Abben v. Voestalpine Texas Holdings LLC et al

Plaintiff: Robert Abben
Defendant: VOESTALPINE TEXAS HOLDING LLC, VOESTALPINE TEXAS LLC, Voestalpine Texas, LLC and Voestalpine Texas Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00032
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Robert Abben, filed.(Anderson, Austin)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 4/11/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos, filed. (bcortez, 2)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Voestalpine Texas Holdings, LLC, Voestalpine Texas, LLC, filed.(Chernekoff, Michael)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Robert Abben, filed.(Alexander, William)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Voestalpine Texas Holdings, LLC served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019; Voestalpine Texas, LLC served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019, filed.(Alexander, William)
January 30, 2019 Summons Issued as to Voestalpine Texas Holdings, LLC, Voestalpine Texas, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(dterrell, 2)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/12/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Parties notified.(dterrell, 2)
January 29, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Voestalpine Texas Holding LLC, Voestalpine Texas LLC, filed.(Alexander, William)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Voestalpine Texas Holdings LLC, Voestalpine Texas LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21752026) filed by Robert Abben. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alexander, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abben v. Voestalpine Texas Holdings LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VOESTALPINE TEXAS HOLDING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VOESTALPINE TEXAS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voestalpine Texas, LLC
Represented By: Lara Denise Pringle
Represented By: J A Tony Canales
Represented By: Michael A Chernekoff
Represented By: Patricia Canales Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voestalpine Texas Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lara Denise Pringle
Represented By: J A Tony Canales
Represented By: Michael A Chernekoff
Represented By: Patricia Canales Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Abben
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Stuart Ryan White
Represented By: Austin W Anderson
Represented By: Kevin Warren Liles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?