City of Corpus Christi v. J.S. Haren Company et al
Plaintiff: City of Corpus Christi
Defendant: J.S. Haren Company and Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual)
Case Number: 2:2021cv00247
Filed: October 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Drew B Tipton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2023 Filing 32 STIPULATION of Dismissal - Agreed Stipulation of Dismissal by J.S. Haren Company, Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual), filed.(Thrasher, David)
March 31, 2023 Case terminated re: #32 STIPULATION of Dismissal***, filed. (KelliePapaioannou, 2)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting #29 Joint Motion to Abate Ruling Until After Mediation.(Signed by Judge Drew B Tipton) Parties notified.(KelliePapaioannou, 2)
January 18, 2023 Filing 30 NOTICE of Vacation Letter by City of Corpus Christi, filed. (Lehrman, Jeffrey)
January 17, 2023 Filing 29 Joint MOTION to Abate by City of Corpus Christi, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Joint Request)(Lehrman, Jeffrey)
January 16, 2023 Filing 28 First MOTION for Summary Judgment Response by City of Corpus Christi, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 Agreement, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 Experts affidavits with Spire rpt, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 Evidence supporting Plt performance of K, #4 Exhibit Ex 4 Contract docs requiring quality work, #5 Exhibit Ex 5 Specs of wet well and evidence of defective work on wet well, #6 Exhibit Ex 6 Munoz Eng rpt re caisson, #7 Exhibit Ex 7 Depo excerpts of J S Haren, #8 Exhibit Ex 8 Specs to protect existing work, #9 Exhibit Ex 9 Emergency K with Assoc Const Partners, #10 Exhibit Ex 10 Specs of elec power and docs re illicit power use, #11 Exhibit Ex 11 Responsibility to protect procured materials and evid in support, #12 Exhibit Ex 12 Requirements for quality control plan, #13 Exhibit Ex 13 Provisions re safety and regulatory requirements and photos, #14 Exhibit Ex 14 Docs re striking AEP line and issues with relocation of line, #15 Exhibit Ex 15 Schedule anylysis and supporting docs, #16 Exhibit Ex 16 Docs re completing work and demobilization of JSH, #17 Exhibit Ex 17 Docs supporting damage analysis, #18 Exhibit Ex 18 Docs re Stiver Eng representation, #19 Exhibit Ex 19 Merchants Performance Bond, #20 Exhibit Ex 20 Demands on Performance Bond, #21 Exhibit Ex 21 Merchants refusal to act, #22 Exhibit Ex 22 Affidavit of J Edmonds, #23 Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Def's MSJ)(Lehrman, Jeffrey)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff's Response Deadline to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Response due January 16, 2023.(Signed by Judge Drew B Tipton) Parties notified.(KelliePapaioannou, 2)
November 14, 2022 Filing 26 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff's Response Deadline to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by City of Corpus Christi, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lehrman, Jeffrey)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Granted #24 Joint MOTION Joint Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order. (Discovery due by 1/16/2023, Pretrial Motions Deadline due by 2/14/2023, Mediation or Settlement due by 2/17/2023, Joint Pretrial Order and Motion in Limine Deadline due by 4/20/2023, Docket Call set for 5/4/2023 at 02:00 PM before Judge Drew B Tipton.)(Signed by Judge Drew B Tipton) Parties notified.(SashaOzuna, 2)
October 11, 2022 Filing 24 Joint MOTION Joint Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order by City of Corpus Christi, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order)(Lehrman, Jeffrey)
September 30, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claims by J.S. Haren Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/21/2022. (Thrasher, David)
July 7, 2022 Filing 22 DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS LIST by J.S. Haren Company, filed.(Thrasher, David)
June 15, 2022 Filing 21 PLAINTIFF/COUNTER-DEFENDANT CITY OF CORPUS CHRISTIS FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL ANSWER TO DEFENDANT/COUNTER-PLAINTIFF J.S. HAREN COMPANYS ORIGINAL COUNTERCLAIM #4 Counterclaim by City of Corpus Christi, filed. (legarza, 2)
June 15, 2022 Filing 20 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against J.S. Haren Company, Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) filed by City of Corpus Christi.(legarza, 2)
June 15, 2022 Filing 19 First AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against City of Corpus Christi filed by J.S. Haren Company. Related document: #4 Counterclaim filed by J.S. Haren Company.(legarza, 2)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF/COUNTER-DEFENDANT CITY OF CORPUS CHRISTIS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL COMPLAINT AND FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL ANSWER TO DEFENDANT/COUNTER-PLAINTIFF J.S. HAREN COMPANYS ORIGINAL COUNTERCLAIM #15 Motion for Leave to File.(Signed by Judge Drew B Tipton) Parties notified.(legarza, 2)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ON J.S. HAREN COMPANY'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE #13 Motion for Leave to File.(Signed by Judge Drew B Tipton) Parties notified.(legarza, 2)
June 10, 2022 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER On Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant City of Corpus Christi's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File First Amended Original Complaint and First Amended Original Answer to Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff J.S. Haren Company's Original Counterclaim re: #15 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Original Complaint and First Amended Original Answer to Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff J.S. Haren Company's Original Counterclaim, filed.(Lehrman, Jeffrey)
June 10, 2022 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Original Complaint and First Amended Original Answer to Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff J.S. Haren Company's Original Counterclaim by City of Corpus Christi, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 First Amended Original Complaint, #2 First Amended Original Answer)(Lehrman, Jeffrey)
June 10, 2022 Filing 14 DOCKET IN ERROR Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Original Complaint and First Amended Original Answer to Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff J.S. Haren Company's Original Counterclaim by City of Corpus Christi, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/1/2022. (Lehrman, Jeffrey) Modified on 6/10/2022 (RochelleLimon, 2).
June 10, 2022 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Counterclaim by J.S. Haren Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Thrasher, David)
February 1, 2022 Filing 12 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by J.S. Haren Company, Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual), filed.(Thrasher, David)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 6/10/2022. Motion to Add New Parties due by 6/10/2022 Pltf Expert Witness List due by 6/10/2022. Deft Expert Witness List due by 7/29/2022. Discovery due by 9/16/2022. Mediation due by 9/30/2022. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 9/30/2022. Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/5/2023. Docket Call set for 1/12/2023 at 02:00 PM before Judge Drew B Tipton.(Signed by Judge Drew B Tipton) Parties notified.(amireles, 2)
January 3, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Drew B Tipton. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 1/3/2022. Status of case and deadlines discussed. Parties agree this will be a BENCH TRIAL. Scheduling Order to be entered. Appearances: Donald Warren Elliott, Jr, David Royce Thrasher.(Digital # 3:27-3:47)(ERO:Nelda Garcia), filed.(KelliePapaioannou, 2)
December 22, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 1/3/2022 at 03:30 PM in by video before Judge Drew B Tipton, filed. All Parties to Appear by Zoom. Join ZoomGov Meeting https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1619592474?pwd=M0prQ2cxelM4M2JiY0NKSjFERFJHZz09Meeting ID: 161 959 2474 Passcode: 922233Dial by your location +1 669 254 5252 US (San Jose) +1 669 216 1590 US (San Jose) +1 551 285 1373 US +1 646 828 7666 US (New York)Per L.R. 83.7 Except by leave of the presiding judge, no photo- or electro-mechanical means of recordation or transmission of court proceedings is permitted. (KelliePapaioannouadi, 2)
December 17, 2021 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order, filed.(Lehrman, Jeffrey)
December 17, 2021 Filing 8 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by City of Corpus Christi, filed.(Lehrman, Jeffrey)
December 2, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by J.S. Haren Company, Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual), filed.(Thrasher, David)
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by City of Corpus Christi, filed.(Lehrman, Jeffrey)
November 19, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #4 Counterclaim by City of Corpus Christi, filed.(Lehrman, Jeffrey)
November 9, 2021 Filing 4 COUNTERCLAIM against City of Corpus Christi filed by J.S. Haren Company.(Thrasher, David)
November 5, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Service in Removed Action and Statement of Information by J.S. Haren Company, filed.(Thrasher, David)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/3/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Drew B Tipton(Signed by Judge Drew B Tipton) Parties notified.(NeldaGarcia, 2)
October 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Nueces County at Law 3, case number 2021ccv-61178-3 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27252183) filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual), J.S. Haren Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thrasher, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Corpus Christi v. J.S. Haren Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Corpus Christi
Represented By: Jeffrey J Lehrman
Represented By: Andrew W Schuster
Represented By: Donald Warren Elliott, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.S. Haren Company
Represented By: David Royce Thrasher
Represented By: Lauren Alexandra Beverly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual)
Represented By: David Royce Thrasher
Represented By: Lauren Alexandra Beverly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?