Moses v. Bradley et al
Plaintiff: Robert Arthur Moses
Defendant: David J Bradley and Jason B. Libby
Case Number: 2:2020cv00184
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Julie K Hampton
Referring Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Voluntary Dismiss Case. Case terminated on 8/18/20.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton) Parties notified.(vrios, 2)
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by Robert Arthur Moses, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(srussell, 2)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF EXLUSION. Notice sent to Robert Arthur Moses, filed. (RochelleLimon, 2)
July 22, 2020 IPTC is terminated. (RochelleLimon, 2)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE AND ORDERING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT denying #2 Motion for Leave to File.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/8/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(RochelleLimon, 2)
July 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (RochelleLimon, 2)
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING as to Robert Arthur Moses. A filing fee of $400.00 for actions filed under 42 U.S.C. 1983 or a fully complete application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and submit a certified copy of trust fund account statement Parties notified. Notice of Compliance due by 8/17/2020, filed. (RochelleLimon, 2).
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave pursuant to complaint and request not to be charged fees by Robert Arthur Moses, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/3/2020. (RochelleLimon, 2)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Robert Arthur Moses. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(RochelleLimon, 2) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/16/2020) (RochelleLimon, 2).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moses v. Bradley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason B. Libby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Arthur Moses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?