PDVSA Petroleo S.A. v. Trigeant, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: PDVSA Petroleo S.A.
Defendant: Trigeant, Ltd. and BTB Refining, LLC
Case Number: 2:2009cv00038
Filed: March 2, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Real Property: Other Office
County: Nueces
Presiding Judge: Hayden Head
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER denying as moot 381 Motion for Preliminary Injunction.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER ON TRIGEANT, LTD.'S OPPOSED MOTION TO ENFORCE JUDGMENT granting 308 Motion to Enforce Judgment. (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lcayce, )
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER denying 242 Motion for Attorney Fees.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, )
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 239 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PDVSA Petroleo S.A. v. Trigeant, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PDVSA Petroleo S.A.
Represented By: James F Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trigeant, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BTB Refining, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?