Ely et al v. PennyMac Loan Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dylan Ely and Michelle Ely
Defendant: Does 1 to 50, inclusive and PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00171
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David S Morales
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 REPLY in Support of #3 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Durell, Daniel)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants #3 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Dylan Ely, Michelle Ely. (ChristinaAvila, 2)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Durell, Daniel)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, filed.(Durell, Daniel)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Nueces County District Court, case number 2019DCV-2406-F (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22626134) filed by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index, #2 Exhibit B - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - List of Counsel, #4 Exhibit D - State Court File, #5 Exhibit E - Nueces CAD)(Durell, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ely et al v. PennyMac Loan Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 50, inclusive
Represented By: Daniel Glenn Durell
Represented By: Benjamin David Lee Foster
Represented By: Thomas George Yoxall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Glenn Durell
Represented By: Benjamin David Lee Foster
Represented By: Thomas George Yoxall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan Ely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Ely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?