South Avis Realty, Inc. v. Neece et al
Plaintiff: South Avis Realty, Inc.
Defendant: Ben R. Neece, Franklin Global Resources, The Law Firm of Ben R. Neece, PC and Franklin Global Resources, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00206
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fernando Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #14 Opposed MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM pursuant to Rule 12 b filed by South Avis Realty, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 B.Neece's & Law Office's M2Dismiss 12b6, #2 Exhibit 2 B.Neece's Answer, #3 Exhibit 3 Complaint)(Saenz, Omar)
December 5, 2019 Filing 16 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 21 by The Law Firm of Ben R. Neece, PC, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Art. of Incorporation, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Art. of Dissolution)(Neece, Ben)
December 5, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Ben R. Neece, The Law Firm of Ben R. Neece, PC, filed.(Neece, Ben)
December 5, 2019 Filing 14 Opposed MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM pursuant to Rule 12 b by Ben R. Neece, The Law Firm of Ben R. Neece, PC, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/26/2019. (Neece, Ben)
December 5, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Franklin Global Resources, Inc., filed.(Willis, David)
November 27, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by South Avis Realty, Inc., filed.(Saenz, Omar)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order entered by the Court. ORDERED that the Application for a Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED. SIGNED this 15th day of November, 2019. (Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(dbenavides, 1)
November 14, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr: Appearances: Omar Antonio Saenz f/Plaintiff; Ben R Neece f/Defendants; (Court Reporter: Sheila Perales) (Law Clerk: Victoria Aranda) [Time: 3:17-3:33]. TELEPHONIC HEARING RE: REQUEST FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER held on 11/14/2019. The Court addressed the parties; each stated their position to the TRO. Request for TRO was taken under consideration; ruling will be issued by tomorrow. (bespinoza, 1)
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Franklin Global Resources, Inc. served on 11/14/2019, answer due 12/5/2019, filed.(jtabares, 1)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to The Law Firm of Ben R. Neece, PC served on 11/14/2019, answer due 12/5/2019, filed.(jtabares, 1)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Ben R. Neece served on 11/14/2019, answer due 12/5/2019, filed.(jtabares, 1)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Telephone Conference set for 11/14/2019 at 03:15 PM by telephone before Judge Fernando Rodriguez Jr, filed. (bespinoza, 1)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to 1.) Franklin Global Resources, Inc., 2.) Ben R. Neece, 3.) The Law Firm of Ben R. Neece, PC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation, #2 Continuation)(JenniferLongoria, 1)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Franklin Global Resources, Inc., Ben R. Neece, The Law Firm of Ben R. Neece, PC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Law Office of Ben R. Neece, #2 Summons for Franklin Global Resources)(Saenz, Omar)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/4/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Fernando Rodriguez Jr(Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(dbenavides, 1)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Rolando Olvera recused. Case reassigned to Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr for all further proceedings(Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(dbenavides, 1)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III recused. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23533934) filed by South Avis Realty, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 FGR Contract 1-3-19, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 Assignment of Sales and Purchase Agreement Approval, #3 Proposed Order Order Granting Temporary Restraining Order)(Saenz, Omar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: South Avis Realty, Inc. v. Neece et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben R. Neece
Represented By: Ben Richard Neece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin Global Resources
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Law Firm of Ben R. Neece, PC
Represented By: Ben Richard Neece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin Global Resources, Inc.
Represented By: David Patrick Willis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Avis Realty, Inc.
Represented By: Omar Antonio Saenz
Represented By: Jaime Arturo Saenz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?