Salinas v. City of Corpus Christi et al
Plaintiff: Enedelia G. Salinas
Defendant: Christus Spohn Health System, Mike Markle and City of Corpus Christi
Case Number: 2:2019cv00199
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David S Morales
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/17/2019 at 10:45 AM before Judge David S Morales, filed. (arodriguez, 2)
August 23, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by City of Corpus Christi, Mike Markle, filed.(Castro, Lilia)
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Enedelia G. Salinas, filed.(Tinning, William)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Remand filed by City of Corpus Christi, Mike Markle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Castro, Lilia)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Christus Spohn Health System, filed.(Woolsey, William)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER on Motion to Remand re: #8 MOTION to Remand, filed.(Tinning, William)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by Enedelia G. Salinas, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/11/2019. (Tinning, William)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER on Motion for Leave to File Amended Pleading re: #5 MOTION for Leave to File to File Amended Pleading, filed.(Tinning, William)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Enedelia G. Salinas filed by Enedelia G. Salinas.(Tinning, William)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File to File Amended Pleading by Enedelia G. Salinas, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/11/2019. (Tinning, William)
August 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge David S Morales(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND MOTION TO DISMISS STATE-LAW CLAIMS FOR WANT OF JURISDICTION by City of Corpus Christi, Mike Markle, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Castro, Lilia)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Christus Spohn Health System, filed.(Woolsey, William)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County Court at Law No. 3, Nueces County, Texas, case number 2019ccv-61086-3 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22824782) filed by City of Corpus Christi, Mike Markle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Index of Matters Being Filed, #3 Exhibit List of Parties & Attorneys, #4 Exhibit List of State Court Pleadings)(Castro, Lilia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salinas v. City of Corpus Christi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christus Spohn Health System
Represented By: Richard C Woolsey
Represented By: William Callaway Woolsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Markle
Represented By: Renatto Garcia
Represented By: Lilia Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Corpus Christi
Represented By: Renatto Garcia
Represented By: Lilia Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enedelia G. Salinas
Represented By: William J Tinning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?