Reyna v. Stephens

Petitioner: Samuel Rodriguez Reyna
Respondent: William Stephens
Case Number: 2:2014cv00054
Filed: February 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Corpus Christi Office
County: Brazoria
Referring Judge: B. Janice Ellington
Presiding Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL ON APPEAL denying 54 Motion for Leave to File. (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: granting 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief in Support, adopting 40 Memorandum and Recommendations. This action is DISMISSED. In the event that Petitioner seeks a Certificate of Appealability, the request is DENIED. (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lcayce, 2)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ON MOTION TO CORRECT denying 13 Motion to Correct.(Signed by Magistrate Judge B. Janice Ellington) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 OPINION AND ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS; denying without prejudice 4 Motion for Leave to File; denying without prejudice 5 Motion for Leave to File; denying without prejudice 6 Motion for Leave to File; granting 7 Motion for Leave to File.(Signed by Magistrate Judge B. Janice Ellington) Parties notified.(lcayce, 2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reyna v. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Samuel Rodriguez Reyna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?