Conteh et al v. Longoria, Jr. et al
Petitioner: Pius Chi Monguh, Prince Marfo, Alpha Conteh and Carl Cubilla Dohnah
Respondent: Acting Secretary Chad Wolf, Acting Director Tony H Pham, Daniel Bible, Attorney General William Barr, Officer-in-Charge Jose Garcia Longoria, Jr., Jose Garcia Longoria, Jr., Tony H Pham, William Barr and Chad Wolf
Case Number: 1:2020cv00150
Filed: September 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rolando Olvera
Referring Judge: Ignacio Torteya
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Lance Duke on behalf of William Barr, Daniel Bible, Jose Garcia Longoria, Jr., Tony H Pham, Chad Wolf, filed. (Duke, Lance)
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to William Barr served on 9/29/2020, answer due 11/30/2020, filed.(Potter, Cathy)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of #6 Summons Issued/Not Issued by Pius Chi Monguh, Alpha Conteh, Carl Cubilla Dohnah, Prince Marfo, filed.(Potter, Cathy)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER entered. Respondents are ordered to file a response to the petition on or before 12/3/2020. Petitioner may file a reply by 12/17/2020.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to William Barr, Daniel Bible, Jose Garcia Longoria, Jr., Tony H Pham, Chad Wolf and United States of America. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(dnoriega, 1)
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Issuance of Summons as to William Barr, Daniel Bible, Jose Garcia Longoria, Jr., Tony H Pham, Chad Wolf, Ryan Patrick, US Attorney Houston, filed.(Potter, Cathy)
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 SEALED EXHIBITS A, B, C & D re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Pius Chi Monguh, Alpha Conteh, Carl Cubilla Dohnah, Prince Marfo, filed. (Potter, Cathy)
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 Other EXHIBITS re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Pius Chi Monguh, Alpha Conteh, Carl Cubilla Dohnah, Prince Marfo, filed.(Potter, Cathy)
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Scarborough on behalf of Pius Chi Monguh, Alpha Conteh, Carl Cubilla Dohnah, Prince Marfo, filed. (Scarborough, Jennifer)
September 23, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0541-25249981) filed by Carl Cubilla Dohnah, Pius Chi Monguh, Alpha Conteh, Prince Marfo.(Potter, Cathy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conteh et al v. Longoria, Jr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pius Chi Monguh
Represented By: Cathy Jean Potter
Represented By: Jennifer Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Prince Marfo
Represented By: Cathy Jean Potter
Represented By: Jennifer Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alpha Conteh
Represented By: Cathy Jean Potter
Represented By: Jennifer Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carl Cubilla Dohnah
Represented By: Cathy Jean Potter
Represented By: Jennifer Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Acting Secretary Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Acting Director Tony H Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Daniel Bible
Represented By: Lance G Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Officer-in-Charge Jose Garcia Longoria, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jose Garcia Longoria, Jr.
Represented By: Lance G Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tony H Pham
Represented By: Lance G Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Lance G Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Lance G Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?