Cantu v. Shelest et al
Plaintiff: Francisco Cantu
Defendant: Slavic Logistic LLC and Vyacheslav Shelest
Case Number: 2:2019cv00160
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David S Morales
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Reset Initial Conference set for 9/4/2019 at 10:00 PM before Judge David S Morales.(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Vyacheslav Shelest, Slavic Logistic LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/19/2019. (Peterson, Gregory)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Vyacheslav Shelest, Slavic Logistic LLC, filed.(Peterson, Gregory)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Francisco Cantu, filed.(Green, Justin)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/11/2019 at 09:15 AM before Judge David S Morales(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by Vyacheslav Shelest, Slavic Logistic LLC, filed.(Peterson, Gregory)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Litigation and Affected Non-Parties by Vyacheslav Shelest, Slavic Logistic LLC, filed. (Peterson, Gregory)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entities with a Financial Interest in this Litigation by Vyacheslav Shelest, Slavic Logistic LLC, filed. (Peterson, Gregory)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Vyacheslav Shelest, Slavic Logistic LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Notice of State Court Removal)(Peterson, Gregory)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION of Gregory J. Peterson as attorney in charge of Vyacheslav Shelest, Slavic Logistic LLC, filed.(Peterson, Gregory)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Counsel of Record by Vyacheslav Shelest, Slavic Logistic LLC, filed. (Peterson, Gregory)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Nueces County Court at Law No. 3, case number 2019CCV-60730-3 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22564818) filed by Slavic Logistic LLC, Vyacheslav Shelest. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, #2 Exhibit Defendants' Answer and Jury Demand, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Peterson, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cantu v. Shelest et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Slavic Logistic LLC
Represented By: Gregory Jay Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vyacheslav Shelest
Represented By: Gregory Jay Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Cantu
Represented By: Justin Paul Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?