International Trade S.A. v. La Darien Navegacion S.A. et al
Plaintiff: International Trade S.A.
Defendant: M/V Ocean Innovation, La Darien Navegacion S.A. and Marugame Kisen Kaisha LTD
Case Number: 1:2020cv00137
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rolando Olvera
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Stipulation of Dismissal.(Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(EdnitaPonceadi, 1)
December 9, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by International Trade S.A., filed.(Hunter, James)
November 18, 2020 Filing 18 Verified Statement of Right of Ownership and Right to Defend Vessel Pursuant to Supplemental Rule C(6)(a) and Entry of Restricted Appearance to Defend Vessel in rem Pursuant to Rule E(8) of the Supplemental Rules for Admiralty or Maritime Claims of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by La Darien Navegacion S.A., M/V Ocean Innovation, Marugame Kisen Kaisha LTD, filed.(Winton, James)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER entered by the Court. IT IS, HEREBY ORDERED that the time to file a Notice of Claim to the Vessel pursuant to Rule C(6)(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for Admiralty Maritime Claims is extended to November 18, 2020 and that an Answer to Plaintiffs complaint will, therefore, be due not later than December 9, 2020. Answer due by 12/9/2020 (Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(dbenavides, 1)
October 19, 2020 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for a Claim to be filed by International Trade S.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hunter, James)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ordered that the time to file a Notice of Claim is extended to 10/19/2020, and that an answer to the complaint will be due 11/9/2020.(Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
September 28, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to FIle Claim to The Vessel and Answer by International Trade S.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hunter, James)
September 18, 2020 Filing 13 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to La Darien Navegacion S.A. served on 9/4/2020, answer due 9/25/2020, filed.(mperez, 1)
September 18, 2020 Filing 12 RETURN of Service re: Complaint/Summons as to Marine Salvage and Services, Inc., filed.(mperez, 1)
September 18, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN of Service re: Order Substitute Custodian as to Marine Salvage and Services Inc., filed.(mperez, 1)
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN of Service re: Order to Seize as to Marine Salvage and Services Inc., filed.(mperez, 1)
September 18, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN of Service re: Release of Vessel as to M/V Ocean Innovation, filed.(mperez, 1)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/12/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Rolando Olvera(Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
September 6, 2020 Filing 7 Consent to Release of the Vessel by International Trade S.A., filed.(Hunter, James)
September 2, 2020 Summons Issued as to La Darien Navegacion S.A., M/V Ocean Innovation, Marugame Kisen Kaisha LTD. Issued summons delivered to US Marshal in person, filed.(dnoriega, 1)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 Seizure WARRANT issued ( Signed by Judge Judge Rolando Olvera), filed.(dbenavides, 1)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion Appointing Substitute Custodian.(Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Seize A Vessel.(Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION Substitute Custodian by INTERNATIONAL TRADE S.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order)(Hunter, James)
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION Motion for Order to Seize by INTERNATIONAL TRADE S.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Hunter, James)
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25144298) filed by INTERNATIONAL TRADE S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hunter, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Trade S.A. v. La Darien Navegacion S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Ocean Innovation
Represented By: James C Winton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Darien Navegacion S.A.
Represented By: James C Winton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marugame Kisen Kaisha LTD
Represented By: James C Winton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Trade S.A.
Represented By: James H Hunter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?