Malvino v. Delluniversita

Plaintiff: Albert P. Malvino
Defendant: Paul A. Delluniversita and PCA Collectibles, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2012cv00401
Filed: December 21, 2012
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Office: Corpus Christi Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 20, 2015 153 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a motion for judgment which includes a election of remedies and a proposed judgment by June 10,2015. Defendants are ordered to file any response to the motion for judgment 21 days after the filing of the motion.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
May 1, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 9 Motion to Transfer Case.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(amireles, )
February 10, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 67 Motion for Leave to File.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lcayce, 2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malvino v. Delluniversita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert P. Malvino
Represented By: Richard L Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul A. Delluniversita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PCA Collectibles, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.