Garibay et al v. Whitley et al

Plaintiff: Julieta Garibay, Elena Keane, Maria Yolisma Garcia, Efren Gomez, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Lorena Tule-Romain, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Viridiana Tule Carrizales, Abraham Josue Espinosa Flores, Mi Familia Vota Educational Fund, UnidosUS, Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2 and Maria Felicitas Barbosa
Defendant: Cheryl E Johnson, Ken Paxton, Greg Abbott, David Whitley, Kim Rinn, Karen Nelson and Laura Wise
Case Number: 2:2019cv00040
Filed: February 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1973
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Filing 16 RECEIPT of Transfer Letter re: transfer of case to USDC Western District of Texas. New Case # assigned: 5:19cv159 and received on 2/20/2019., filed. (mmapps, 4)
February 19, 2019 Interdistrict transfer to Western District of Texas, San Antonio Division. Case transferred electronically. (mserpa, 2)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Western District of Texas, San Antonio Division. (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
February 15, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing of Additional Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Application for TRO by Maria Felicitas Barbosa, Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Abraham Josue Espinosa Flores, Maria Yolisma Garcia, Julieta Garibay, Efren Gomez, Elena Keane, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Mi Familia Vota Educational Fund, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Viridiana Tule Carrizales, Lorena Tule-Romain, UnidosUS, filed. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ernest I. Herrera, #2 Exhibit Ex. 14 - Declaration of Elena Keane, #3 Exhibit Ex. 70 - Declaration of Martine Hummel, #4 Exhibit Ex. 71 - Amended Declaration of Juanita Valdez-Cox, #5 Exhibit Ex. 72 - Declaration of Dr. Deborah Liles, #6 Exhibit Ex. 73 - Declaration of El Paso Elections Administrator Lisa Wise)(Perales, Nina)
February 15, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Maria Felicitas Barbosa, Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Abraham Josue Espinosa Flores, Maria Yolisma Garcia, Julieta Garibay, Efren Gomez, Elena Keane, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Mi Familia Vota Educational Fund, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Viridiana Tule Carrizales, Lorena Tule-Romain, UnidosUS. (Perales, Nina)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ; Motion-related deadline set re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Response due by 2/21/2019.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS SECRETARY OF STATE DAVID WHITLEY, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF TEXAS KEN PAXTON, AND GOVERNER GREG ABBOTT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATIONS ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS granting #9 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
February 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Greg Abbott, Ken Paxton, David Whitley, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Greg Abbott, Ken Paxton, David Whitley, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Alejandra Avila & Jack Salmon on behalf of Maria Felicitas Barbosa, Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Abraham Josue Espinosa Flores, Maria Yolisma Garcia, Julieta Garibay, Efren Gomez, Elena Keane, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Mi Familia Vota Educational Fund, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Viridiana Tule Carrizales, Lorena Tule-Romain, UnidosUS, filed. (Salmon, John)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 Second SUPPLEMENT to #5 EMERGENCY MOTION by Maria Felicitas Barbosa, Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Abraham Josue Espinosa Flores, Maria Yolisma Garcia, Julieta Garibay, Efren Gomez, Elena Keane, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Mi Familia Vota Educational Fund, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Viridiana Tule Carrizales, Lorena Tule-Romain, UnidosUS, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 51, #2 Exhibit 52, #3 Exhibit 53, #4 Exhibit 54, #5 Exhibit 55, #6 Exhibit 56, #7 Exhibit 57, #8 Exhibit 58, #9 Exhibit 59, #10 Exhibit 60, #11 Exhibit 61, #12 Exhibit 62, #13 Exhibit 63, #14 Exhibit 64, #15 Exhibit 65, #16 Exhibit 66, #17 Exhibit 67)(Perales, Nina)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 First SUPPLEMENT to #5 EMERGENCY MOTION by Maria Felicitas Barbosa, Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Abraham Josue Espinosa Flores, Maria Yolisma Garcia, Julieta Garibay, Efren Gomez, Elena Keane, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Mi Familia Vota Educational Fund, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Viridiana Tule Carrizales, Lorena Tule-Romain, UnidosUS, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 29, #2 Exhibit 30, #3 Exhibit 31, #4 Exhibit 32, #5 Exhibit 33, #6 Exhibit 34, #7 Exhibit 35, #8 Exhibit 36, #9 Exhibit 37, #10 Exhibit 38, #11 Exhibit 39, #12 Exhibit 40, #13 Exhibit 41, #14 Exhibit 42, #15 Exhibit 43, #16 Exhibit 44, #17 Exhibit 45, #18 Exhibit 46, #19 Exhibit 47, #20 Exhibit 48, #21 Exhibit 49, #22 Exhibit 50)(Perales, Nina)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 EMERGENCY MOTION by Maria Felicitas Barbosa, Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Abraham Josue Espinosa Flores, Maria Yolisma Garcia, Julieta Garibay, Efren Gomez, Elena Keane, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Mi Familia Vota Educational Fund, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Viridiana Tule Carrizales, Lorena Tule-Romain, UnidosUS, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Appendix, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Exhibit 27, #31 Exhibit 28)(Perales, Nina)
February 10, 2019 Filing 4 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Elena Keane, Maria Yolisma Garcia, Julieta Garibay, Efren Gomez, Lorena Tule-Romain, Mi Familia Vota Educational Fund, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Abraham Josue Espinosa Flores, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Viridiana Tule Carrizales, Jane Doe #2, UnidosUS, Jane Doe #1, Maria Felicitas Barbosa.(Perales, Nina)
February 6, 2019 Summons Issued as to Greg Abbott, Cheryl E Johnson, Ken Paxton, David Whitley. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(idavis, 2)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Perales, Nina)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/3/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Parties notified.(dterrell, 2)
February 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21783543) filed by Efren Gomez, Lorena Tule-Romain, Elena Keane, Mi Familia Vota Educational Fund, Maria Yolisma Garcia, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Abraham Josue Espinosa Flores, Julieta Garibay, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Viridiana Tule Carrizales.(Perales, Nina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garibay et al v. Whitley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julieta Garibay
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elena Keane
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Yolisma Garcia
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efren Gomez
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southwest Voter Registration Education Project
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorena Tule-Romain
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc.
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viridiana Tule Carrizales
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abraham Josue Espinosa Flores
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mi Familia Vota Educational Fund
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UnidosUS
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe #1
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe #2
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Felicitas Barbosa
Represented By: Ernest I. Herrera
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: John Paul Salmon
Represented By: Alejandra Avila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl E Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Paxton
Represented By: Patrick K Sweeten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Abbott
Represented By: Patrick K Sweeten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Whitley
Represented By: Patrick K Sweeten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Rinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?