Western World Insurance Company v. QBE Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Western World Insurance Company
Defendant: QBE Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00202
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David S Morales
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/17/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge David S Morales, filed. (arodriguez, 2)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Western World Insurance Company, filed.(Hogue, Robert)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by QBE Specialty Insurance Company, filed.(Ferguson, Carter)
August 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2019 at 10:15 AM before Judge David S Morales(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by QBE Specialty Insurance Company, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by QBE Specialty Insurance Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ferguson, Carter)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22875277) filed by QBE Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Ferguson, Carter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western World Insurance Company v. QBE Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Carter L Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western World Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert G Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?