Wilson v. McGinnis et al
Plaintiff: William M. Wilson
Defendant: Theresa A. Whitt, Frances E. McGinnis and Lori W. Hudson
Case Number: 2:2013cv00204
Filed: July 8, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Corpus Christi Office
County: Nueces
Presiding Judge: B. Janice Ellington
Presiding Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: 56 Memorandum and Recommendations, granting 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Certificate of Appealability is DENIED. (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lcayce, 2)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE; vacating 10 Order of Re-Assignment. (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lcayce, 2)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 OPINION AND ORDER denying Motion for Appointment of Expert Witness and Second Motion for Appointment of Counsel re 29 Motion to Appoint ; 33 Motion to Appoint.(Signed by Magistrate Judge B. Janice Ellington) Parties notified.(amireles, 2)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 OPINION AND ORDER denying 16 Motion for Appointment of Counsel.(Signed by Magistrate Judge B. Janice Ellington) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. McGinnis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa A. Whitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frances E. McGinnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori W. Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William M. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?