Martin Energy Services, LLC v M/V Barbara E. Bouchard et al
Plaintiff: Martin Energy Services, LLC
Defendant: M/V Barbara E. Bouchard and Bouchard Transportation Co., Inc.,
Case Number: 2:2019cv00368
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: B Janice Ellington
Referring Judge: Julie K Hampton
2 Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Motion to Amend.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton) Parties notified-incl. USMS.(mserpa, 2)
January 30, 2020 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION to Amend #22 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Motions referred to Julie K Hampton. by Martin Energy Services, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Amy, Jeanne)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER vacating #30 Order. While the vessel remains in custody, Plaintiff must identify the name(s) of any substitute custodian(s). Accordingly, the Plaintiff is further ORDERED to supplement their motion with the names of the current master and relief master that it seeks to have appointed as substitute custodians, along with a corresponding proposed order no later than February 3, 2020.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton) Parties notified-incl. cert. copy to USMS.(mserpa, 2)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Unopposed Motion to Amend the Order Appointing #22 Order Granting Amended Motion. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton) Parties notified. Copy to USM. (srussell, 2)
January 24, 2020 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION to Amend #22 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, ( Motion Docket Date 2/14/2020.), AMENDED MOTIONMotions referred to Julie K Hampton. by Martin Energy Services, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Amy, Jeanne)
January 21, 2020 Filing 28 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by Bouchard Transportation Co., Inc.,, filed.(Buchanan, James)
January 21, 2020 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by M/V Barbara E. Bouchard, filed.(Buchanan, James)
January 16, 2020 Filing 26 CLERKS NOTICE. Pursuant to Special Order No. C-2020-1, this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Julie K. Hampton. Magistrate Judge B. Janice Ellington is no longer assigned to the case. All deadlines remain in effect. Parties Notified. (NicoleDiaz, 4)
January 14, 2020 Filing 25 AMENDED RETURN of Service on 1/8/2020 re: process receipt and return, filed.(dterrell, 2)
January 8, 2020 Filing 24 RETURN of Service Executed as to substitute custodian on 1/8/2020 re: process receipt and return, filed.(dterrell, 2)
January 3, 2020 Filing 23 AMENDED ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by M/V Barbara E. Bouchard, filed. (Buchanan, James)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Amended Motion to Appoint Tug Barbara E. Bouchard Corp. and the B. O. 240 Corp., through their master Thomas Rowley, and relief master, Michael Larsen, as substitute custodian of the M/V Barbara E Bouchard. (Signed by Magistrate Judge B Janice Ellington) Parties notified.(vrios, 2)
January 2, 2020 Filing 21 Amended MOTION to Appoint Tug Barbara E. Bouchard Corp. and the B. No. 240 Corp. Through its Master and Relief Master of the M/V Barbara E. Bouchard as Substitute CustodianMotions referred to B Janice Ellington. by Martin Energy Services, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Substitute Custodian, #2 Proposed Order)(Amy, Jeanne)
January 2, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Appoint Tug Barbara E. Bouchard Corp. and the B. No. 240 Corp. Through its Master and Relief Master of the M/V Barbara E. Bouchard as Substitute CustodianMotions referred to B Janice Ellington. by Martin Energy Services, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Substitute Custodian, #2 Proposed Order)(Amy, Jeanne)
January 2, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by M/V Barbara E. Bouchard, filed.(Buchanan, James)
December 19, 2019 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Bouchard Transportation Co., Inc.,. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(dterrell, 2) (Main Document 18 replaced on 12/19/2019) (dterrell, 2).
December 19, 2019 Summons Issued as to Bouchard Transportation Co., Inc.,. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(dterrell, 2)
December 18, 2019 Filing 17 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Bouchard Transportation Co., Inc.,, filed.(Amy, Jeanne)
December 13, 2019 Filing 16 RETURN of Service Executed as to M/V Barbara E. Bouchard on 12/12/2019 re: Process Receipt and Return, filed.(ChristinaAvila, 2)
December 10, 2019 Filing 15 Seize Vessel WARRANT issued ( Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge B Janice Ellington), filed.Certified copy sent to USMS(ChristinaAvila, 2)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #3 (Signed by Magistrate Judge B Janice Ellington) certified copies sent to USMS Parties notified.(ChristinaAvila, 2)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #7 (Signed by Magistrate Judge B Janice Ellington) Parties notified. Certified copies sent to USMS(ChristinaAvila, 2)
December 10, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER re: #7 MOTION to Permit Movement of Seized Vessel and to Release Vessel from Seizure upon Written Notice to U.S. Marshal's Service without Further Court Order, filed.(Amy, Jeanne)
December 10, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER Warrant to Seize a Vessel, filed.(Amy, Jeanne)
December 10, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER re: #3 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant, filed.(Amy, Jeanne)
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against M/V Barbara E. Bouchard filed by Martin Energy Services, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Martin Energy Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Signed Verification, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Amy, Jeanne)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion. Certified copy sent to USMS(Signed by Magistrate Judge B Janice Ellington) Parties notified.(ChristinaAvila, 2)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Permit Movement of Seized Vessel and to Release Vessel from Seizure upon Written Notice to U.S. Marshal's Service without Further Court OrderMotions referred to B Janice Ellington. by Martin Energy Services, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Amy, Jeanne)
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 WARRANT to Seize a Vessel issued, filed.(dterrell, 2)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant.(Signed by Magistrate Judge B Janice Ellington) Parties notified.(dterrell, 2)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER Warrant to Seize a Vessel re: #3 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant, filed.(Amy, Jeanne)
December 9, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge B Janice Ellington. MOTION HEARING held on 12/9/2019. Mr. Hurley Grady appeared by telephone. Discussion held regarding pending motion for issuance of arrest warrant. Mr. Grady is to file the proposed warrant for arrest. Court grants the Motion for Issuance of Arrest. Order signed. Appearances:Atty: Hurley Grady.(Digital # 11:09:50-11:15:30)(ERO:V. Rios), filed.(AnnSalazar, 2)
December 9, 2019 ***Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2019 at 11:15 AM before Magistrate Judge B Janice Ellington (vrios, 2)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Issuance of WarrantMotions referred to B Janice Ellington. by Martin Energy Services, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Amy, Jeanne)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/19/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Parties notified.(ChristinaAvila, 2)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bouchard Transportation Co Inc (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23716508) filed by Martin Energy Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Amy, Jeanne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin Energy Services, LLC v M/V Barbara E. Bouchard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Energy Services, LLC
Represented By: Jeanne L Amy
Represented By: Megan Young-John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Barbara E. Bouchard
Represented By: James F Buchanan
Represented By: Marshall Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bouchard Transportation Co., Inc.,
Represented By: James F Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?