Torres v. Southmayd et al
Plaintiff: Quirino Torres
Defendant: Bee County Jail, Michael Paige, Alden E Southmayd and Aldene Southmayd, III
Case Number: 2:2021cv00037
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jason B Libby
Referring Judge: David S Morales
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE A NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS #13 Mail Returned Undeliverable, #14 Mail Returned Undeliverable (Submission Date 5/20/2021)(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2)
April 27, 2021 Filing 13 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Quirino Torres re: #11 Order for Service of Process, filed. (rcastro, 4)
April 26, 2021 Filing 14 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Quirino Torres re: #10 Memorandum and Recommendations, filed. (ChristinaAvila, 2)
April 21, 2021 Filing 12 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Michael Knight, County Attorney for Bee County served on 4/16/2021, answer due 5/7/2021, filed.(vrios, 2)
April 16, 2021 Summons Issued/ USM Form 285 as to Michael Knight, County Attorney for Bee County, filed.(vrios, 2)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(vrios, 2)
April 14, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint Objections to M&R due by 4/28/2021(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2)
March 29, 2021 Filing 9 Letter from Quirino Torres re: incidents at the jail, filed. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (RochelleLimon, 2)
March 24, 2021 Filing 8 PLAINTIFF'S MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT by Quirino Torres, filed.(EdnitaPonce, 1)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT as to Quirino Torres. More Definite Statement due by 3/31/2021(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(amireles, 2)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Partial Filing Fee as to Quirino Torres #2 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2)
March 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Exclusion, filed. (BrittanyPainschab, 2)
March 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (BrittanyPainschab, 2)
March 8, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Quirino Torres, filed. (BrittanyPainschab, 2)
March 8, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Quirino Torres, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/29/2021. (BrittanyPainschab, 2)
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against Bee County Jail, Michael Paige, Alden E Southmayd (Filing fee $ 402) filed by Quirino Torres. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(BrittanyPainschab, 2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. Southmayd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bee County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Paige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alden E Southmayd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldene Southmayd, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quirino Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?