Ramos v. Pompeo et al
Plaintiff: Claudia Lorena RAMOS
Defendant: Mike Pompeo, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and Michael Pompeo
Case Number: 1:2019cv00207
Filed: November 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rolando Olvera
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Summons Issued as to 1. Michael Pompeo, 2. William Barr, U.S. Attorney General, 3. Office of the U.S. Attorney. Issued summons returned to plaintiff in person, filed.(jtabares, 1)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/11/2020 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Rolando Olvera(Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
November 11, 2019 Filing 2 SEALED EXHIBITS by Claudia Lorena RAMOS, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Diez, Jaime)
November 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23534548) filed by Claudia Lorena RAMOS.(Diez, Jaime)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos v. Pompeo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Pompeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Pompeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Lorena RAMOS
Represented By: Jaime M Diez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?