Cardenas-Lira v. Bradley et al
Plaintiff: Jose Fernando Cardenas-Lira
Defendant: James Burdette, John Doe, David J Bradley, Hugo Martinez, Clay Odom, Nueces County Forensic Officials and CCPD Agents
Case Number: 2:2019cv00143
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jason B Libby
Referring Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #16 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2)
July 1, 2019 Filing 17 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jose Fernando Cardenas-Lira, filed. (idavis, 2)
July 1, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma PauperisMotions referred to Jason B Libby. by Jose Fernando Cardenas-Lira, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/22/2019. (idavis, 2)
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: #14 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Not Paid. Reporter(s): ERO, filed. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal) (vrios, 2)
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: #13 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #9 Order, by Jose Fernando Cardenas-Lira, filed. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(jmarks, 2)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #11 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. On May 29, 2019, Plaintiff's action was dismissed because he has neither paid his previous sanctions nor obtained permission from the Court to file this action (D.E. 9).(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2)
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jose Fernando Cardenas-Lira, filed. (vrios, 2)
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma PauperisMotions referred to Jason B Libby. by Jose Fernando Cardenas-Lira, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/24/2019. (vrios, 2)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 Consent to NOT Proceed before a Magistriate Judge by Jose Fernando Cardenas-Lira, filed.(vrios, 2)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. Because Plaintiff has neither paid his sanctions nor obtained permission from the Court to file this action, this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. All pending Motions are DENIED as moot and the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to CLOSE this case. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING as to Jose Fernando Cardenas-Lira. Submit filing fee of $400.00 or a certified copy of the trust fund account statement Parties notified. Notice of Compliance due by 6/13/2019, filed. (vrios, 2)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Exclusion, filed. (vrios, 2)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (vrios, 2)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from Texas Western. Case Number 1:19-cv-00533; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING case to the Corpus Christi Division of the Southern District of Texas. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 Case Opening Letter mailed to Jose Fernando Cardenas-Lira. (dl)
May 17, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dl)
May 17, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jose Fernando Cardenas-Lira.. Motions referred to Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dl)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Jose Fernando Cardenas-Lira. IFP PENDING. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(dl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cardenas-Lira v. Bradley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Burdette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugo Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clay Odom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nueces County Forensic Officials
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCPD Agents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Fernando Cardenas-Lira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?