United States of America 1789 v. Villarreal

Plaintiff: United States of America 1789
Defendant: Margaret Villarreal
Case Number: 2:2018cv00226
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Office: Corpus Christi Office
County: Nueces
Presiding Judge: Janis Graham Jack
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Cause of Action: 20:1080
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2018 3 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Margaret Villarreal served on 9/22/2018, answer due 10/15/2018, filed.(Cersonsky, M)
August 7, 2018 Summons Issued as to Margaret Villarreal. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(mmapps, 4)
August 7, 2018 2 NOTICE of Exclusion, filed. (dterrell, 2)
August 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT (Student Loan) against Margaret Villarreal filed by United States of America 1789. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Certificiate of Indebtedness)(Cersonsky, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America 1789 v. Villarreal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Villarreal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America 1789
Represented By: M H Cersonsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?