Yuniel v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Montesino Brunet Yuniel
Respondent: Chad Wolf, Carlos Rodriguez, Daniel Biblia, William Barr, Warden of Immigration Facility and Pete Olivarez
Case Number: 1:2020cv00144
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ronald G Morgan
Referring Judge: Fernando Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by Pete Olivarez, filed. (Rodriguez, Jimmy)
October 6, 2020 Filing 10 Certified Mail Receipt Returned as to U.S. Attorney, executed on 9/30/2020 re: 6 Document(s) Sent - receipt attached, access restricted to court users for privacy reasons -, filed. (JenniferLongoria, 1)
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jimmy Anthony Rodriguez on behalf of Pete Olivarez, filed. (Rodriguez, Jimmy)
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 Certified Mail Receipt Returned, executed on 9/23/20 re: 5 Document(s) Sent - receipt attached, access restricted to court users for privacy reasons -, filed. (jtabares, 1)
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 Certified Mail Receipt Returned, executed on 9/23/20 re: 3 Document(s) Sent - receipt attached, access restricted to court users for privacy reasons -, filed. (jtabares, 1)
September 17, 2020 *** Certified Copy of Order #4 provided to US Attorney Ryan Patrick by certified mail, filed. (dbenavides, 1)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order entered by the Court. The Court ORDERS the Clerk of Court to dismiss William Barr, Chad Wolf, Daniel Biblia and Carlos Rodriguez as respondents, leaving Pete Olivarez the Acting Officer in Charge at the Port Isabel Detention Center as the sole respondent. If Olivarez is no longer the custodial officer for the Port Isabel Detention Center, the Government shall inform the Court of who is the proper respondent. It is further ORDERED that Olivarez shall file and serve an answer to the petition no later than November 16, 2020 responding to the allegations of the petition.The Court hereby ORDERS the parties to appear for a hearing on this matter on December 3, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. The Government is ORDERED to produce Montesino Brunet at that time. The parties shall be prepared to discuss the constitutionality of Montesino Brunets continued detention pursuant to Zadvydas, 533 U.S. 678. The District Clerks Office is ORDERED to serve a copy of the Petition and this Order upon Olivarez and the United States Attorney for the Southern District of Texas, Ryan Patrick. The Court hereby APPOINTS Jodi Goodwin to represent Yuniel Montesino Brunet for the remainder of this action. Responses due by 11/16/2020. Miscellaneous Hearing set for 12/3/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan) Parties notified.(dbenavides, 1)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (JenniferLongoria, 1)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241 (Filing fee $ 5) filed by Montesino Brunet Yuniel.(JenniferLongoria, 1) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2020: #1 Unredacted attachment) (JenniferLongoria, 1).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yuniel v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Carlos Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Daniel Biblia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden of Immigration Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pete Olivarez
Represented By: Jimmy Anthony Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Montesino Brunet Yuniel
Represented By: Jodilyn Marie Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?