Nationstar HECM Acquisitions Trust 2018-1 v. Barreda et al
Plaintiff: Nationstar HECM Acquisitions Trust 2018-1
Defendant: Enrique Barreda and Maria Del Carmen Barreda
Case Number: 1:2019cv00190
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fernando Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Enrique Barreda, Maria Del Carmen Barreda, filed.(dbenavides, 1)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Cronenwett, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/7/2019: #1 summons issued) (dbenavides, 1). (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/7/2019) (dbenavides, 1).
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Nationstar HECM Acquisitions Trust 2018-1, filed.(Cronenwett, Mark)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/7/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 before Judge Fernando Rodriguez Jr(Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23302365) filed by Nationstar HECM Acquisitions Trust 2018-1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cronenwett, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationstar HECM Acquisitions Trust 2018-1 v. Barreda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enrique Barreda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Del Carmen Barreda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationstar HECM Acquisitions Trust 2018-1
Represented By: Mark Douglas Cronenwett
Represented By: Gordon Welborne Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?