Padilla v. IEA Constructors LLC et al
Plaintiff: Pablo Morales Padilla
Defendant: IEA Constructors LLC and Tyler Prendergast
Case Number: 2:2019cv00167
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David S Morales
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by IEA Constructors LLC, Tyler Prendergast, filed.(Britt, Benjamin)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by IEA Constructors LLC, Tyler Prendergast identifying IEA Energy Services, LLC as Corporate Parent, filed.(Britt, Benjamin)
June 17, 2019 ***Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 9/11/2019 at 09:45 AM before Judge David S Morales (arodriguez, 2)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/11/2020 at 09:45 AM before Judge David S Morales(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 APPENDIX by IEA Constructors LLC, Tyler Prendergast, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Britt, Benjamin)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 94th District, Nueces County, TX, case number 2019DCV-2345-C (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22609074) filed by Tyler Prendergast, IEA Constructors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement)(Britt, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Padilla v. IEA Constructors LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IEA Constructors LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Dennis Britt
Represented By: Mark Joseph Dyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Prendergast
Represented By: Benjamin Dennis Britt
Represented By: Mark Joseph Dyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pablo Morales Padilla
Represented By: Ricardo Roberto Reyna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?