Daniel T.A. Cotts, PLLC v. American Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Daniel T.A. Cotts PLLC
Defendant: American Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00185
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David S Morales
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to American Bank, N.A. served on 7/20/2020, answer due 9/18/2020, filed.(Fein, Cory)
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Daniel T.A. Cotts PLLC, filed.(Fein, Cory)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth C. Johnston, David M. Clem, and Catherine (Kate) Gaither on behalf of American Bank, N.A., filed. (Johnston, Kenneth)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/14/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge David S Morales(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to American Bank, N.A.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(RochelleLimon, 2)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to American Bank, N.A., filed.(Fein, Cory)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Bank, N.A. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24941898) filed by Daniel T.A. Cotts PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fein, Cory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniel T.A. Cotts, PLLC v. American Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel T.A. Cotts PLLC
Represented By: Cory Steven Fein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Kenneth C Johnston
Represented By: Catherine E Gaither
Represented By: David Matthew Clem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?