Gathright v. ACME Truck Line, Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert Gathright
Defendant: ACME Truck Line, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00144
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David S Morales
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Joint Motion for Extension of Time Joint Pretrial Order together with Witness Lists, Exhibit Lists, Motions in Limine and Designation of Deposition Excerpts for Witnesses Being Called by Deposition due by 12/30/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge David S Morales Jury Selection / Jury Trial are set for 1/24/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David S Morales. Status Conference set for 11/10/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge David S Morales. Disputes Regarding Matters Accompanying Joint Pretrial Order due 1/6/2022. (Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(AmandaAlegria, 2)
September 14, 2021 Filing 24 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time To Submit Pretrial Submissions by Robert Gathright, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galo, Michael)
August 24, 2021 Filing 23 PLAINTIFF ROBERT GATHRIGHT'S SURREPLY to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgement #21 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Sur- Reply, filed by Robert Gathright. (fcarbia, 2)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to File.(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2)
August 24, 2021 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Sur- Reply by Robert Gathright, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Sur-Reply, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Galo, Michael)
August 19, 2021 8/25/21 Status Conference is terminated pending ruling on MSJ. Counsel notified and in agreement. (arodriguez, 2)
August 13, 2021 Filing 20 REPLY in Support of #18 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by ACME Truck Line, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Deposition Transcript of Ali Pena, #2 Exhibit 2 - Deposition Transcript of Tricia Pena)(Spell, Mary)
August 6, 2021 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition to #18 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Robert Gathright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Proposed Order)(Galo, Michael)
July 16, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment by ACME Truck Line, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Robert Gathright Deposition Transcript, #2 Exhibit 2 - Jimmie Vicknair Deposition Transcript, #3 Proposed Order)(Spell, Mary)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Jury Trial. Discovery due by 6/30/2021. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 7/16/2021. Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/23/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge David S Morales Jury Selection set for 10/18/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David S Morales Jury Trial set for 10/18/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David S Morales Status Conference set for 8/25/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge David S Morales(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(srussell, 2)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Joint Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order.(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(legarza, 2)
April 28, 2021 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Amend #10 Scheduling Order,, by ACME Truck Line, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Spell, Mary)
April 19, 2021 Filing 14 STATEMENT of Intent Regarding Mediation - JOINT by ACME Truck Line, Inc., filed.(Spell, Mary)
March 17, 2021 Filing 13 DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS LIST by ACME Truck Line, Inc., filed.(Spell, Mary)
February 16, 2021 Filing 12 Witness List by Robert Gathright(Galo, Michael)
February 16, 2021 Filing 11 DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS LIST by Robert Gathright, filed.(Galo, Michael)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER. Jury. Demand Letter due: 3/1/21. Statement Regarding Mediation due: 4/19/21. Amended Pleadings due by 2/16/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 2/16/2021 Pltf Expert Witness List due by 2/16/2021. Deft Expert Witness List due by 3/17/2021. Discovery due by 4/30/2021. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 5/17/2021. Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/15/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/5/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge David S Morales Jury Selection set for 8/23/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David S Morales Jury Trial set for 8/23/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David S Morales Status Conference set for 6/16/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge David S Morales(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(srussell, 2)
August 27, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David S Morales. INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held telephonically on 8/27/2020. No pending motions at this time. Deadlines and trial date discussed. Counsel request additional time due to COVID restraints. Scheduling Order to be entered. Appearances: Mary Margaret Spell, Michael V Galo, Jr.(Digital # 2:01 - 2:05)(ERO: Jessie Hutchinson), filed.(arodriguez, 2)
August 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Telephone (IPTC) Conference set for 8/27/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge David S Morales, filed. (arodriguez, 2)
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by ACME Truck Line, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Spell, Mary)
June 19, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by ACME Truck Line, Inc., filed.(Spell, Mary)
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ACME Truck Line, Inc., filed.(Spell, Mary)
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Robert Gathright, filed.(Galo, Michael)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/20/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge David S Morales(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2)
May 28, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ACME Truck Line, Inc. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(BrittanyPainschab, 2)
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to ACME Truck Line, Inc., filed.(Galo, Michael)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ACME Truck Line, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24716631) filed by Robert Gathright. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Galo, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gathright v. ACME Truck Line, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Gathright
Represented By: Michael V Galo, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACME Truck Line, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Margaret Spell
Represented By: Thomas P Hubert
Represented By: Jacob Jude Pritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?