Pelko v. Officer Mixon et al
Plaintiff: John Douglas Pelko
Defendant: Officer Mixon, Officer Fielder, Sheriff JC. Hooper, Nueces County Jail and Officer Zapata
Case Number: 2:2023cv00282
Filed: October 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jason B Libby
Referring Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #14 Motion to Appoint ; striking #15 Motion for Production of Documents.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(MaraGonzales, 2)
December 21, 2023 Filing 15 STRUCK PER #16 ORDER on 12/21/2023. Plaintiff's First Request for Production of DocumentsMotions referred to Jason B Libby. by John Douglas Pelko, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/11/2024. (LeticiaGarza, 2) Modified on 12/21/2023 (MaraGonzales, 2).
December 21, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Appointment of CounselMotions referred to Jason B Libby. by John Douglas Pelko, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/11/2024. (LeticiaGarza, 2)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(JaredMarks, 2)
December 13, 2023 Filing 12 ***STRUCK***. DECLARATION for Entry of Default against All Defendants Motions referred to Jason B Libby. by John Douglas Pelko, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/3/2024. (JaredMarks, 2)
December 4, 2023 Filing 11 ***STRUCK***. DECLARATION for Entry of Default by John Pelko, filed. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(NeldaGarcia, 2)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING Evidentiary Hearing set for 1/9/2024 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(LeticiaGarza, 2)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Initial Partial Filing Fee and Collection Order as to John Douglas Pelko; Granting #6 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified. (MaraGonzales, 2)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified. (MaraGonzales, 2)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF IN FORMA PAUPERIS DEFICIENCYAND ORDER TO COMPLY (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(LeticiaGarza, 2)
November 22, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma PauperisMotions referred to Jason B Libby. by John Douglas Pelko, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 letter, #2 Summons)(FrancesCarbia, 2)
November 1, 2023 Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING as to John Douglas Pelko. Parties notified Notice of Compliance due by 12/1/2023, filed. (JaredMarks, 2)
October 31, 2023 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE of Exclusion, filed. (JaredMarks, 2)
October 31, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (JaredMarks, 2)
October 31, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma PauperisMotions referred to Jason B Libby. by John Douglas Pelko, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JaredMarks, 2)
October 31, 2023 Filing 1 Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402) filed by John Douglas Pelko. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JaredMarks, 2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pelko v. Officer Mixon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Douglas Pelko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Mixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Fielder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff JC. Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nueces County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Zapata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?