The United States of America for the Use & Benefit of TTJ Rentals, Inc. v Suretec Insurance Company

Plaintiff: The United States of America for the Use & Benefit of TTJ Rentals, Inc.
Defendant: Suretec Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00073
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Suretec Insurance Company identifying Markel Corporation as Corporate Parent, filed.(Carter, Andrew)
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses by The United States of America for the Use & Benefit of TTJ Rentals, Inc., filed. (Watkins, Brent)
April 2, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by Suretec Insurance Company, filed.(Ward, Christopher)
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Suretec Insurance Company served on 3/13/2019, answer due 4/3/2019, filed.(Watkins, Brent)
March 11, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by The United States of America for the Use & Benefit of TTJ Rentals, Inc., filed.(Watkins, Brent)
March 7, 2019 Summons Issued as to Suretec Insurance Company. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(dterrell, 2)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/14/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Parties notified.(dterrell, 2)
March 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Suretec Insurance Company (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0541-22005773) filed by The United States of America for the Use & Benefit of TTJ Rentals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Watkins, Brent) Modified on 3/7/2019 (pyebernetsky, 4). Payment information added on 3/7/2019 (ltien, 4).
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Suretec Insurance Company, filed.(Watkins, Brent) Modified on 3/7/2019 (pyebernetsky, 4).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The United States of America for the Use & Benefit of TTJ Rentals, Inc. v Suretec Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The United States of America for the Use & Benefit of TTJ Rentals, Inc.
Represented By: Scott C Skelton
Represented By: Brent Lee Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suretec Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew Francis Carter
Represented By: Christopher Richard Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?