Valerio et al v. Burnis et al
Plaintiff: Maria Valerio and Angela Valerio
Defendant: Holiday AL Management Sub LLC and george burnis
Case Number: 2:2018cv00265
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2018 Filing 7 First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Holiday AL Management Sub LLC, filed.(Alvarado, Karen)
September 11, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Angela Valerio, Maria Valerio, filed.(Zavaletta, Peter)
August 31, 2018 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet by Holiday AL Management Sub LLC, filed.(Alvarado, Karen)
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 Counsel List by Holiday AL Management Sub LLC, filed.(Alvarado, Karen)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/16/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Parties notified.(idavis, 2)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Nueces County Court at Law #4, case number 2018CCV-61327-4 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20780971) filed by Holiday AL Management Sub LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #3 Exhibit Holiday Answer, #4 Exhibit Burnis Answer, #5 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, #6 Exhibit Index of Matters Being Filed, #7 Exhibit Counsel List)(Alvarado, Karen)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 **** DOCKETED INCORRECTLY ***** NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Nueces County Court at Law #4, case number 2018CCV-61327-4 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20780941) filed by Holiday AL Management Sub LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Original Petition State Court, #3 Exhibit Answer Holiday State Court, #4 Exhibit Answer Burnis State Court, #5 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, #6 Exhibit Index of Matters Being Filed, #7 Exhibit Counsel List)(Alvarado, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valerio et al v. Burnis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Valerio
Represented By: Peter Michael Zavaletta
Represented By: Thomas Jude Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Valerio
Represented By: Peter Michael Zavaletta
Represented By: Thomas Jude Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holiday AL Management Sub LLC
Represented By: Karen M Alvarado
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: george burnis
Represented By: Karen M Alvarado
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?