Strong v. Livingston et al
Plaintiff: |
Tabari S Strong |
Defendant: |
Brad Livingston, Eileen Kennedy, Lorie Davis, Larissa Wysocki and C Benavidez |
Case Number: |
2:2012cv00106 |
Filed: |
April 9, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Texas |
Office: |
Corpus Christi Office |
County: |
Bee |
Presiding Judge: |
B. Janice Ellington |
Presiding Judge: |
Nelva Gonzales Ramos |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 12, 2017 |
Filing
154
OPINION AND ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR FILING FEE AND COURT COSTS denying 151 Motion; denying 151 Motion for Costs.(Signed by Magistrate Judge B Janice Ellington) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
|
March 23, 2017 |
Filing
148
ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: 145 Memorandum and Recommendations. Granting Motion for Summary Judgment 141 and Dismissing this action as MOOT. (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2)
|
March 10, 2015 |
Filing
126
ORDER ON MOTION FOR CONTEMPT denying without prejudice 115 Motion for Contempt.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
|
August 18, 2014 |
Filing
111
ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR CONTEMPT AND FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF denying 104 Motion for Contempt; denying 107 Motion; denying 108 .(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
|
April 11, 2014 |
Filing
98
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT AND CONTINUING STAY OF PROCEEDINGS denying 89 Motion for Contempt; denying 93 Motion for Contempt; denying 96 Motion to Expedite; denying 96 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. In lig ht of the pending Ali case, the Court concludes that it is in the interests of judicial economy to continue the procedural stay of this action until after the Ali trial. Plaintiffs preliminary injunction remains in full force and effect.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
|
December 31, 2013 |
Filing
76
OPINION AND ORDER denying 69 Motion to Stay.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
|
December 20, 2013 |
Filing
67
ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATION re: denying 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment, granting 34 MOTION to Dismiss -Partial Dismissal Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6), 55 Memorandum and Recommendations, granting in part and denying in part 52 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, granting in part and denying in part 54 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
|
August 13, 2012 |
Filing
16
Opinion and Order Dismissing Plaintiff's 1983 Free Exercise Claims, Granting Defendants' Motion to Abate and Denying without Prejudice Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order re 3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; granting 14 Motion to Abate.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(amireles, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?