Reed v. Olufolake et al
Plaintiff: Frederick E Reed
Defendant: Ogunlade Olufolake, Texas Department Of Criminal Justice and Joel Guana
Case Number: 2:2021cv00129
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jason B Libby
Referring Judge: David S Morales
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Setting Evidentiary Hearing Evidentiary Hearing set for 9/8/2021 at 10:00 AM in by telephone before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #12 Letter, Refund. Clerk of Court is ORDERED to issue and mail a check for $402.00 to Inmate Trust Fund for Frederick Earl Reed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified. Copy provided to Finance. (amireles, 2)
August 11, 2021 Filing 12 Letter from Frederick E. Reed re: Requesting refund ($402.00)for filing fee from Inmate Trust Fund, filed. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (NeldaGarcia, 2)
July 30, 2021 Civil Filing fee: $402.00 re: #11 Order, receipt number CC017319, filed. (ChristinaAvilaadi, 2)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO PAY FILING FEE Submission Date 8/9/2021(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2)
July 19, 2021 Confirmation of receipt of payment from Katherine Munson in the amount of $ 402.00 re: #11 Order to Pay Filing Fee. Receipt date: 7/26/21. Receipt number CC017269. (ChristinaAvila, 2)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #9 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2)
July 8, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time To Pay Filing Fee by Frederick E Reed, filed. Motions referred to Jason B Libby. Motion Docket Date 7/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JessieHutchinson, 2)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO PAY FILING FEE #3 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (PRIVATE PDF) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2)
June 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (NeldaGarcia, 2)
June 28, 2021 Filing 6 Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402) filed by Frederick E Reed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(NeldaGarcia, 2)
June 28, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma PauperisMotions referred to Jason B Libby. by Frederick E Reed, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/19/2021. (NeldaGarcia, 2)
June 28, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Exclusion, filed. (NeldaGarcia, 2)
June 25, 2021 Filing 5 **ENTERED IN ERROR NO PDF DOCUMENT ATTACHED. NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (NeldaGarcia, 2) Modified on 6/28/2021 (NeldaGarcia, 2).
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Frederick E Reed, filed. (NeldaGarcia, 2)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 (ENTERED IN ERROR; WRONG EVENT USED; SEE DE #6 FOR CORRECTION) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Frederick E Reed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(NeldaGarcia, 2) Modified on 6/28/2021 (vrios, 2).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. Olufolake et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ogunlade Olufolake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Department Of Criminal Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Guana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick E Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?