Pelican's Roost Townhome Association et al v. American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Plaintiff: Alan J Kohutek, Lizabeth Mica, William Scott Mica, Espirion Garcia, Amanda Kohutek, Steven Morgan, Pat Garcia, Brite Star Remodeling LLC, Pelican's Roost Townhome Association and James W Burdette, II
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00174
Filed: June 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Corpus Christi Office
County: Nueces
Presiding Judge: Hilda G Tagle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER entered, re: Parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice #26 . The Court VACATES all settings and deadlines and DIRECTS the Clerk of the Court to close the case. (Signed by Judge Hilda G Tagle) Parties notified.(scavazos, 1)
November 7, 2019 Filing 26 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by American Strategic Insurance Corp., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Sean)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER entered. The Court therefore ORDERS Parties to file a joint status report regarding their settlement negotiations no later than 12 p.m. November 12, 2019. Otherwise, the Court ORDERS the Parties to appear and show cause for failing to comply with the Courts order on September 10, 2019, Dkt. No. 24, and further for failing to comply with this Courts order on November 6, 2019 at a Final Pretrial Conference at 2 p.m. November 12, 2019. (Signed by Judge Hilda G Tagle) Parties notified.(jtabares, 1)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER entered. The Court is in receipt of the parties' Joint Notice of Settlement #23 . The Court ORDERS the parties to submit dismissal documents or otherwise inform the Court of the status of this case by November 4, 2019.(Signed by Judge Hilda G Tagle) Parties notified.(scavazos, 1)
September 4, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Settlement by American Strategic Insurance Corp., filed. (Sullivan, Sean)
July 12, 2019 Filing 22 Alternative Dispute Resolution Questionnaire provided to all parties of record, filed. (ccassadyadi, 4)
July 11, 2019 Filing 21 Alternative Dispute Resolution Memorandum; case not settled, filed.(mserpa, 2)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting #19 Joint Motion to Continue Mediation. Mediation deadline is extended to July 10, 2019. (Signed by Judge Hilda G Tagle) Parties notified.(scavazos, 1)
April 4, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Continuance of Mediation Deadline by American Strategic Insurance Corp., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Propoesed Order)(Sullivan, Sean)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER entered. The Court GRANTS IN PART #17 Joint Motion for Continuance. Discovery due by 7/1/2019. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 7/24/2019. Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/24/2019. Mediation due by 6/3/2019. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 10/24/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/7/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Hilda G Tagle. (Signed by Judge Hilda G Tagle) Parties notified.(scavazos, 1)
March 25, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Continuance of Pretrial Deadlines by American Strategic Insurance Corp., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order to Continue)(Sullivan, Sean)
March 20, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean P. Sullivan on behalf of American Strategic Insurance Corp., filed. (Sullivan, Sean)
March 7, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,, by American Strategic Insurance Corp., filed.(Milano, Deani)
February 21, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED AND SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT against American Strategic Insurance Corp. filed by Espirion Garcia, Brite Star Remodeling LLC, Steven Morgan, William Scott Mica, Alan J Kohutek, Pelican's Roost Townhome Association, Lizabeth Mica, James W Burdette, II, Amanda Kohutek, Pat Garcia. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Lizabeth Mica, Pelican's Roost Townhome Association, Espirion Garcia, Brite Star Remodeling LLC, Steven Morgan, James W Burdette, II, William Scott Mica, Pat Garcia, Alan J Kohutek, Amanda Kohutek.(mperez, 1)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to File Amended and Supplement Civil Action Complaint. (Signed by Judge Hilda G Tagle) Parties notified.(mperez, 1)
October 12, 2018 Filing 12 Amended CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Strategic Insurance Corp. identifying ARX Holding Corporation, The Progressive Corporation,and ARX Executive Holdings, LLLP as Corporate Parent, filed.(Milano, Deani)
October 5, 2018 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended and Supplemental Civil Action Complaint by Brite Star Remodeling LLC, James W Burdette, II, Espirion Garcia, Pat Garcia, Alan J Kohutek, Amanda Kohutek, Lizabeth Mica, William Scott Mica, Steven Morgan, Pelican's Roost Townhome Association, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Thornhill, Tommy)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER. ETT: 2-3. Bench Trial. Statement Regarding Mediation due: 4/15/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 10/26/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 10/12/2018. Pltf Expert Report due by 1/15/2019. Deft Expert Report due by 2/22/2019. Discovery due by 5/15/2019. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 5/31/2019. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 9/12/2019. Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/12/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Hilda G Tagle. (Signed by Judge Hilda G Tagle) Parties notified.(scavazos, 1)
September 11, 2018 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by American Strategic Insurance Corp., filed.(Milano, Deani)
August 8, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Michael Detweiler on behalf of American Strategic Insurance Corp., filed. (Detweiler, Keith)
August 8, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Deani Beard Milano on behalf of American Strategic Insurance Corp., filed. (Milano, Deani)
July 16, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by American Strategic Insurance Corp., filed.(Jones, Bradley)
July 3, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Strategic Insurance Corp., filed.(Jones, Bradley)
July 3, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Brite Star Remodeling LLC, James W Burdette, II, Espirion Garcia, Pat Garcia, Alan J Kohutek, Amanda Kohutek, Lizabeth Mica, William Scott Mica, Steven Morgan, Pelican's Roost Townhome Association, filed.(Thornhill, Tommy)
July 2, 2018 Filing 3 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to American Strategic Insurance Corp. served on 6/25/2018, answer due 8/24/2018, filed.(Thornhill, Tommy)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER setting deadline. Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan due by 9/13/2018. (Signed by Judge Hilda G Tagle) Parties notified.(scavazos, 1)
June 18, 2018 Summons Issued as to American Strategic Insurance Corp.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(dterrell, 2)
June 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20279763) filed by Espirion Garcia, Brite Star Remodeling LLC, Steven Morgan, William Scott Mica, Alan J Kohutek, Pelican's Roost Townhome Association, Lizabeth Mica, James W Burdette, II, Amanda Kohutek, Pat Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons in a Civil Action)(Thornhill, Tommy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pelican's Roost Townhome Association et al v. American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan J Kohutek
Represented By: Tommy W Thornhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lizabeth Mica
Represented By: Tommy W Thornhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Scott Mica
Represented By: Tommy W Thornhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Espirion Garcia
Represented By: Tommy W Thornhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Kohutek
Represented By: Tommy W Thornhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Morgan
Represented By: Tommy W Thornhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pat Garcia
Represented By: Tommy W Thornhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brite Star Remodeling LLC
Represented By: Tommy W Thornhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pelican's Roost Townhome Association
Represented By: Tommy W Thornhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James W Burdette, II
Represented By: Tommy W Thornhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Represented By: Douglas D. D'Arche
Represented By: Sean Patrick Sullivan
Represented By: Keith Michael Detweiler
Represented By: Deani Beard Milano
Represented By: Bradley K Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?