United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Rosendin Electric, Inc. v. Anthony and Gordon Construction Company, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Rosendin Electric, Inc. and United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Rosendin Electric, Inc.
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company and Anthony and Gordon Construction Company, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00403
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations by United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Rosendin Electric, Inc., filed. (Callahan, Calley)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Anthony and Gordon Construction Company, Inc. served on 11/7/2018, answer due 1/7/2019, filed.(Callahan, Calley)
November 2, 2018 Initial Filing fee: $400.00 re: #1 Complaint, receipt number HOU084068, filed. (thanniable, 4)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/1/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Parties notified.(dterrell, 2)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Rosendin Electric, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Copy of Payment Bond, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Portions of Approved REA)(Callahan, Calley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Rosendin Electric, Inc. v. Anthony and Gordon Construction Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosendin Electric, Inc.
Represented By: Calley D Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Rosendin Electric, Inc.
Represented By: Donald W Holcomb
Represented By: Calley D Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony and Gordon Construction Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?