Lopez v. Gonzalez
Plaintiff: Jose M Lopez and Jose "Joe" M Lopez
Defendant: Anna Lisa Gonzalez
Case Number: 1:2019cv00200
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rolando Olvera
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Anna Lisa Gonzalez. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Anna Lisa Gonzalez, filed.(Showalter, David)
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Unexecuted as to Anna Lisa Gonzalez re: Summons with Original Complaint, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons (Unexecuted))(Showalter, David)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Jose "Joe" M Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Showalter, David)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jose "Joe" M Lopez, filed.(Showalter, David)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Anna Lisa Gonzalez. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Anna Lisa Gonzalez, filed.(Showalter, David)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/11/2020 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Rolando Olvera(Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anna Lisa Gonzalez (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23417204) filed by Jose M Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Showalter, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Lisa Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose M Lopez
Represented By: David Wesley Showalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose "Joe" M Lopez
Represented By: David Wesley Showalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?