Stealth Onsite Solution, LLC v. M/V Double E et al
Plaintiff: Stealth Onsite Solutions, LLC
Defendant: M/V Double E and Erickson & Jensen Seafood Packing Co., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv00175
Filed: July 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David S Morales
Referring Judge: Mitchel Neurock
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying #19 Motion for Writ of attachment.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock) Parties notified.(ChristinaAvila, 2)
August 22, 2023 Filing 19 Amended MOTION for Writ of Attachment by Stealth Onsite Solutions, LLC, filed. Motions referred to Mitchel Neurock. Motion Docket Date 9/12/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kenneth Steven Isbell) (VanesaAranda, 3)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying without prejudice #17 Motion for Writ.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock) Parties notified.(JaredMarks, 2)
August 16, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Writ of Attachment. Motions referred to Mitchel Neurock. by Stealth Onsite Solutions, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kenneth Steven Isbell, #2 Proposed Order)(VanesaAranda, 3)
July 26, 2023 Filing 16 Return of Service Unexecuted as to M/V Double E IMO #9242259 re: Complaint, filed. (AaronJackson, 4).
July 26, 2023 Filing 15 Return of Service Unexecuted as to Michael Tringali as Captain of M/V Double E IMO #9242259 re: Warrant to Seize Vessel, filed. (AaronJackson, 4) .
July 26, 2023 Filing 14 Return of Service Unexecuted as to Michael Tringali as Captain of M/V Double E IMO #9242259 re: Complaint, filed. (AaronJackson, 4).
July 26, 2023 Filing 13 Return of Service Unexecuted as to M/V Double E IMO #9242259 re: Warrant To Seize Vessel, filed. (AaronJackson, 4).
July 18, 2023 Filing 12 WARRANT issued, filed. (BrandisIsom, 4)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SEIZE A VESSEL(Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton) arties notified. Copies hand delivered to USM on 7.17.23(ChristinaAvila, 2)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant; granting #6 Motion for Issuance of Warrant.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton) Parties notified.(ChristinaAvila, 2)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Mark Aronowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton) Parties notified.(AnnSalazar, 2)
July 17, 2023 Motion hearing on July 18, 2023 is terminated. (ChristinaAvila, 2)
July 14, 2023 Filing 8 CLERKS NOTICE on Mandatory Electronic Filing. Party notified, filed. (VanesaAranda, 3)
July 14, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Mark Aronowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motions referred to Mitchel Neurock. by Stealth Onsite Solutions, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/4/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(VanesaAranda, 3)
July 14, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant by Stealth Onsite Solutions, LLC, filed. Motions referred to Mitchel Neurock. Motion Docket Date 8/4/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(VanesaAranda, 3) Modified on 8/16/2023 (VanesaAranda, 3).
July 14, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RESETTING. Parties notified. Motion Hearing by zoom video conference set for 7/18/2023 at 11:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby, filed. (KendraPearson, 2)
July 13, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Setting as to #3 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant. Parties notified. Motion Hearing by zoom video conference set for 7/14/2023 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby, filed. *Zoom link will be emailed to counsel* (KendraPearson, 2)
July 13, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Issuance of WarrantMotions referred to Mitchel Neurock. by Stealth Onsite Solutions, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/3/2023. (ShannonHolden, 4) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/13/2023) (ShannonHolden, 4).
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/11/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge David S Morales Parties notified.(ChristinaAvila, 2)
July 11, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Erickson & Jensen Seafood Packing Co., Inc., M/V Double E filed by Stealth Onsite Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(GabrielleLyons, 4)
July 11, 2023 Filing fee: $402.00 re: #1 Complaint, receipt number 400000575, filed. (GabrielleLyons, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stealth Onsite Solution, LLC v. M/V Double E et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stealth Onsite Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Julia Catherine Hatcher
Represented By: Mark Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Double E
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erickson & Jensen Seafood Packing Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?