New York Marine and General Insurance Company v. Hilliard Munoz Gonzales LLP et al
Plaintiff: New York Marine and General Insurance Company
Defendant: Hilliard Munoz Gonzales LLP, Robert Hilliard and HMG, LLP
Case Number: 2:2019cv00260
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David S Morales
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by New York Marine and General Insurance Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A. Proposed Standing Protective Order)(Rosenblum, Ricky)
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by New York Marine and General Insurance Company, filed.(Rosenblum, Ricky)
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by New York Marine and General Insurance Company, filed.(Rosenblum, Ricky)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by HMG, LLP, Robert Hilliard, Hilliard Munoz Gonzales LLP, filed.(Jones, David)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against New York Marine and General Insurance Company by Robert Hilliard, HMG, LLP, Hilliard Munoz Gonzales LLP, filed.(Jones, David)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Michael J. McClain to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(vrios, 2)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2019 at 10:45 AM before Judge David S Morales(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Roberta J. Benson to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(ChristinaAvila, 2)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Roberta J. Benson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by New York Marine and General Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/2/2019. (Rosenblum, Ricky)
September 10, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(dterrell, 2)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Michael J. McClain to Appear Pro Hac Vice by New York Marine and General Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/30/2019. (Rosenblum, Ricky)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by New York Marine and General Insurance Company identifying ProSight Global, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Rosenblum, Ricky)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted attachment additional summons, #2 Unredacted attachment additional summons)(Rosenblum, Ricky)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23138899) filed by New York Marine and General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rosenblum, Ricky)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New York Marine and General Insurance Company v. Hilliard Munoz Gonzales LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilliard Munoz Gonzales LLP
Represented By: David Watkin Jones
Represented By: David J Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hilliard
Represented By: David Watkin Jones
Represented By: David J Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMG, LLP
Represented By: David Watkin Jones
Represented By: David J Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New York Marine and General Insurance Company
Represented By: Ricky Howard Rosenblum
Represented By: Roberta J Benson
Represented By: Michael J. McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?