Click et al v. General Motors LLC

Plaintiff: Ethan Galan, Scott A. Hines, Tyler Allen Click, Bryan J. Tomlin, Quentin Alexander, Troy Bowen, Bailey Henderson, Luis G. Ochoa Cabrera, Homero Medina and Michael Guidroz
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00455
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 ***Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Initial Conference set for 3/22/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos (dterrell, 2)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to General Motors LLC served on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019, filed.(Hilliard, Robert)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/22/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Parties notified.(dterrell, 2)
December 21, 2018 Summons Issued as to General Motors LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(idavis, 2)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to General Motors LLC, filed.(Hilliard, Robert)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against General Motors LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21509581) filed by Homero Medina, Bailey Henderson, Michael Guidroz, Bryan J. Tomlin, Troy Bowen, Scott A. Hines, Tyler Allen Click, Ethan Galan, Quentin Alexander, Luis G. Ochoa Cabrera.(Hilliard, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Click et al v. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethan Galan
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Bradford Parker Klager
Represented By: Marion M Reilly
Represented By: Rudy Gonzales, Jr
Represented By: John Brandon Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott A. Hines
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Bradford Parker Klager
Represented By: Marion M Reilly
Represented By: Rudy Gonzales, Jr
Represented By: John Brandon Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Allen Click
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Bradford Parker Klager
Represented By: Marion M Reilly
Represented By: Rudy Gonzales, Jr
Represented By: John Brandon Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan J. Tomlin
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Bradford Parker Klager
Represented By: Marion M Reilly
Represented By: Rudy Gonzales, Jr
Represented By: John Brandon Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quentin Alexander
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Bradford Parker Klager
Represented By: Marion M Reilly
Represented By: Rudy Gonzales, Jr
Represented By: John Brandon Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Bowen
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Bradford Parker Klager
Represented By: Marion M Reilly
Represented By: Rudy Gonzales, Jr
Represented By: John Brandon Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bailey Henderson
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Bradford Parker Klager
Represented By: Marion M Reilly
Represented By: Rudy Gonzales, Jr
Represented By: John Brandon Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis G. Ochoa Cabrera
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Bradford Parker Klager
Represented By: Marion M Reilly
Represented By: Rudy Gonzales, Jr
Represented By: John Brandon Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Homero Medina
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Bradford Parker Klager
Represented By: Marion M Reilly
Represented By: Rudy Gonzales, Jr
Represented By: John Brandon Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Guidroz
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Bradford Parker Klager
Represented By: Marion M Reilly
Represented By: Rudy Gonzales, Jr
Represented By: John Brandon Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?