Regions Bank v. LIRA et al
Plaintiff: Regions Bank d/b/a Regions Mortgage and Regions Bank doing business as Regions Mortgage
Defendant: LUCILLE JANE PRADO LIRA, DORIS ELAINE DOWELL, ROBERT ANTHONY GARCIA, CHRISTOPHER JAMES GARCIA, DELORES MARIE GEIMAN, JOSEPH CHARLES GARCIA and THERESA FRANCES BARRERA-SHAW
Case Number: 2:2023cv00256
Filed: October 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2023 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Joseph Charles Garcia, filed.(VerlindaRios, 2) (Main Document 16 replaced on 11/27/2023) (VerlindaRios, 2).
November 13, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 1/18/2024 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos, filed. (BrandyCortez, 2)
November 13, 2023 Filing 14 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Christopher James Garcia served on 10/27/2023, answer due 11/17/2023, filed.(Cox, Sarah)
November 8, 2023 Filing 13 STATUTORY DECLARATION of Delores M. Geiman, filed. Address on envelope is invalid. (LeticiaGarza, 2) . (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/9/2023: #1 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT) (LeticiaGarza, 2).
October 31, 2023 Filing 12 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Joseph Charles Garcia served on 10/24/2023, answer due 11/14/2023, filed.(Cox, Sarah)
October 24, 2023 Filing 11 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Delores Marie Geiman served on 10/21/2023, answer due 11/13/2023, filed.(Cox, Sarah)
October 23, 2023 Filing 10 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Lucille Jane Prado Lira served on 10/18/2023, answer due 11/8/2023, filed.(Cox, Sarah)
October 23, 2023 Filing 9 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Theresa Frances Barrera-Shaw served on 10/17/2023, answer due 11/7/2023, filed.(Cox, Sarah)
October 23, 2023 Filing 8 RETURN of Service, filed.(Cox, Sarah)
October 23, 2023 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Robert Anthony Garcia served on 10/17/2023, answer due 11/7/2023, filed.(Frame, Nicholas)
October 20, 2023 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Doris Elaine Dowell served on 10/19/2023, answer due 11/9/2023, filed.(Cox, Sarah)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/11/2024 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(VerlindaRios, 2)
October 12, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(VerlindaRios, 2)
October 11, 2023 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons Request, #2 Summons Request, #3 Summons Request, #4 Summons Request, #5 Summons Request, #6 Summons Request)(Cox, Sarah)
October 11, 2023 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Regions Bank d/b/a Regions Mortgage, filed.(Cox, Sarah)
October 11, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-30645332) filed by Regions Bank d/b/a Regions Mortgage. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cronenwett, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Regions Bank v. LIRA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regions Bank d/b/a Regions Mortgage
Represented By: Sarah Sibley Cox
Represented By: Mark Douglas Cronenwett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regions Bank doing business as Regions Mortgage
Represented By: Mark Douglas Cronenwett
Represented By: Sarah Sibley Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUCILLE JANE PRADO LIRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DORIS ELAINE DOWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT ANTHONY GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER JAMES GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELORES MARIE GEIMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH CHARLES GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THERESA FRANCES BARRERA-SHAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?