Benavides v. Saul
Plaintiff: Bonifacio Benavides
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2021cv00095
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jason B Libby
Referring Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Exclusion, filed. (RochelleLimon, 2)
June 24, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants Andrew Saul Commissioner of SSA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(RochelleLimon, 2)
June 24, 2021 ***Docket Entry #5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/12/2021 at 09:00 AM was entered in error. DISREGARD Scheduling Order., filed. (RochelleLimon, 2)
June 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 8/19/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos, filed. (bcortez, 2)
May 14, 2021 Filing 5 *DOCKETED IN ERROR-SEE ENTRY DATED 6/24/21* ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/12/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Parties notified.(RochelleLimon, 2) Modified on 6/29/2021 (KendraPearson, 2).
May 14, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff in person, filed.(RochelleLimon, 2)
May 13, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Andrew Saul, US Attorney, and US Attorney General, filed.(Kelly, Michael)
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Bonifacio Benavides, filed.(Kelly, Michael)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26437897) filed by Bonifacio Benavides. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kelly, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benavides v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonifacio Benavides
Represented By: Michael T Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?