Bruce et al v. Flagstar Bank et al
Plaintiff: Pamela Bruce and Johnny Bruce
Defendant: Jodi Steen, Flagstar Bank, Texas Premier Mortgage, Inc., Mary Goldston, Bob Frisch, Jo Woolsey and Janice Stoner
Case Number: 2:2019cv00288
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #11 Response Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand, filed by Flagstar Bank. (Manning, Matt)
November 15, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE , filed by Johnny Bruce. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Jones, Owen)
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Johnny Bruce, filed.(Jones, Owen)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. Brief due by 11/15/2019 Replies due by 11/22/2019(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE , filed by Johnny Bruce. (Jones, Owen)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WIHT COURT ORDER re: #5 Order by Flagstar Bank, filed. (Manning, Matt)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by Flagstar Bank, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Documents pertaining to all executed process in the state case, #2 Exhibit 2 - The state court Case Summary, #3 Exhibit 3 - An index of matters being filed with the Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit 4 - A list of all counsel of record, #5 Exhibit 5 - Email correspondence from Deputy District Clerk)(Manning, Matt)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/9/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Parties notified.(ChristinaAvila, 2)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Flagstar Bank, filed.(Manning, Matt)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Flagstar Bank, filed.(Manning, Matt)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 343rd Judicial District Court of Aransas County, case number A-19-0284-CV-C (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23290754) filed by Flagstar Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Sale, #3 Exhibit C - Assignment, #4 Exhibit D - Aransas CAD, #5 Exhibit E - Consent to Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Manning, Matt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruce et al v. Flagstar Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jodi Steen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flagstar Bank
Represented By: Matt D. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Premier Mortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Goldston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Frisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jo Woolsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Stoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?