Gonzales v. Nueces County, Texas et al
Plaintiff: Danny Gonzales
Defendant: Nueces County, Texas, Justin Noland, Deputy Perales, S. Charleton, J. Medina, J Villanueva and A Munoz
Case Number: 2:2016cv00153
Filed: May 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Corpus Christi Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS CHARLTON, MEDINA, MUNOZ AND VILLANUEVA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT granting 80 Motion for Summary Judgment.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER REINSTATING CASE ; Motion-related deadline set re: 80 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 78 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Responses due by 2/7/2018. The parties are further ORDERED to confer and file a joint proposed trial date within 10 days from the date of this Order.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 28 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 29 Motion for Leave to File.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lcayce, 2)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS granting 19 Motion to Dismiss; granting 19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim.. The Court DENIES Plaintiff's generic motion for leave appearing in his response (D.E. 23, p. 10) and ORDERS that, on or before January 15, 2017, Plaintiff may file a renewed motion for leave, attaching his proposed amended pleading and including any necessary briefing to show that the amended pleading complies with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 8(a) and Twombly/Iqbal.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales v. Nueces County, Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Gonzales
Represented By: Christopher J Gale
Represented By: Amie Augenstein Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nueces County, Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Noland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Charleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Villanueva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?