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Michael Anthony Celone (US Dept of Justice) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rodolfo Karisch, Kevin K McAleenan, Michael J. Pitts, Carla Provost, John P Sanders, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/16/2019. (Pineda, Christopher)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/1/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 before Judge Fernando Rodriguez Jr(Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(bespinoza, 1)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Telephone Conference set for 7/26/2019 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Judge Fernando Rodriguez Jr, filed. (bespinoza, 1)
July 23, 2019 Summons Issued as to Rodolfo Karisch,. Issued summons returned to plaintiff in person, filed.(dbenavides, 1)
July 23, 2019 Summons Issued as to Carla Provost, John P Sanders, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff in person, filed.(dbenavides, 1)
July 23, 2019 Summons Issued as to Kevin K McAleenan, Acting DHS Issued summons returned to plaintiff in person, filed.(dbenavides, 1)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERING CASE. This case is hereby transferred to U.S. District Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr. (Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(rnieto, 1)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 First AMENDED PETITION against Rodolfo Karisch, Kevin K McAleenan, Michael J. Pitts, Carla Provost, John P Sanders filed by Jose Neftali Arias Hernandez, Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio, Javier Alexander Reyes Vigil, Hector Sigifredo Rivera Rosa, Jose William Recinos Nolasco.(Brodyaga, Elisabeth)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE Regarding Case Status by Rodolfo Karisch, Kevin K McAleenan, Michael J. Pitts, Carla Provost, John P Sanders, filed. (Pineda, Christopher)
July 20, 2019 Filing 3 SEALED EXHIBITS re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio, Jose Neftali Arias Hernandez, Jose William Recinos Nolasco, Javier Alexander Reyes Vigil, Hector Sigfredo Rivera-Rosa, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Brodyaga, Elisabeth)
July 20, 2019 Filing 2 Other EXHIBITS re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio, Jose Neftali Arias Hernandez, Jose William Recinos Nolasco, Javier Alexander Reyes Vigil, Hector Sigfredo Rivera-Rosa, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Brodyaga, Elisabeth)
July 20, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0541-22822989) filed by Hector Sigfredo Rivera-Rosa, Javier Alexander Reyes Vigil, Jose Neftali Arias Hernandez, Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio, Jose William Recinos Nolasco.(Brodyaga, Elisabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez Recinos et al v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hector Sigifredo Rivera Rosa
Represented By: Manuel E Solis
Represented By: Elisabeth Lisa S Brodyaga
Represented By: Jaime M Diez
Represented By: Thelma Odilia Garcia
Represented By: Luis Campos
Represented By: Wesley Darwin Lewis
Represented By: Efren Carlos Olivares
Represented By: Karla Marisol Vargas
Represented By: John Brent Beckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Neftali Arias Hernandez
Represented By: Manuel E Solis
Represented By: Elisabeth Lisa S Brodyaga
Represented By: Jaime M Diez
Represented By: Thelma Odilia Garcia
Represented By: Luis Campos
Represented By: Wesley Darwin Lewis
Represented By: Efren Carlos Olivares
Represented By: Karla Marisol Vargas
Represented By: John Brent Beckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose William Recinos Nolasco
Represented By: Manuel E Solis
Represented By: Elisabeth Lisa S Brodyaga
Represented By: Jaime M Diez
Represented By: Thelma Odilia Garcia
Represented By: Luis Campos
Represented By: Wesley Darwin Lewis
Represented By: Efren Carlos Olivares
Represented By: Karla Marisol Vargas
Represented By: John Brent Beckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Juan Carlos Acensio Y Acensio
Represented By: Manuel E Solis
Represented By: Elisabeth Lisa S Brodyaga
Represented By: Jaime M Diez
Represented By: Thelma Odilia Garcia
Represented By: Luis Campos
Represented By: Wesley Darwin Lewis
Represented By: Efren Carlos Olivares
Represented By: Karla Marisol Vargas
Represented By: John Brent Beckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Javier Alexander Reyes Vigil
Represented By: Manuel E Solis
Represented By: Elisabeth Lisa S Brodyaga
Represented By: Jaime M Diez
Represented By: Thelma Odilia Garcia
Represented By: Luis Campos
Represented By: Wesley Darwin Lewis
Represented By: Efren Carlos Olivares
Represented By: Karla Marisol Vargas
Represented By: John Brent Beckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kevin Eduardo Rizzo Ruano
Represented By: Manuel E Solis
Represented By: Elisabeth Lisa S Brodyaga
Represented By: Jaime M Diez
Represented By: Thelma Odilia Garcia
Represented By: Luis Campos
Represented By: Wesley Darwin Lewis
Represented By: Efren Carlos Olivares
Represented By: Karla Marisol Vargas
Represented By: John Brent Beckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jorge Landaverde
Represented By: Manuel E Solis
Represented By: Elisabeth Lisa S Brodyaga
Represented By: Jaime M Diez
Represented By: Thelma Odilia Garcia
Represented By: Luis Campos
Represented By: Wesley Darwin Lewis
Represented By: Efren Carlos Olivares
Represented By: Karla Marisol Vargas
Represented By: John Brent Beckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Santos Zuniga
Represented By: Manuel E Solis
Represented By: Elisabeth Lisa S Brodyaga
Represented By: Jaime M Diez
Represented By: Thelma Odilia Garcia
Represented By: Luis Campos
Represented By: Wesley Darwin Lewis
Represented By: Efren Carlos Olivares
Represented By: Karla Marisol Vargas
Represented By: John Brent Beckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Abel Santay-Son
Represented By: Manuel E Solis
Represented By: Elisabeth Lisa S Brodyaga
Represented By: Jaime M Diez
Represented By: Thelma Odilia Garcia
Represented By: Luis Campos
Represented By: Wesley Darwin Lewis
Represented By: Efren Carlos Olivares
Represented By: Karla Marisol Vargas
Represented By: John Brent Beckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jairo Alexander Gonzalez Recinos
Represented By: Manuel E Solis
Represented By: Elisabeth Lisa S Brodyaga
Represented By: Jaime M Diez
Represented By: Thelma Odilia Garcia
Represented By: Luis Campos
Represented By: Wesley Darwin Lewis
Represented By: Efren Carlos Olivares
Represented By: Karla Marisol Vargas
Represented By: John Brent Beckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jonathan Fernando Beltran Rizo
Represented By: Manuel E Solis
Represented By: Elisabeth Lisa S Brodyaga
Represented By: Jaime M Diez
Represented By: Thelma Odilia Garcia
Represented By: Luis Campos
Represented By: Wesley Darwin Lewis
Represented By: Efren Carlos Olivares
Represented By: Karla Marisol Vargas
Represented By: John Brent Beckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bryan Lopez-Lopez
Represented By: Manuel E Solis
Represented By: Elisabeth Lisa S Brodyaga
Represented By: Jaime M Diez
Represented By: Thelma Odilia Garcia
Represented By: Luis Campos
Represented By: Wesley Darwin Lewis
Represented By: Efren Carlos Olivares
Represented By: Karla Marisol Vargas
Represented By: John Brent Beckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Javier Ernesto Giron Monterroza
Represented By: Manuel E Solis
Represented By: Elisabeth Lisa S Brodyaga
Represented By: Jaime M Diez
Represented By: Thelma Odilia Garcia
Represented By: Luis Campos
Represented By: Wesley Darwin Lewis
Represented By: Efren Carlos Olivares
Represented By: Karla Marisol Vargas
Represented By: John Brent Beckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Anthony Perez Valle
Represented By: Manuel E Solis
Represented By: Elisabeth Lisa S Brodyaga
Represented By: Jaime M Diez
Represented By: Thelma Odilia Garcia
Represented By: Luis Campos
Represented By: Wesley Darwin Lewis
Represented By: Efren Carlos Olivares
Represented By: Karla Marisol Vargas
Represented By: John Brent Beckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gerardo Henrique Herrera Rivera
Represented By: Manuel E Solis
Represented By: Elisabeth Lisa S Brodyaga
Represented By: Jaime M Diez
Represented By: Thelma Odilia Garcia
Represented By: Luis Campos
Represented By: Wesley Darwin Lewis
Represented By: Efren Carlos Olivares
Represented By: Karla Marisol Vargas
Represented By: John Brent Beckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hugo Flandez
Represented By: Manuel E Solis
Represented By: Elisabeth Lisa S Brodyaga
Represented By: Jaime M Diez
Represented By: Thelma Odilia Garcia
Represented By: Luis Campos
Represented By: Wesley Darwin Lewis
Represented By: Efren Carlos Olivares
Represented By: Karla Marisol Vargas
Represented By: John Brent Beckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael J. Pitts
Represented By: Christopher D Pineda
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Represented By: Nancy Lynn Masso
Represented By: Eric Joel Drootman
Represented By: Annalisa L. Cravens
Represented By: Michael Anthony Celone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Carla Provost
Represented By: Christopher D Pineda
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Represented By: Nancy Lynn Masso
Represented By: Eric Joel Drootman
Represented By: Annalisa L. Cravens
Represented By: Michael Anthony Celone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rodolfo Karisch
Represented By: Christopher D Pineda
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Represented By: Nancy Lynn Masso
Represented By: Eric Joel Drootman
Represented By: Annalisa L. Cravens
Represented By: Michael Anthony Celone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John P Sanders
Represented By: Christopher D Pineda
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Represented By: Nancy Lynn Masso
Represented By: Eric Joel Drootman
Represented By: Annalisa L. Cravens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin K McAleenan
Represented By: Christopher D Pineda
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Represented By: Nancy Lynn Masso
Represented By: Eric Joel Drootman
Represented By: Annalisa L. Cravens
Represented By: Michael Anthony Celone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ACLU Foundation of Texas
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?