Anzar v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Elizabeth P. Anzar
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2019cv00261
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jason B Libby
Referring Judge: David S Morales
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Brief due by 1/10/2020 Responsive Brief due by 3/13/2020.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT/RECORD from Social Security Administration by Commissioner of Social Security, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit transcript, #2 Exhibit transcript, #3 Exhibit transcript, #4 Exhibit transcript, #5 Exhibit transcript, #6 Exhibit transcript, #7 Exhibit transcript, #8 Exhibit transcript, #9 Exhibit transcript, #10 Exhibit transcript)(Simpson, Kerry)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Commissioner of Social Security, filed.(Simpson, Kerry)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security, filed.(Simpson, Kerry)
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to US Attorney served on 10/17/2019, answer due 12/16/2019, filed.(dterrell, 2)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Commissioner of Social Security served on 10/15/2019, answer due 12/16/2019, filed.(dterrell, 2)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Elizabeth P. Anzar, filed.(sgonzalez, 5)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN of Service Executed as to US Attorney's Office, SDTX on 9/12/19 re: Summons, DE #1, filed.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/12/2019, answer due 11/12/2019, filed.(ChristinaAvila, 2)
September 10, 2019 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff in person, filed. Copies hand delivered to USM. (amartinez, 2)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Elizabeth P. Anzar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(amartinez, 2)IFP granted in 2:19mc1424 by United States Magistrate Judge B. Janice Ellington.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anzar v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kerry J Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth P. Anzar
Represented By: Melissa A Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?